Herrera v. Hadfield et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Defendant: FNU LNU, Brady Whitehead, Stephen R. Hadfield, Rebekkah Shaw and Alexis Brown
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2021cv00095
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #2 Recanned for OCR) (jwt).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint; denying #11 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Though the Court has already granted Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must still eventually pay $350.00, the full amount of the filing fee. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.02 within thirty days of the date of thisOrder, or the complaint will be dismissed. Plaintiff shall complete the consent to collection of fees and submit it to the inmate funds accounting office at Plaintiff's correctional facility and also submit a copy of the signed consentto this Court within thirty days from the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 8/13/21. (jrj)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to Mr. Zuckerberg re: case. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf) Modified to correct spelling on 8/4/2021 (kpf).
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Stephen Hadfield, et al filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(kpf)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (No page 17) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amd Complaint, #2 Envelope)(kpf)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Certificate regarding inmate account and statement filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (kpf) Modified on to correct filing date on 7/30/2021 (kpf).
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court re: Motion for extension to time document previously filed. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter re: Certified Trust Fund Account Statements. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Clerk of Court. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Alexis Brown, Stephen R. Hadfield, FNU LNU, Rebekkah Shaw, Brady Whitehead (Originally received by the court on 06/30/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (nmt)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes; denying #3 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 07/06/2021. (nmt)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (nmt)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion for Service of Process, and Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Service of Process, #2 Envelope)(nmt)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/30/2021) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Hadfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Hadfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekkah Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?