Li v. Vivint Solar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zhaoer Li
Defendant: Vivint Solar, Dana Russell and David Bywater
Case Number: 2:2021cv00171
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Patrick V. Dahlstrom, for Plaintiff Zhaoer Li. (nl)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. Alexander Hood, J. Alexander Hood II, and Jeremy Alan Lieberman, for Plaintiff Zhaoer Li. (nl)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from USDC of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-06165. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. New case number 2:21-cv-00171-DBP, Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead.
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC TRANSFER ORDER: On March 27, 2020 MJ Orenstein issue an order #7 consolidating this case with CV-19-5777 In Re Vivint Solar, Inc. Securities Litigation. On December 30, 2020 J. Block issued a memorandum and order (DE#37 in CV-19-5777) in the consolidated case granting a change of venue and transferring the case to the District of Utah. Since this case was consolidated with the transferred case, this case is also transferred to the District of Utah. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/19/2021. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Utah. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/19/2021. (Innelli, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Case Reassigned to Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER -- The above-captioned securities fraud class actions pending in this Judicial District are hereby consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Any actions that have been filed, or may be filed, which are related and which may be considered herewith, are consolidated under Case No. 1:19-cv-05777-FB-JO (the "Consolidated Action"). SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05777-FB-JO, 2:19-cv-06165-FB-JO (Walker, Anna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Frederic Block for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela K. Chen no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/27/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv6165. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Alexander Hood on behalf of Zhaoer Li (aty to be noticed) (Hood, J. Alexander) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
November 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bywater, Dana Russell, Vivint Solar, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12000233 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Zhaoer Li. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. Vivint Solar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint Solar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bywater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhaoer Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?