A.H. et al v. French et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Foley, C.R., Darlene Hester, James Hester, A.F., Juliane Foley, Gilles Rainville, Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont, Angela Ross, E.R., Chad Ross, A.H. and Elke Gilles
Defendant: South Hero Board of School Directors, Champlain Islands Unified Union School District Board of School Directors, Michael Clark, Daniel M. French, Georgia Board of School Directors and James Tager
Case Number: 2:2020cv00151
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William F. Ellis on behalf of Champlain Islands Unified Union School District Board of School Directors, Michael Clark, Georgia Board of School Directors, South Hero Board of School Directors, James Tager. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, William)
November 27, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, by Champlain Islands Unified Union School District Board of School Directors, Michael Clark, Georgia Board of School Directors, South Hero Board of School Directors, James Tager.(Ellis, William)
November 27, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Daniel M. French.(Smith, Rachel)
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Angela Ross, A.F., A.H., Gilles Rainville, Elke Gilles, Daniel Foley, Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont, James Hester, Chad Ross, C.R., Darlene Hester, Juliane Foley, E.R. Exhibits E and G have been replaced to correct illegible pdf headers. The corrected documents are now attached to #21 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G) (jlh)
November 25, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by A.F., A.H., C.R., E.R., Daniel Foley, Juliane Foley, Elke Gilles, Darlene Hester, James Hester, Gilles Rainville, Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont, Angela Ross, Chad Ross. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Declaration of Angela Ross, #13 Declaration of Elke Rainville, #14 Declaration of James Hester, #15 Declaration of Lisa Lorenz, #16 Declaration of Juliane Foley)(McCormick, Thomas) (Attachment 7 replaced on 11/25/2020) (jlh). (Attachment 9 replaced on 11/25/2020) (jlh).
November 24, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Georgia Board of School Directors served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020.(McCormick, Thomas)
November 24, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. James Tager served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020.(McCormick, Thomas)
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Champlain Islands Unified Union School District Board of School Directors served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020.(McCormick, Thomas)
November 13, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A.F., A.H., C.R., E.R., Daniel Foley, Juliane Foley, Elke Gilles, Darlene Hester, James Hester, Gilles Rainville, Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont, Angela Ross, Chad Ross re #16 Amended Complaint,.(McCormick, Thomas)
November 12, 2020 ISSUED Summons as to Champlain Islands Unified Union School District Board of School Directors, Georgia Board of School Directors, James Tager.(law)
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Michael Clark, Daniel M. French, South Hero Board of School Directors, Champlain Islands Unified Union School District Board of School Directors, James Tager, Georgia Board of School Directors filed by Darlene Hester, A.H., Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont, James Hester, Gilles Rainville, Chad Ross, C.R., Angela Ross, Juliane Foley, Daniel Foley, E.R., A.F., Elke Gilles. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint (red-lined version))(kp)
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL: Document 14 has been removed from the docket in accordance with the court's Administrative Procedures. (law)
November 11, 2020 Filing 14 Entry removed from the docket.
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 11/2/2020. (law)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. All Defendants answers due November 12, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 10/21/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William F. Ellis on behalf of Michael Clark and South Hero Board of School Directors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, William) Filer added on 10/20/2020 (jlh).
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Daniel M. French.(Alexander, Jon) Motion relief removed, text clarified on 10/21/2020 (jlh).
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel E. Smith, Esq on behalf of Daniel M. French.(Smith, Rachel)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon T. Alexander, Esq on behalf of Daniel M. French.(Alexander, Jon)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Michael Clark served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020.(Schmitt, Paul)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. South Hero Board of School Directors served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020.(Schmitt, Paul)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Daniel M. French served on 10/2/2020, answer due 10/23/2020.(Schmitt, Paul)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul Daniel Schmitt and granting #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan J. Tucker. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/29/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan J. Tucker filed by A.H., Darlene Hester, James Hester, Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan J. Tucker, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul Daniel Schmitt filed by A.H., Darlene Hester, James Hester, Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul Daniel Schmitt, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Michael Clark, Daniel M. French, South Hero Board of School Directors filed by A.H., Darlene Hester, Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont, James Hester.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.H. et al v. French et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Foley
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.R.
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Hester
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hester
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F.
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliane Foley
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilles Rainville
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Catholic Diocese of Burlington, Vermont
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ross
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.R.
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Ross
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.H.
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elke Gilles
Represented By: Thomas E. McCormick, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan J. Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Paul D. Schmitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Hero Board of School Directors
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Islands Unified Union School District Board of School Directors
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Clark
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. French
Represented By: Rachel E. Smith, Esq.
Represented By: Jon T. Alexander, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Board of School Directors
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tager
Represented By: William F. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?