Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. McCarthy et al
Plaintiff: Wilderness Society, The, Natural Resources Defense Council and Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Defendant: Joelle McCarthy, United States Bureau of Land Management and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 4:2019cv00055
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The scheduling requirements of the #6 Order are vacated. Scheduling in this case shall be governed by DUCivR 7-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 09/03/2019. No attached document. (apm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time Attorney Planning Meeting and Scheduling Conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Joelle McCarthy, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Attorney Jared C. Bennett added to party Joelle McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Jared C. Bennett added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft), Attorney Jared C. Bennett added to party United States Department of the Interior(pty:dft)(Bennett, Jared)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Natural Resources Defense Council, Wilderness Society, The. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(White, Michelle)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney's Office, District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Joelle McCarthy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle B. White on behalf of Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Wilderness Society, The (White, Michelle)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sharon Buccino for Natural Resources Defense Council, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Wilderness Society, The. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 8/2/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/2/19 (alt)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/2/2019. (asb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sharon Buccino , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3338557, filed by Plaintiffs Natural Resources Defense Council, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Wilderness Society, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: PHV Admission Form, #2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C: ECF Registration Form)(Bloch, Stephen)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3338283) filed by Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Natural Resources Defense Council, Wilderness Society, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet NRDC et al. v. McCarthy et al. Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Peterson, Laura)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Natural Resources Defense Council, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance and Wilderness Society, The are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. McCarthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Society, The
Represented By: Laura E. Peterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Represented By: Sharon Buccino
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Laura E. Peterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Represented By: Sharon Buccino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Laura E. Peterson
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Represented By: Sharon Buccino
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joelle McCarthy
Represented By: Jared C. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Jared C. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Jared C. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?