Randall v. State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Richard Chad Randall
Defendant: Steve Gehrke, Shane Nelson, State of Utah and Doyle Cutler
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00038
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to Show Cause, filed by Richard Chad Randall. (kpf)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has thirty days in which to Show Cause why his complaint should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's earlier order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 06/17/2019. (kpf)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Richard Chad Randall received from Correctional Institution (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to the Court)(kpf)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/23/19 (alt)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Richard Chad Randall. (Attachments: #1 Order to Appoint Counsel)(tlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #2 Copy of motion and order with case number noted) (jwt).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Doyle Cutler, Steve Gehrke, Shane Nelson, State of Utah (Originally received by the court on 05/08/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Richard Chad Randall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (tlh)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 05/14/2019. (tlh)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 05/08/2019) filed by Plaintiff Richard Chad Randall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Gehrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Chad Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?