National Association of Manufacturers et al v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission et al
Plaintiff: National Association of Manufacturers and Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.
Defendant: United States Securities and Exchange Commission and Gary Gensler
Case Number: 7:2022cv00163
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul W. Hughes, #2 Hughes Decl. Ex. A, #3 Hughes Decl. Ex. B, #4 Hughes Decl. Ex. C, #5 Hughes Decl. Ex. D, #6 Hughes Decl. Ex. E, #7 Hughes Decl. Ex. F, #8 Hughes Decl. Ex. G, #9 Hughes Decl. Ex. H, #10 Hughes Decl. Ex. I, #11 Hughes Decl. Ex. J, #12 Hughes Decl. Ex. K, #13 Declaration of Christopher Netram, #14 Netram Decl. Ex. A, #15 Netram Decl. Ex. B, #16 Netram Decl. Ex. C, #17 Netram Decl. Ex. D, #18 Netram Decl. Ex. E, #19 Netram Decl. Ex. F, #20 Netram Decl. Ex. G, #21 Netram Decl. Ex. H, #22 Netram Decl. Ex. I, #23 Netram Decl. Ex. J, #24 Netram Decl. Ex. K, #25 Netram Decl. Ex. L, #26 Netram Decl. Ex. M, #27 Netram Decl. Ex. N, #28 Netram Decl. Ex. O, #29 Netram Decl. Ex. P, #30 Netram Decl. Ex. Q, #31 Netram Decl. Ex. R, #32 Netram Decl. Ex. S, #33 Declaration of John W. Chisholm, #34 Chisholm Decl. Ex. A, #35 Chisholm Decl. Ex. B, #36 Chisholm Decl. Ex. C, #37 Chisholm Decl. Ex. D, #38 Chisholm Decl. Ex. E, #39 Chisholm Decl. Ex. F, #40 Chisholm Decl. Ex. G)(Hughes, Paul)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order entered by Judge David Counts. The parties shall file their briefs in accordance with the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment due September 9, 2022 (30 page limit); amicus briefs in support of Plaintiffs due September 23, 2022 (10 page limit); Defendants opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment due October 21, 2022 (30 page limit); Plaintiffs' Response/Reply due November 4, 2022 (15 page limit). It is so ORDERED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tm)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Paul W. Hughes's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Hughes has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debbie E. Green on behalf of Paul W. Hughes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16449681) by on behalf of National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Green, Debbie)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (sg)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Daniel Matro's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Matro has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule, AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Tracey A. Hardin's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Hardin has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule, AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by B. David Fraser Tracey A. Hardin by on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Fraser, B.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by B. David Fraser Daniel Matro by on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Fraser, B.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keefe Bernstein on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney Keefe Bernstein added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:dft) (Bernstein, Keefe)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by B. David Fraser on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney B. David Fraser added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:dft) (Fraser, B.)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. Gary Gensler served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Green, Debbie)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. United States Securities and Exchange Commission served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Green, Debbie)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (kg)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Green, Debbie)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Green, Debbie)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Green, Debbie)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16286045), filed by National Association of Manufacturers, Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Debbie)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association of Manufacturers et al v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association of Manufacturers
Represented By: Debbie E. Green
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Gas Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Debbie E. Green
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: B. David Fraser
Represented By: Daniel Matro
Represented By: Keefe Bernstein
Represented By: Tracey A. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gensler
Represented By: Daniel Matro
Represented By: Tracey A. Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?