King v. Snap Finance
Plaintiff: Timothy King
Defendant: Snap Finance, LLC and Snap Finance
Case Number: 2:2022cv00715
Filed: November 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott M. Lilja regarding Scott M. Lilja only (Lilja, Scott)
January 4, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2023 at 01:15 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. PLEASE NOTE: OUT OF TOWN COUNSEL MAY PARTICIPATE VIA ZOOM. The Zoom participation information is as follows: Join ZoomGov Meetinghttps://www.zoomgov.com/j/1607828592?pwd=UnlwbHJiR1FvQkxpWGVCUzVtSk5hQT09Meeting ID: 160 782 8592Passcode: 267527One tap mobile+16692545252,,1607828592#,,,,*267527# US (San Jose)+16692161590,,1607828592#,,,,*267527# US (San Jose)Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 646 828 7666 US (New York)Meeting ID: 160 782 8592Passcode: 267527Find your local number: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/adSwr8CJtI (kms)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER WITHDRAWING Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under under (b)(1)(A) reference. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 01/03/2023. (kpf)
December 28, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. The case is randomly reassigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins as the presiding judge and automatically referred to Magistrate Judge Daphne Oberg under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Daphne Oberg is no longer assigned as the presiding judge. (alf)
December 28, 2022 Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Timothy King. (alf)
December 22, 2022 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Snap Finance. (mh)
December 20, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Lilja, Scott)
December 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Childs on behalf of Snap Finance (Childs, Sarah)
December 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Timothy King, Defendant Snap Finance. Form due by 1/4/2023. (alf)
December 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Timothy King, Defendant Snap Finance. (alf)
December 13, 2022 Filing 12 Remark: Attorney Sarah A. Childs is not added for defendant as it appears attorney is not a member of the federal bar. (alf)
December 13, 2022 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Snap Finance. Attorney Cheylynn Hayman added to party Snap Finance(pty:dft)(Hayman, Cheylynn)
December 12, 2022 Filing 10 Mail Returned #8 Order as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Rex H. Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mh)
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued Electronically, Acknowledgment filed by Timothy King.Snap Finance served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Lilja, Scott)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rex H. Elliott and #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Chelsea C. Weaver for Timothy King.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/21/2022. (jl)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chelsea C. Weaver , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4511195,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Timothy King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Chelsea Weaver, #2 Text of Proposed Order B: Granting Motion for Pro Hace Vice Admission of Chelsea Weaver)(Lilja, Scott)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rex H. Elliott , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4511079,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Timothy King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Rex Elliott, #2 Text of Proposed Order B: Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Rex Elliott)(Lilja, Scott)
November 17, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Snap Finance. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/15/2022. (alf)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Rex H Elliott, Chelsea C Weaver, for Plaintiff Timothy King (ks)
November 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg added. Case number will now read 2:22-CV-00715-DAO. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (ks)
November 11, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) re #1 Complaint, Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance, filed by Timothy King. (Lilja, Scott)
November 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4503979) filed by Timothy King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Executive Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Separation Agreement) (Lilja, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Snap Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy King
Represented By: Scott M. Lilja
Represented By: Chelsea C. Weaver
Represented By: Rex H. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Finance
Represented By: Sarah Childs
Represented By: Cheylynn Hayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?