Perry v. Weber County et al
Plaintiff: Michael A Perry
Defendant: Weber County, Weber County Sheriffs Department, State of Utah, Rachel Snow, Ogden City, Ogden City Police Department and Patrick Burnham
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 1:2023cv00065
Filed: May 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2023 Filing 38 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
July 21, 2023 Filing 37 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
July 14, 2023 Filing 36 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 07/12/2023. (haa)
July 12, 2023 Filing 34 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
July 11, 2023 Filing 33 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael A Perry. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 07/11/2023). (jl)
July 11, 2023 Filing 32 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Within thirty days, Plaintiff must either verify in a letter to the court that he is still a prisoner and, if so, where; or he must file a renewed Application to Proceed IFP, reflecting non-prisoner status. The Clerk of Court must attach a blank IFP application (for a nonincarcerated party) to Plaintiff's copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 07/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 blank IFP application (for a nonincarcerated party)). (jl)
July 9, 2023 Filing 30 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Michael A Perry. (jl)
July 9, 2023 Filing 29 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of a motion for In Forma Pauperis. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (jl)
July 9, 2023 Filing 28 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
July 6, 2023 Filing 25 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (kpf)
July 6, 2023 Filing 24 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (kpf)
July 5, 2023 Filing 27 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of documents from a motion for In Forma Pauperis. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (jl)
July 5, 2023 Filing 26 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
July 4, 2023 Filing 23 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
July 3, 2023 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable not at facility. Mail sent to Michael A Perry re #13 . #13 emailed to email address on file. (jl)
June 29, 2023 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable not at facility. Mail sent to Michael A Perry re #8 . Resent 8 to email on file. (jl)
June 28, 2023 Filing 20 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
June 28, 2023 Filing 19 **SEALED DOCUMENT** filed by Plaintiff Michael A Perry. Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Filed as sealed document and not motion as motion already ruled on and court is waiting for financial information from the facility. (jl)
June 28, 2023 Filing 18 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
June 27, 2023 Filing 17 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Michael A Perry received from Correctional Institution. (jl)
June 26, 2023 Filing 16 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
June 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Email Filing and Notification Form by Michael A Perry. (jl)
June 23, 2023 Filing 15 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to: 1) within 14 days file the Financial Certificate showing the Initial Partial Filing Fee together with the inmate account statement as outlined in the attached instructions, and 2) remit the initial partial filing fee within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 06/02/2023. No attached document. (Attachments: # 1 Signed Consent Form, #2 Instructions).(jl)
June 21, 2023 Filing 12 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael A Perry. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/21/2023) (jl) Modified by correcting which judge is reviewing the IFP on 6/21/2023 (jl).
June 21, 2023 Filing 11 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
June 21, 2023 Filing 10 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Michael A Perry received from Michael Perry. (jl)
June 7, 2023 Filing 9 EXHIBITS filed by Michael A Perry re #3 Complaint. (jl)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 6/5/2023. (mh)
June 2, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Michael A Perry. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(jl)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to: 1) within 14 days file the Financial Certificate showing the Initial Partial Filing Fee together with the inmate account statement as outlined in the attached instructions, and 2) remit the initial partial filing fee within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 06/02/2023. No attached document. (Attachments: #1 Signed Consent Form (2) Instructions). (jl)
June 2, 2023 Filing 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael A Perry. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/02/2023) (jl)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 6/1/2023. (tcs)
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 5/26/2023). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Michael A Perry. Assigned to Judge David Barlow (ks) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2023: #1 rescanned for image quality) (kb).
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Still, the Motion is incomplete or not compliant with the court's requirements. The Motion is therefore only conditionally granted. The Plaintiff should carefully review the attached standard Notice of Deficiency and must complete and return the attached motion form. If the required inmate account statement has not already been filed it must be filed within 30 days. If the correctly completed motion and account statement are not received within 30 days the case will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice.Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 05/31/2023. No attached document. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Deficiency, #2 Motion for IFP Form)(kpf)
May 26, 2023 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 5/26/2023) filed by Plaintiff Michael A Perry. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Weber County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogden City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogden City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?