Republic EES, LLC v. Environmental Industrial Services Group
Plaintiff: Republic EES, LLC
Defendant: Environmental Industrial Services Group
Case Number: 7:2023cv00183
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Counts
Referring Judge: Ronald C Griffin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Republic EES, LLC. Environmental Industrial Services Group served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Ford, Troy)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT to #1 Complaint by Republic EES, LLC. (Ford, Troy)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Environmental Industrial Services Group. (jb3)
November 20, 2023 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Complaint. Case number is incorrect. Please do not refile the entire document as it will create a duplicate charge. Please file ONLY the Document. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the menu and attach the proposed document as the "Main Document". LINK the Proposed Document to the original document. In the docket text, type "Corrected Complaint". (jb3)
November 17, 2023 Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jb3)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Republic EES, LLC. (Ford, Troy)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-18117821), filed by Republic EES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Ford, Troy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/20/2023 with flattened version) (jb3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic EES, LLC v. Environmental Industrial Services Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic EES, LLC
Represented By: Troy Ray Ford
Represented By: Amy Parker Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Industrial Services Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?