Bridge et al v. Nature's Sunshine Products
Plaintiff: Dymphna Baudoin, Andrea Putre Individually and on behalf of Outdoor Creation, The doing business as Herb Shop, The also known as Betsy, Ivy Bridge, Dee, Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney, Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Bonnie Clayton, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Colorado Sunshine, Betsy, David Scott Individually and on behalf of Outdoor Creation, The doing business as Herb Shop, The, Dale Scott Individually and on behalf of Outdoor Creation, The doing business as Herb Shop, The, Outdoor Creation, The doing business as Herb Shop, The, Bonnie Stejskal, Nature's Paradise, Joan Vandergriff and Health Ministries
Defendant: Nature's Sunshine Products
Case Number: 2:2021cv00495
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jared C Bennett
Referring Judge: Dale A Kimball
2 Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Stay Litigation MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs Dymphna Baudoin, Ivy Bridge, Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney, Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, Bonnie Clayton, Colorado Sunshine, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Health Ministries, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise, Outdoor Creation, The, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre, Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal, Joan Vandergriff. (Helsten, Bradley)
September 16, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Hassen, Michael)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/13/2021. (eat)
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (alf)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs.(alf)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Nature's Sunshine Products. (alf)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Dymphna Baudoin, Ivy Bridge, Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney, Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, Bonnie Clayton, Colorado Sunshine, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Health Ministries, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise, Outdoor Creation, The, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre, Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal, Joan Vandergriff, Defendant Nature's Sunshine Products. Form due by 9/24/2021. (alf)
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION to Stay Litigation, MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Nature's Sunshine Products. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Erick Ampuero) Attorney Christopher J. Martinez added to party Nature's Sunshine Products(pty:dft)(Martinez, Christopher)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ivy Bridge as to Nature's Sunshine Products served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Executed Summons)(Popok, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/23/21. (alf)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Hassen for Dymphna Baudoin, Ivy Bridge,Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney,Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, Bonnie Clayton, Colorado Sunshine, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks Randal Ernst, Health Ministries, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise, The Outdoor Creation,Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre,Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal and Joan Vandergriff.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/19/21. (alf)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael S. Popok for Colorado Sunshine,Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks,Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Health Ministries,J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise,The Outdoor Creation, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre, Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal and Joan Vandergriff.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/19/21. (alf)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Popok , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4086403,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Dymphna Baudoin, Ivy Bridge, Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney, Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, Bonnie Clayton, Colorado Sunshine, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Health Ministries, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise, Outdoor Creation, The, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre, Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal, Joan Vandergriff. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application for Pro Hac, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Helsten, Bradley)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Hassen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4086382,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Dymphna Baudoin, Ivy Bridge, Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney, Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, Bonnie Clayton, Colorado Sunshine, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Health Ministries, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise, Outdoor Creation, The, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre, Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal, Joan Vandergriff. (Helsten, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2021: #1 Applicaltion for Pro Hac, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (alf). (alf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2021: #1 Applicaltion for Pro Hac, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (alf).
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michael J. Hassen, for Plaintiffs Dymphna Baudoin, Ivy Bridge, Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney, Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, Bonnie Clayton, Colorado Sunshine, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Health Ministries, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise, Outdoor Creation, The, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre, Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal, Joan Vandergriff. (mh)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Michael S. Popok, for Plaintiffs Dymphna Baudoin, Ivy Bridge, Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney, Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, Bonnie Clayton, Colorado Sunshine, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Health Ministries, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise, Outdoor Creation, The, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre, Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal, Joan Vandergriff. (mh)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nature's Sunshine Products. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nature's Sunshine Products (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4085284) filed by Linda Jenks, Joan Vandergriff, Richard Dicks, Phil Devisser, Ivy Bridge, Bonnie Clayton, Judy James, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Dale Scott, Health Ministries, Beth Carlson, Randal Ernst, Dymphna Baudoin, Colorado Sunshine, Nature's Paradise, David Scott, Chaney Distributors, Outdoor Creation, The, Jennifer Cheeseman, Julie Devisser, Andrea Putre, Brad Chaney, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Bonnie Stejskal, Carol Dicks, Penny Chaney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Helsten, Bradley)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiffs Dymphna Baudoin, Ivy Bridge, Beth Carlson, Brad Chaney, Penny Chaney, Chaney Distributors, Jennifer Cheeseman, Bonnie Clayton, Colorado Sunshine, Julie Devisser, Phil Devisser, Carol Dicks, Richard Dicks, Randal Ernst, Health Ministries, J. Cheeseman Wellness Center, Judy James, Linda Jenks, Nature's Paradise, Outdoor Creation, The, Jacquelyn Pinkham, Andrea Putre, Dale Scott, David Scott, Bonnie Stejskal, Joan Vandergriff are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridge et al v. Nature's Sunshine Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dymphna Baudoin
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Putre Individually and on behalf of Outdoor Creation, The doing business as Herb Shop, The also known as Betsy
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Bridge
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Carlson
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Chaney
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Chaney
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaney Distributors
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cheeseman
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Cheeseman Wellness Center
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Clayton
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Devisser
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Devisser
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Dicks
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dicks
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Ernst
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy James
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jenks
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Pinkham
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Sunshine
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scott Individually and on behalf of Outdoor Creation, The doing business as Herb Shop, The
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Scott Individually and on behalf of Outdoor Creation, The doing business as Herb Shop, The
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outdoor Creation, The doing business as Herb Shop, The
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Stejskal
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nature's Paradise
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Vandergriff
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Ministries
Represented By: Bradley R. Helsten
Represented By: Michael J. Hassen
Represented By: Michael S. Popok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nature's Sunshine Products
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?