Butler v. EME Inc et al
Plaintiff: Butler and Vandy Butler
Defendant: EME Inc, EME Service, EME Mechanical and John Bodnar
Case Number: 2:2017cv00140
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Filing 26 Taxation of Costs signed by Anne W. Morgan, Chief Deputy (kpf)
May 30, 2018 Filing 25 BILL OF COSTS filed by EME Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Costs)(Vaughn, Sarah)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT - IT is Ordered that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Case Closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/21/2018. (las)
May 18, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE VACATING Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial set before Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) (lnp)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Summary Judgment ; DENYING #18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/18/2018. (lnp)
January 31, 2018 Filing 21 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant EME Inc. (Vaughn, Sarah)
January 30, 2018 Filing 20 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Vandy Butler. (Smith, Gregory)
January 16, 2018 Filing 19 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant EME Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Butler Deposition, #2 Exhibit Bodnar Deposition, #3 Exhibit EME00085)(Vaughn, Sarah)
December 20, 2017 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Vandy Butler. (Smith, Gregory)
December 14, 2017 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant EME Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offer Letter from EME)(Vaughn, Sarah)
November 22, 2017 Filing 16 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Vandy Butler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Affidavit DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF VANDY BUTLER)(Smith, Gregory)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support. Replies due by 12/14/2017. Responses due by 11/23/2017 Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/3/2017. (las)
November 3, 2017 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Response and Defendants' Reply in Support of MSJ filed by Defendant EME Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time)(Vaughn, Sarah) Modified on 11/3/2017 changed to a Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (las).
October 11, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant EME Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Production 00001-00003, #3 Exhibit Butler Depo. 14:2515:2, 19:1218, #4 Exhibit Bodnar Depo., 9:2-9, #5 Exhibit EME0007071, #6 Exhibit EME000181, #7 Exhibit April Offer, #8 Exhibit EME00083, #9 Exhibit EME00014, #10 Exhibit EME00035, #11 Exhibit EME00068, #12 Exhibit EME00067, #13 Exhibit EME00075)(Vaughn, Sarah)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Hearing vacated. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 4/28/2017. Fact Discovery due by 9/28/2017. Expert Discovery due by 12/7/2017. Motions due by 1/4/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 02:30 PM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Four Day Jury Trial set for 6/4/2018 at 08:30 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/10/2017. (las)
April 10, 2017 Filing 11 JOINT STATEMENT OF PARTIES/ CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendants John Bodnar, EME Inc, EME Mechanical, EME Service, Plaintiff Vandy Butler. NOTE: All parties consented per #10 Attorney's Planning Meeting Report. (las)
March 29, 2017 Filing 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Vaughn, Sarah)
March 29, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
March 10, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by IPT Clerk)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.htmlIf counsel or the parties would like to participate by phone they must contact the IPT Clerk at least two days in advance at #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov to make arrangements. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2017 at 11:00 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (jds)
March 8, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (las)
March 7, 2017 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants John Bodnar, EME Inc, EME Mechanical, EME Service. (las)
March 7, 2017 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by John Bodnar, EME Inc, EME Mechanical, EME Service.(Vaughn, Sarah)
February 27, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants John Bodnar, EME Inc, EME Mechanical, EME Service, Plaintiff Vandy Butler. Form due by 3/14/2017. (mms)
February 27, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants John Bodnar, EME Inc, EME Mechanical, EME Service, Plaintiff Vandy Butler. (mms)
February 24, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 160906816, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2703130) filed by EME Mechanical, EME Inc, EME Service, John Bodnar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Vaughn, Sarah)
February 24, 2017 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendants John Bodnar, EME Inc, EME Mechanical, EME Service is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. EME Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vandy Butler
Represented By: Gregory Brent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EME Inc
Represented By: Sarah C. Vaughn
Represented By: Heinz J. Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EME Service
Represented By: Sarah C. Vaughn
Represented By: Heinz J. Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EME Mechanical
Represented By: Sarah C. Vaughn
Represented By: Heinz J. Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bodnar
Represented By: Sarah C. Vaughn
Represented By: Heinz J. Mahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?