Stacey et al v. Baker
Plaintiff: Carl Borg, Charles Raymond, Dennis Emerson, Trevor Pecor, Kenneth Marshall, Stan Reynolds, Maria Perez, Norman Robinson, Herman Yo, Michael Roberts, Craig Larmay, Bruce Long, Kenneth Weber, Robert Stacey, Joseph Bruyette, Chris Lewis, Steven Kilburn, Louis Cacopardo, Thomas Brown, Walter Swift, Kirk Wool, William Broyles, Steven Hough, Richard Bresky, Kevin Beaupre, Stanley Whitaker, Christine Billis, John Shambo, Gary Blair, Jesse Kimball, William Wheelock, Clinton Bedell, Michael Tobin, Michael Carpenter, Leonard Kenyon and Howard Hughes
Defendant: James Baker
Case Number: 5:2020cv00057
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey W Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Washington Unit case file on remand received 5/13/2020. (law)
May 8, 2020 Filing 28 LETTER remanding case to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Washington Unit. (law)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Vermont Superior Court and granting #25 MOTION to Dismiss, without prejudice, Eighth Amendment Claim and MOTION to Remand to State Court. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 4/24/2020. (esb)
April 24, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James Baker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bianchi, Jared) Text clarified on 4/24/2020 (law).
April 22, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Eighth Amendment Claim and MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kevin Beaupre, Clinton Bedell, Christine Billis, Gary Blair, Carl Borg, Richard Bresky, Thomas Brown, William Broyles, Joseph Bruyette, Louis Cacopardo, Michael Carpenter, Dennis Emerson, Steven Hough, Howard Hughes, Leonard Kenyon, Steven Kilburn, Jesse Kimball, Craig Larmay, Chris Lewis, Bruce Long, Kenneth Marshall, Trevor Pecor, Maria Perez, Charles Raymond, Stan Reynolds, Michael Roberts, Norman Robinson, John Shambo, Robert Stacey, Walter Swift, Michael Tobin, Kenneth Weber, William Wheelock, Stanley Whitaker, Kirk Wool, Herman Yo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Seibert, Dawn). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 4/22/2020 (law).
April 22, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford: Status Conference held on 4/22/2020. D. Matthews, Esq. & D. Seibert, Esq. present for plaintiffs. J. Bianchi, AAG & R. Menzel, Jr., AAG present for defendant. All parties present by telephone. Court makes inquiries and counsel make statements re: (1) subject matter jurisdiction, (2) state law claims, (3) amended complaint, (4) severance of claims, and (5) DOC administrative process. ORDERED: Plaintiffs are to file supplemental pleadings re: severance of claims by end of business today. Defendant is to file response by noon on 4/24/2020. (Court Reporter: Anne Henry) (pjl)
April 21, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend #17 Emergency Petition for Injunctive Relief filed by Kevin Beaupre, Clinton Bedell, Christine Billis, Gary Blair, Carl Borg, Richard Bresky, Thomas Brown, William Broyles, Joseph Bruyette, Louis Cacopardo, Michael Carpenter, Dennis Emerson, Steven Hough, Howard Hughes, Leonard Kenyon, Steven Kilburn, Jesse Kimball, Craig Larmay, Chris Lewis, Bruce Long, Kenneth Marshall, Trevor Pecor, Maria Perez, Charles Raymond, Stan Reynolds, Michael Roberts, Norman Robinson, John Shambo, Robert Stacey, Walter Swift, Michael Tobin, Kenneth Weber, William Wheelock, Stanley Whitaker, Kirk Wool, Herman Yo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Emergency Petition for Injunctive Relief, #2 Attachment A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Amended Emergency Petition for Injunctive Relief (red-lined))(Seibert, Dawn) Link/text clarified, removed Motion for Extension of Time on 4/22/2020 (law).
April 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl)
April 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dawn M. Seibert, Esq on behalf of Kevin Beaupre, Clinton Bedell, Christine Billis, Gary Blair, Carl Borg, Richard Bresky, Thomas Brown, William Broyles, Joseph Bruyette, Louis Cacopardo, Michael Carpenter, Dennis Emerson, Steven Hough, Howard Hughes, Leonard Kenyon, Steven Kilburn, Jesse Kimball, Craig Larmay, Chris Lewis, Bruce Long, Kenneth Marshall, Trevor Pecor, Maria Perez, Charles Raymond, Stan Reynolds, Michael Roberts, Norman Robinson, John Shambo, Robert Stacey, Walter Swift, Michael Tobin, Kenneth Weber, William Wheelock, Stanley Whitaker, Kirk Wool, Herman Yo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Seibert, Dawn)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re: #17 Emergency Petition for Injunction Relief by James Baker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bianchi, Jared)
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by James Baker re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal) (originally filed 4/15/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert C. Menzel, Jr., Esq, Jared C. Bianchi, Esq on behalf of James Baker. (originally filed 4/15/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 EMERGENCY PETITION for Injunctive Relief against James Baker filed by Steven Kilburn, Kenneth Marshall, Michael Roberts, Jesse Kimball, Robert Stacey, Kenneth Weber, Craig Larmay, Stanley Whitaker, William Wheelock, Michael Tobin, Bruce Long, Clinton Bedell, Walter Swift, Leonard Kenyon, Michael Carpenter, Christine Billis, Trevor Pecor, Steven Hough, Howard Hughes, Thomas Brown, William Broyles, Louis Cacopardo, Charles Raymond, John Shambo, Dennis Emerson, Herman Yo, Carl Borg, Maria Perez, Joseph Bruyette, Chris Lewis, Kirk Wool, Kevin Beaupre, Gary Blair, Richard Bresky, Norman Robinson, Stan Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 4/14/2020) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Bruce Long. Signed by Clerk Donna Waters on 4/16/2020. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Howard Hughes. Signed by Clerk Donna Waters on 4/16/2020. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Louis Cacopardo. Signed by Clerk Donna Waters on 4/16/2020. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Stan Reynolds. Signed by Clerk Donna Waters on 4/16/2020. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Steven Kilburn. Signed by Clerk Donna Waters on 4/16/2020. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Robert Stacey. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Bruce Long. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Howard Hughes. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by John Shambo. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Louis Cacopardo. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Stan Reynolds. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Steven Kilburn. (originally filed 4/16/2020 in state court) (esb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division. (esb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert C. Menzel, Jr., Esq, Jared C. Bianchi, Esq on behalf of James Baker (in official capacity only). (esb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Baker from Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division, case number 162-4-20 Wncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacey et al v. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Borg
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Raymond
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Emerson
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Pecor
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Marshall
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Reynolds
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Perez
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Robinson
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Yo
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Roberts
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Larmay
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Long
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Weber
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stacey
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bruyette
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Lewis
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kilburn
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Cacopardo
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Brown
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Swift
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Wool
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Broyles
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hough
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bresky
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Beaupre
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Whitaker
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Billis
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shambo
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Blair
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Kimball
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wheelock
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Bedell
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tobin
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Kenyon
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Hughes
Represented By: Annemarie Manhardt, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Matthews, Esq.
Represented By: Dawn Siebert, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Baker
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Represented By: Robert C. Menzel, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?