Texas Campaign for the Environment et al v. DCP Operating Company, LP
Plaintiff: Environment America, Inc. doing business as Environment Texas, Texas Campaign for the Environment and Sierra Club
Defendant: DCP Operating Company, LP
Case Number: 7:2021cv00048
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Joint Motion to Extend Stay by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Joshua B. Frank ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14669454) by on behalf of DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Samia Broadway's Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Broadway has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)Motion to Amend/Correct entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #6 Samia Broadway's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Corrected Motion was filed. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Joshua B. Frank's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Frank has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 CORRECTED MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Samia Broadaway ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14664966) by DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Samia Broadaway ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14664966) by on behalf of DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Samia Broadaway. (slt)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Joshua Frank. (slt)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge David Counts. The Court ORDERS that all deadlines in the instant case be STAYED for SIXTY DAYS from this Order's entry. The STAY will be automatically lifted at the expiration of the SIXTY DAYS. No additional extension will be granted unless good cause is shown. The Court ORDERS the parties to file, on or before May 3, 2021, a joint status report. All relief requested in the instant Motion and not explicitly granted is denied. It is so ORDERED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(mas)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14648098). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Environment America, Inc., Texas Campaign for the Environment, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Intent to Sue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Proof of Mailing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Violations After 12.21.2020, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Colin) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/31/2021) (slt). Modified to replace with flattened pdf on 3/31/2021 (slt).
March 31, 2021 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Campaign for the Environment et al v. DCP Operating Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environment America, Inc. doing business as Environment Texas
Represented By: Colin Scott Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Campaign for the Environment
Represented By: Colin Scott Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Colin Scott Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCP Operating Company, LP
Represented By: Samia Broadaway
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Jacob Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?