1-800 Contacts v. Lens.com Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff 1-800 Contacts, Inc. alleges that Defendant Lens.com, Inc. d/b/a Lens.com, JustLens.com and JustLenses.com had purchased sponsored advertisements from Google and other search engines for Plaintiff's marks.

Plaintiff: 1-800 Contacts
Defendant: Lens.com Inc, Justlens.com and Justlenses.com
Case Number: 2:2007cv00591
Filed: August 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-denying 270 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/12/12. (jmr)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER- denying 281 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/4/11. (jmr)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 197 Motion to Strike the Declaration, Expert Report and Survey of Carl Degen. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/15/2010. (jtj)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 171 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 174 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 195 Defendant's Motion to Strike Benjamin Edelman's Declaration; denying as moot 135 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses 5-8; denying 202 Motion to Strike certain evidence. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/14/2010. (jtj)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 150 Motion to Compel; denying 189 Motion for Leave to File. Schedule set for briefing on related atty fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 2/17/09 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1-800 Contacts v. Lens.com Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1-800 Contacts
Represented By: R. Terrance Rader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lens.com Inc
Represented By: Scott R. Ryther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justlens.com
Represented By: Scott R. Ryther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justlenses.com
Represented By: Scott R. Ryther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?