Perrong v. Vivint et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Perrong
Defendant: DSI Distributing and Vivint
Case Number: 2:2019cv00568
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen K. Christiansen on behalf of DSI Distributing (Christiansen, Stephen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DSI Distributing, Vivint with Jury Demand. New Plaintiffs: Joseph Barrett, Craig Cunningham. New Defendants: John Doe Corporation d/b/a National Solar Program. filed by Andrew Perrong. (Paronich, Anthony)
October 3, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support or to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations filed by Defendant Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Text Message Log and Templates)(Marigoni, Nathan)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2020. Expert Discovery on Merits due by 10/23/2020. Motions due by 11/23/2020 or 60 days after a ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification, whichever is later. Scheduling/Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/25/19. (jmr)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Stipulated #20 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Vivint to respond to Perrongs Complaint is now October 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/25/19. (jmr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Marigoni, Nathan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Misny, Jonathan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Perrong as to DSI Distributing served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Murphy, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony Paronich for Andrew Perrong. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/13/19. (jmr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony Paronich , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3370948, filed by Plaintiff Andrew Perrong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pearson, Jared)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan P. Misny for Andrew Perrong. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/5/19. (jmr)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian K. Murphy for Andrew Perrong. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/5/19. (jmr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan P. Misny , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3364673, filed by Plaintiff Andrew Perrong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pearson, Jared)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian K. Murphy , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3364663, filed by Plaintiff Andrew Perrong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pearson, Jared)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. The deadline for Vivint to respond to Perrong's Complaint is now September 26, 2019. Answer deadline updated for Vivint answer due 9/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 09/03/2019. (kpf)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, /Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Vivint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Marigoni, Nathan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan R. Marigoni on behalf of Vivint (Marigoni, Nathan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie J. Vartabedian on behalf of Vivint (Vartabedian, Melanie)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/19/19. (jmr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Perrong as to Vivint served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Pearson, Jared)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 08/15/2019. (tdp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to DSI Distributing. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Vivint. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against DSI Distributing, Vivint (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3348702) filed by Andrew Perrong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Pearson, Jared)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Andrew Perrong is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrong v. Vivint et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSI Distributing
Represented By: Stephen K. Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint
Represented By: Melanie J. Vartabedian
Represented By: Nathan R. Marigoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Perrong
Represented By: Jared B. Pearson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Misny
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Brian K. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?