Living Rivers et al v. Hoffman et al
Plaintiff: Living Rivers, Center for Biological Diversity and Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management, Kent Hoffman and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 4:2019cv00074
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Hosu Kim on behalf of Kent Hoffman, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior (Kim, Joseph)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Living Rivers, Center for Biological Diversity. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit : Return receipts)(Newell, Landon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States attorney's District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of the Interior. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Land Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kent Hoffman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Diana Dascalu-Joffe for Center for Biological Diversity, Living Rivers, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/12/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/12/19 (alt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/12/2019. (asb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Diana Dascalu-Joffe , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3371466, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Living Rivers, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application - Diana Dascalu-Joffe, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Newell, Landon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3371194) filed by Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Living Rivers, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - List of Challenged Oil and Gas Leases, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Map of Challenged Oil and Gas Leases, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Newell, Landon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Living Rivers and Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Living Rivers et al v. Hoffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living Rivers
Represented By: Diana Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Landon C. Newell
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Represented By: Diana M. Dascalu-Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Diana Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Landon C. Newell
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Represented By: Diana M. Dascalu-Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Diana Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Landon C. Newell
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Represented By: Diana M. Dascalu-Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Hoffman
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?