Houwzer v. Houser et al
Plaintiff: Houwzer
Defendant: Houser and Mike Shehan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00546
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #14 Joint Stipulated Motion Regarding Response to Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to December 3, 2021. If Defendants move to dismiss any part of Plaintiff's Complaint, Defendants shall not be required to file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint until the court has ruled on such motion. If any of Plaintiff's claims remain after the court rules on any motion to dismiss, Defendants shall file an answer addressing any remaining claim within 30 days of the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/9/2021. No attached document. (eh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Houser, Mike Shehan. (mh)
November 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Houser, Mike Shehan, Plaintiff Houwzer. Form due by 11/23/2021. (alf)
November 5, 2021 Filing 16 Modification of Docket re Motion #14 : Error: Document should have been filed as a Motion for Extension to file Answer and not to file Reply/Response. Correction: Event type and motion text modified to include correct filing. NO further action is needed. (alf)
November 5, 2021 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by Houwzer. (Marigoni, Nathan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint filed by Defendants Houser, Mike Shehan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney S. Brandon Owen added to party Houser (pty:dft), Attorney S. Brandon Owen added to party Mike Shehan(pty:dft)(Owen, S.) Modified on 11/5/2021 to correct event type and motion text(alf). Modified on 11/15/2021 to correct typo (alf).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The deadline for Defendants to answer has passed and no answer or motion for entry of default has been filed. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to file a status report within 14 days informing the court as to the status of the case and Plaintiff's intentions to proceed. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/25/2021. (eh)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Noah Stanton Robbins for Houwzer.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/4/21. (dla)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Noah S. Robbins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4129742,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Houwzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Application PHV (Noah S. Robbins), #2 Text of Proposed Order Exh B - Proposed Order Granting PHV (Noah S. Robbins))(Marigoni, Nathan)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Houwzer as to Mike Shehan served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Marigoni, Nathan)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Houwzer as to Houser served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Marigoni, Nathan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Houwzer identifying NA as Corporate Parent. (Marigoni, Nathan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Houser. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mike Shehan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/20/21. (alf)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mh)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Noah S Robbins, for Plaintiff Houwzer. (mh)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4115435) filed by Houwzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for New Case) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Marigoni, Nathan)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Houwzer is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houwzer v. Houser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houwzer
Represented By: Nathan R. Marigoni
Represented By: Noah S. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houser
Represented By: S. Brandon Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Shehan
Represented By: S. Brandon Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?