Tafas v. Dudas et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas sought to prevent Defendants Jon Dudas and the United States Patent and Trademark Office from implementing Section 1.75 and 1.78 of certain new federal regulations published by the USPTO at 72 Fed. Reg. No. 161 on August 21, 2007 entitled Changes To Practice for Continued Examination Filings, Patent Applications Containing Patentably Indistinct Claims, and Examination of Claims in Patent Applications; Final Rule.

Plaintiff: Triantafyllos Tafas
Defendant: Jon Dudas and The United States Patent and Trademark Office
Amicus: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, Biotechnology Industry Organization, Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., American Intellectual Property Law Association, Monsanto Company, William Mithchell College of Law, Intellectual Property Institute of William Mitchell College of Law, Human Genome Sciences, Inc., Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC, Public Patent Foundation, Computer and Communications Industry Association, AARP, Consumer Federation of America, Essential Action, Foundation for Taxpayer and Consumer Rights, Initiative for Medicines, Access and Knowledge, Knowledge Ecology International, Prescription Access Litigation, Public Knowledge, Research on Innovation, Software Freedom Law Center, CFPH, LLC, CropLife America, Micron Technology, Inc., Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle, AmberWave Systems Corporation, Fallbrook Technologies Inc., InterDigital Communications LLC, Nano-Terra Inc., Tessera, Inc., BioAdvance, Washington Legal Foundation, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse, Intellectual Property Owners Association, Ron D. Katznelson, Teles AG Informationstechnologien, Intellectual Property and Administrative Law and Public Health Professors, Bar Association of the District of Columbia and Robert Lelkes
Consolidated Plaintiff: SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC and Glaxo Group Limited
Case Number: 1:2007cv00846
Filed: August 22, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James C. Cacheris
Presiding Judge: Thomas Rawles Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER that 284 Motion for Attorney Fees is deemed WITHDRAWN WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that the Order of April 26, 2010 setting a briefing schedule and oral argument on the Motion(DKT. No. 291) is VACATED. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 5/11/10. (klau, )
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER that: a. Defts' opposition to the EAJA motion, limited to the questions of Dr. Tafas's eligibility for and entitlement to a fee award, shall be due on Tuesday, May 11, 2010. b. Pltf's reply brief, limited to the questions of Dr. Tafas's eligibility for and entitlement to a fee award, shall be due on Tuesday, May 25, 2010. c. A hearing on the EAJA motion, limited to the questions of Dr. Tafas's eligibility for and entitlement to a fee award, will be held on Friday, June 4, 2010, as presently scheduled. (See order for details) Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 4/26/2010. (stas)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wetzler, Lauren)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office (Report to the Court) (Attachments: # 1 Federal Circuit EAJA Application, # 2 Federal Circuit EAJA Motion, # 3 Federal Circuit EAJA Memorandum)(Wetzler, Lauren)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to 284 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 USC § 2412. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (klau, )
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER re 287 Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule on EAJA Motion, that the Court sets the following briefing schedule with respect to Plaintiff's motion for attorneys fees and expenses pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412( "EAJA") (Dkt. No. 284): a. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion, limited to the question of Plaintiff's eligibility for and entitlement to a fee award, shall be filed on or before April 28, 2010. b. Plaintiff's reply brief, limited to the question of Plaintiff's eligibility for and entitlement to a fee award, shall be filed on or before May 12, 2010. c. The Court shall hold argument on the motion, limited to the question of Plaintiff's eligibility for and entitlement to a fee award, on Friday, June 4,2010, at 10 a.m.. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 3/23/10. (klau, )
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on EAJA Motion by Jon Dudas, Triantafyllos Tafas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wetzler, Lauren)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Per JCC chambers motions set for 3/26/10 are to be re-noticed. (clar, )
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 284 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 USC § 2412. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Notice of Hearing Date set for March 26, 2010 re 284 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 USC § 2412 (Wilson, Joseph)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Memorandum in Support re 284 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 USC § 2412 filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex.1 (Tafas Decl.), # 2 Exhibit Ex.2 (Moore Decl.), # 3 Exhibit Ex.2 (Moore Decl.), Ex. A thereto, # 4 Exhibit Ex.2 (Moore Decl.), Ex. B thereto, # 5 Exhibit Ex.2 (Moore Decl.), Ex. C thereto, # 6 Exhibit Ex.2 (Moore Decl.), Ex. D thereto, # 7 Exhibit Ex.2 (Moore Decl.), Ex. E thereto, # 8 Exhibit Ex.2 (Moore Decl.), Ex. F thereto, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Gehan Decl.), # 10 Exhibit Ex. 4 (Boundy Decl.), # 11 Exhibit Ex. 5 (Belzer Decl.), # 12 Exhibit Ex.5 (Belzer Decl.), Ex. A thereto, # 13 Exhibit Ex.5 (Belzer Decl.), Ex. B, 1 of 3, thereto, # 14 Exhibit Ex.5 (Belzer Decl.), Ex. B, 2 of 3, thereto, # 15 Exhibit Ex.5 (Belzer Decl.), Ex. B, 3 of 3, thereto)(Wilson, Joseph)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 USC § 2412 by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Joseph)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 283 USCA for the Federal Circuit Mandate re 279 Notice of Appeal, The parties joint motion for dismissal of the appeal is granted. The joint motion of GlaxoSmithKline and Kappos to vacate the district court's grant of summary judgment and injunction of enforcement of the rescinded rules is denied. (nmck, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 279 Notice of Appeal, filed by The United States Patent and Trademark Office, Jon Dudas, The parties joint motion for dismissal of the appeal is granted. The joint motion of GlaxoSmithKline and Kappos to vacate the district court's grant of summary judgment and injunction of enforcement of the rescinded rules is denied. (nmck, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Opinion of USCA for the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals decided 3/20/09 re 279 Notice of Appeal, Affirmed in part, Vacated in part, and Remanded attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(nmck, )
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 280 USCA for Case Number 08-1352 Federal Circuit for 279 Notice of Appeal, filed by The United States Patent and Trademark Office, Jon Dudas. (nmck, )
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 276 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,, by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Wetzler, Lauren) Modified on 5/8/2008 to edit text that the appeal is going to the Federal Circuit (nmck, ).
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 278 NOTICE of appeal. The filing user selected the wrong event. Notice was selected, and Notice of Appeal should have been selected. The filer user was instructed to re-file the document using the correct event code. (nmck, )
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Wetzler, Lauren)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited Praecipe of Counsel (Reilly, Craig)
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER -For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that:1) 133 Plaintiffs Smithkline Beecham Corporation d/b/a GlaxoSmithKline, et al.'s Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED;2) 135 Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED;3) 125 & 126 Defendants Jon W. Dudas and the United States Patent and Trademark Offices Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED;4) 249 Defendants Jon W. Dudas and the United States Patent and Trademark Office's Motion to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT;5) 244 Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's January 9, 2008 Memorandum Opinion and Order is DENIED AS MOOT.6) the regulations titled Changes to Practice for Continued Examination Filings, Patent Applications Containing Patentably Indistinct Claims, and Examination of Claims in Patent Applications, 72 Fed. Reg. 46,716-843 (Aug. 21, 2007)(to be codified at 37 C.F.R. pt. 1)(the Final Rules) are declared null and void as "otherwise not in accordance with law and in excess of statutory jurisdiction [and] authority, 5 U.S.C. § 706(2); 7) Defendants Jon W. Dudas and the United States Patent and Trademark Office and their agents, servants, and employees are permanently enjoined from implementing the Final Rules set forth in paragraph 6.** THIS ORDER IS FINAL **Signed by Judge District Judge James C. Cacheris on 4/1/2008. (kbro)
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 133 and 135 GSK's and Tafas's Motions for Summary Judgment, 125 and 126 USPTO's Motion for Summary Judgment, and 249 USPTO's Motion to Strike.Signed by Judge District Judge James C. Cacheris on 4/1/2008. (kbro)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/8/08 before Judge James C. Cacheris. Court Reporter: Rhonda F. Montgomery. (klau, )
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris : Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2008 re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas filed by The United States Patent and Trademark Office, Jon Dudas, 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against the "GlaxoSmithKline" Plaintiffs filed by The United States Patent and Trademark Office, Jon Dudas, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited, 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Triantafyllos Tafas, 249 MOTION to Strike filed by The United States Patent and Trademark Office, Jon Dudas: Appearances of counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant. Motions argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Order to follow.(Court Reporter R. Montgomery) (kbro)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 266 Notice to Discontinue receive of Notices of Electronic Filings in this case. The signature block on the Certificate of Service does not match the filing users login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to refile the Certificate of Service and link to document number 266. (klau, )
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 272 RESPONSE in Support re 249 MOTION to Strike filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Wetzler, Lauren)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's 249 MOTION to Strike filed by Ron D. Katznelson. (klau, )
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Letter to Court regarding submission of CD-Rom - Exhibit 2 to Document no. 263 by Triantafyllos Tafas.(CD-Rom on file with Clerk's Office) (klau, )
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Memorandum in Opposition re 249 MOTION to Strike filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Wilson, Joseph)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Memorandum in Opposition re 249 MOTION to Strike filed by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 29# 2 Exhibit 30)(Franco, Craig)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC re 173 Memorandum in Support, of Submission of Exhibit 28 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28)(Franco, Craig)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Notice to Discontinue receipt of Notices of Electronic Filing in this case by Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle (Molino, Timothy)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE by Triantafyllos Tafas re 263 Reply to Response to Motion,, Plaintiff Tafas' Notice of Filing & Service of Video Excerpts Referenced in Exhibit 2 to His Reply to Defendants' Memoranda In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment (Wilson, Joseph)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Supplemental Memorandum and REPLY to Defendants' 260 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Tafas's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order on Tafas's Objection to Magistrate's Ruling filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Tafas' Reply In Support of Motion for Reconsideration on Objection to Mag. Order# 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Tafas' Reply In Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Mag. Ruling)(Wilson, Joseph) Modified on 2/5/2008 to edit text (klau, ).
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 263 REPLY to Response to Motion re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Tafas's Reply in Response to USPTO's Opposition to Tafas's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Tafas Reply in Support of Mot. for Summ. J.# 2 Exhibit Ex 2 to Tafas Reply in Support of Mot. for Summ. J.# 3 Exhibit Ex 3 to Tafas Reply in Support of Mot. for Summ. J.# 4 Exhibit Ex 4 to Tafas Reply in Support of Mot. for Summ. J.# 5 Exhibit Ex 5 to Tafas Reply in Support of Mot. for Summ. J.# 6 Exhibit Ex 6 to Tafas Reply in Support of Mot. for Summ. J.)(Wilson, Joseph)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Reilly, Craig)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 261 RESPONSE in Support re 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against the "GlaxoSmithKline" Plaintiffs, 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Wetzler, Lauren)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Tafas's Motion for Reconsideration filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Wetzler, Lauren)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 259 UNOPPOSED MOTION and Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Page Limit by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baden-Mayer, Joanna) Modified on 2/1/2008 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Notice of Correction re 235 Brief in Support, Additional attachments after NEF sent on 1/10/08 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B# 2 Appendix C# 3 Appendix D# 4 Appendix E# 5 Exhibit 1# 6 Exhibit 2# 7 Exhibit 3# 8 Exhibit 4# 9 Exhibit 5# 10 Exhibit 6# 11 Exhibit 7# 12 Exhibit 8# 13 Exhibit 9# 14 Exhibit 10# 15 Exhibit 11# 16 Exhibit 12# 17 Exhibit 13# 18 Exhibit 14# 19 Exhibit 15 part 1# 20 Exhibit 15 part 2# 21 Exhibit 16# 22 Exhibit 17 part 1# 23 Exhibit 17 part 2# 24 Exhibit 17 part 3# 25 Exhibit 18 part 1# 26 Exhibit 18 part 2# 27 Exhibit 18 part 3# 28 Exhibit 19# 29 Exhibit 20# 30 Exhibit 21# 31 Exhibit 22# 32 Exhibit 23# 33 Exhibit 24# 34 Exhibit 25# 35 Exhibit 26# 36 Exhibit 27)(klau, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER that 236 Motion for Leave to Submit Attachments Electronically is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 1/23/08. (klau, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 AGREED ORDER that the page-limit for each party's brief in opposition to another party's motion for summary judgment is enlarged from 40 pages to 45 pages. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 1/23/08. (klau, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER that the Court shall consider Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas's Motion for Reconsideration without a hearing. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 1/23/08. (klau, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Per JCC chambers motions set for 1/25/08 on papers (clar, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to for Reconsideration re 227 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 226 Memorandum & Opinion, {proper version of Motion--to replace dckt #241} Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2008 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Tafas's Motion for Reconsideration Now Set for 1/25/08or, in the Alternative, Submit Without Hearing by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Hearing continued to 2/8/08)# 2 Proposed Order (Submitted on papers))(Wetzler, Lauren) Modified on 1/25/2008 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 249 MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2008 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 249 MOTION to Strike. The filing user has been notified that the attachment (insert attachment name here, e.g., proposed order, proposed pleading, or exhibits/affidavits) was erroneously combined with the main document (clar, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Memorandum in Opposition re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1# 2 Exhibit Ex 2# 3 Exhibit Ex 3# 4 Exhibit Ex 4# 5 Exhibit Ex 5# 6 Exhibit Ex 6# 7 Exhibit Ex 7# 8 Exhibit Ex 8# 9 Exhibit Ex 9# 10 Exhibit Ex 10# 11 Exhibit Ex 11# 12 Exhibit Ex 12# 13 Exhibit Ex 13# 14 Exhibit Ex 14# 15 Exhibit Ex 15# 16 Exhibit Ex 16# 17 Exhibit Ex 17# 18 Exhibit Ex 18)(Wilson, Joseph)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Memorandum in Opposition re 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against the "GlaxoSmithKline" Plaintiffs filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27)(Reilly, Craig)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Notice of Hearing Date set for 02/08/2008 re 249 MOTION to Strike (Wetzler, Lauren)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Memorandum in Support re 249 MOTION to Strike filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Wetzler, Lauren)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION to Strike by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Wetzler, Lauren)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Certification# 2 Supplemental Index# 3 SA102-SA103)(Wetzler, Lauren)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Memorandum in Opposition re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Triantafyllos Tafas filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 3)# 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 3)# 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3 of 3))(Wetzler, Lauren)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Memorandum in Opposition re 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment of GlaxoSmithKline filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Excerpts of Administrative Record))(Wetzler, Lauren)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 245 Memorandum in Support. The filing user has been notified to link to Pleading #244 Motion for Reconsideration. (klau, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 241 MOTION for Reconsideration re 227 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 226 Memorandum & Opinion,. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2008 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Memorandum in Support of 244 Motion for Reconsideration (proper version) filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Wilson, Joseph) Modified on 1/22/2008 to reflect pleading #244 (klau, ).
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MOTION for Reconsideration re 227 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 226 Memorandum & Opinion, {proper version of Motion--to replace dckt #241} by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Joseph)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE of Correction and to Withdraw Errantly filed Version of Motion for reconsideration (Dkt #241) by Triantafyllos Tafas re 241 MOTION for Reconsideration re 227 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 226 Memorandum & Opinion, (Wilson, Joseph) Modified on 1/22/2008 to reflect the title of docket entry(klau, ).
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Notice of Hearing Date set for 01/25/2008 re 241 MOTION for Reconsideration re 227 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 226 Memorandum & Opinion, (Wilson, Joseph)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION for Reconsideration re 227 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 226 Memorandum & Opinion, by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Joseph)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 240 PRAECIPE by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office (Attachments: # 1 Amended Certification of Administrative Record# 2 Supplemental Index# 3 SA001-020# 4 SA021-038# 5 SA039-077# 6 SA078-101)(Wetzler, Lauren) Modified text on 1/22/2008 (klau, ).
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 CERTIFICATE of Service re 215 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Blair Elizabeth Taylor on behalf of Intellectual Property Owners Association (Taylor, Blair)
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Response to 233 Order,, filed by Public Patent Foundation, Computer and Communications Industry Association, AARP, Consumer Federation of America, Essential Action, Foundation for Taxpayer and Consumer Rights, Initiative for Medicines, Access and Knowledge, Knowledge Ecology International, Prescription Access Litigation, Public Knowledge, Research on Innovation, Software Freedom Law Center. (Schruers, Matthew)
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 238 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/14/07 before Judge James C. Cacheris. Court Reporter: Rhonda F. Montgomery. (tset, ) Modified to change the file date on 1/15/2008 (tset, ).
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER Upon reviewing the Local Civil Rule 7.1 Financial Disclosures filed and the only one that gives me pause is filed by Public Patent Foundation 115 that indicates that AARP states that there is nothing to report under Local Civil 7.1(A)(l)(a) and (b). If this is the American Association of Retired Persons, my wife is a member of that group. Please advise the Court if that in fact is the group involved in the case by Tuesday, January 22,2008. For future reference, courtesy copies of pleadings filed should be sent to chambers. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 1/11/08. (klau, )
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 (Consent) MOTION for Leave to Submit Attachments Electronically by Ron D. Katznelson. (klau, )
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 235 AMICUS Brief/Memorandum in Support to Plaintiffs 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ron D. Katznelson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 CD-Rom (See attachments added on 1/24/08 for the content of CD-Rom) (klau, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2008 (klau, ). Modified on 1/24/2008 to edit text of attachment #2 (klau, ).
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE of Correction to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment by Ron D. Katznelson (klau, )
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that: 98 Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas's Objection to Magistrate Jones's Opinion and Order Denying Tafas's Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas's Notices of Depositions for Senior USPTO Officials is DENIED.Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 1/9/2008. (kbro)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 98 Tafas's Objection to Magistrate Jones's Opinion and Order Denying Tafas's Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas's Notices of Depositions for Senior USPTO Officials. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 1/9/2008. (kbro)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 232 AMICUS Brief in Support of Defendants' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Intellectual Property and Administrative Law and Public Health Professors. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff's 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bar Association of the District of Columbia. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Intellectual Property Owners Association. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Amicus Brief in Supportof the Defendant's Anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Micron Technology, Inc.. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Public Patent Foundation, Computer and Communications Industry Association, AARP, Consumer Federation of America, Essential Action, Foundation for Taxpayer and Consumer Rights, Initiative for Medicines, Access and Knowledge, Knowledge Ecology International, Prescription Access Litigation, Public Knowledge, Research on Innovation, Software Freedom Law Center. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Lelkes. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Teles AG Informationstechnologien. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CropLife America. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CFPH, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dean Alderucci# 2 Attachment A to Declaration of Dean Alderucci)(klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Amicus Brief in Support of The "GSK" Plaintiffs' 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Human Genome Sciences, Inc. (klau, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER that the Motions of 110 Human Genome Sciences, Inc.; 112 Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, and Norseman Group, LLC; 117 CFPH, LLC ; 122 CropLife America; 139 217 Federation Internationale Des Conseils en Propriete Industrielle; 156 Washington Legal Foundation; 153 159 162 BioAdvance, et al. (the "Pennsylvania Greenhouses"); 172 Dr. Ron D. Katznelson; 191 TELES AG Informationstechnologien; and 212 Robert Lelkes for Leave to File Briefs as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. The Motions of 113 Public Patent Foundation, et al.; 130 Micron Technology, Inc.; and 192 Intellectual Property, Administrative Law and Public Health Professors for Leave to File Briefs as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. The Motion of 179 AmberWave Systems Corp., et al. (the "R&D Licensing Companies") for Leave to File a Brief as Amici Curiae on the Issue of the Impact of the Proposed USPTO Rules on Amici' business model is GRANTED. The Motion of 171 Intellectual Property Owners Association for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae on the Issue of Adoption of Final Rule 1.78(f)(2) is GRANTED. The Motion of the 200 Bar Association of the District of Columbia for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae Regarding the Effects of the Final Rules on Established Patent Law and Prosecution is GRANTED. 144 Motion of Polestar Capital Associates, LLC and the Norseman Group, LLC for an extension of Time to December 27, 2007 to file their brief as amicus curiae; and the 129 Motion of CFPH, LLC for Leave to File a Substitute Brief Amicus Curiae are DENIED AS MOOT. 207 Motion of Intel Corporation for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED (see order for details). Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 1/8/08. (klau, )
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 212 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2008 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(klau, )
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 215 Memorandum in Support. The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. (krob )
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle. (rban, )
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief in Support of The Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment by Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Proposed Amicus Brief# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B)(rban, )
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER for Pro hac vice of Mark Alan Lemley Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 100005674. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 1/2/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(rban, )
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Memorandum in Support re 171 MOTION for Leave to File Brief filed by Intellectual Property Owners Association. (Taylor, Blair)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 211 Motion of Ron D. Katznelson for leave to extend Time for filing missing Appendices and Financial Statement.. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 1/2/08. (nmck, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 210 CERTIFICATE of Service re 194 Memorandum in Support of Amicus Curiae Teles AG Informationstechnologien For Leave To File a Brief Supporting Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions by David Wayne Long on behalf of Teles AG Informationstechnologien (Long, David)
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 204 Declaration, The filing user selected the wrong event. Declaration was selected, and Notice/other should have been selected. The docket has been corrected (klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 199 Memorandum in Support, 197 Memorandum in Support, The text has been modified to reflect the correct party/filer of the document. (klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 195 Memorandum in Support, The text has been modified to reflect the correct party/filer of the document.(klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 194 Memorandum in Support. The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. (klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 193 Brief in Support. The filing user has been notified to file future documents with the correct signature block. (klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 171 MOTION for Leave to File Brief, 170 Notice of Appearance. The filing user has been notified to file the memorandum in support separately and link to the motion. The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading. (klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 159 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. The filing user has been notified to refile the attachment (proposed order)and select event Notice/other and link to the motion. (klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 162 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, 159 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, 160 Memorandum in Support, 161 Financial Disclosure Statement, 163 Memorandum in Support, 164 Financial Disclosure Statement, The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading. The text has been modified to reflect the correct party/filer of the document. (klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 157 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support. The filing user selected the wrong event. Motion for Leave to File was selected, and Memorandum in Support should have been selected. The docket has been corrected. (klau, )
December 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 158 Financial Disclosure Statement, 157 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support, 156 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support.The filing user has been notified to file future documents with the correct signature block.The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading. (klau, )
December 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MOTION for Leave to Extend Time for Filing Missing Appendices and Financial Statement by Ron D. Katznelson. (Attachments: # 1 Appendices and Financial Statement) (notified pro se party to notice)(klau, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 153 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, The filing user has been notified to refile the attachment (Proposed Order). (klau, )
December 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Intel Corporation. (Mullins, Maurice)
December 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Memorandum in Support re 207 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed by Intel Corporation. (Mullins, Maurice)
December 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Connection with the Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amicus Brief# 2 Intel Corporation's Amicus Curiae Brief)(Mullins, Maurice) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Memorandum in Support re 212 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Lelkes. (klau, ) Modified on 12/31/2007 to reflect the correct filing date (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Robert Lelkes. (notified pro se party to notice for Friday Docket) (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(klau, ) Modified on 12/31/2007 to correct the filing date(klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Brief in Support re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America as Amicus Curiae (Corrected) filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Dowd, James) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Brief in Support re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America as Amicus Curiae filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Dowd, James) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Notice of Submission of Declaration re 191 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Teles AG Informationstechnologien Brief Supporting The Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion by Teles AG Informationstechnologien. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief)(Long, David) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 203 AMICUS Brief in Support of GSK's 133 Motion for Summary Judgement filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Henry, Kevin) Modified on 12/31/2007 to reflect link to motion #133(klau, ). Modified on 1/9/2008 to reflect Amicus Brief (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 155 Financial Disclosure Statement, 154 Memorandum in Support, 153 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, The text has been modified to reflect the correct party/filer of the document. The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading.(klau, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE by Intellectual Property Owners Association Financial Disclosure Statement (Taylor, Blair)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Memorandum in Support re 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Bar Association of the District of Columbia. (Bertin, Robert)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief Regarding the Effects of the Final Rules on Established Patent Law and Prosecution by Bar Association of the District of Columbia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave of Amicus Curiae Bar Association of the District of Columbia for Leave to File Amicus Brief# 2 Exhibit Brief for Amicus Curiae Bar Association of the District of Columbia in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Permanent Injunction Against United States Patent Office Final Rules)(Bertin, Robert) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Brief in Support re plaintiffs' 133 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Appendix to Schilberg Declaration# 3 Exhibit # 4 Appendix to Billingsley Declaration# 5 Exhibit # 6 Appendix to Manzetti Declaration# 7 Exhibit)(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/31/2007 to include all relevant parties and link to motion #135 as well (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 198 AMICUS Brief/Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ron D. Katznelson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(klau, ) Modified on 1/9/2008 to reflect Amicus Brief(klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Brief in Support re plaintiffs' 133 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Appendix to Schilberg Declaration# 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit to Billingsley Declaration# 5 Exhibit # 6 Appendix to Manzetti Declaration# 7 Exhibit)(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/31/2007 to include all relevant parties and link to motion #135 as well (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Brief in Support to 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Valspar Corporation, General Mills, Inc., Donaldson Company, Inc., Ecolab Inc., Anchor Wall Systems, Inc.. (Toof, Jackson)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 192 MOTION for Leave to File, This document was filed on paper by the attorney and scanned by the clerks office. The attorney has been notified of this error. Attorney notified to register for e-filing. (klau, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 195 AMICUS Brief in Support re 133 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Appendix to Schilberg Declaration# 3 Exhibit # 4 Appendix to Billingsley Declaration# 5 Exhibit # 6 Appendix to Manzetti Declaration# 7 Exhibit)(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/31/2007 to include all relevant parties and link to motion #135 as well (klau, ). Modified on 1/9/2008 to reflect Amicus Brief(klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 180 Memorandum in Support, 179 MOTION for Leave to File, This document was filed on paper by the attorney and scanned by the clerks office. The attorney has been notified of this error. (klau, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Memorandum in Support re 191 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Teles AG Informationstechnologien Brief Supporting The Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion filed by Teles AG Informationstechnologien. (Long, David)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 193 AMICUS Brief in Support Plaintiff's 133 135 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AmberWave Systems Corporation, Fallbrook Technologies Inc., InterDigital Communications LLC, Nano-Terra Inc., Tessera, Inc.. (Evens, Mark) Modified on 12/31/2007 to reflect the link to plaintiffs' motion of summary judgment(klau, ). Modified on 1/9/2008 to reflect Amicus Brief (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Teles AG Informationstechnologien Brief Supporting The Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion by Teles AG Informationstechnologien. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(Long, David)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Tessera, Inc.. (Evens, Mark)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Nano-Terra Inc.. (Evens, Mark)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by InterDigital Communications LLC. (Evens, Mark)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Fallbrook Technologies Inc.. (Evens, Mark)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AmberWave Systems Corporation. (Evens, Mark)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Brief in Support to 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supporting Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions in these consolidated actions filed by American Intellectual Property Law Association. (O'Brien, Thomas)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Teles AG Informationstechnologien. (Long, David)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by David Wayne Long on behalf of Teles AG Informationstechnologien (Long, David)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Brief in Support re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CropLife America. (Maginnis, John) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Brief in Support re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Carl Battle In Support of Elan's Memorandum)(Pivnick, Scott) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Submission by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC re 173 Memorandum in Support, Exhibits 21-27 to Amici Brief in Support of Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21# 2 Exhibit 22# 3 Exhibit 23# 4 Exhibit 24# 5 Exhibit 25# 6 Exhibit 26# 7 Exhibit 27.1# 8 Exhibit 27.2# 9 Exhibit 27.3)(Franco, Craig) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 177 AMICUS Brief Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC re 173 Amicus Brief, Exhibits 13-20 to Amici Brief in Support of Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13# 2 Exhibit 14# 3 Exhibit 15# 4 Exhibit 16.1# 5 Exhibit 16.2# 6 Exhibit 17# 7 Exhibit 18# 8 Exhibit 19# 9 Exhibit 20.1# 10 Exhibit 20.2)(Franco, Craig) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ). Modified on 1/9/2008 to reflect Exhibits to Amicus Brief (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Brief in Support re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Monsanto Company. (Miller, Randall) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Brief in Support re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization. (Miller, Randall) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 174 AMICUS Brief Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs Summary Judgment by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC re 173 Amicus Brief , Exhibits 9-12 to Amici Brief in Support of Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9.1# 2 Exhibit 9.2# 3 Exhibit 9.3# 4 Exhibit 9.4# 5 Exhibit 9.5# 6 Exhibit 9.6# 7 Exhibit 10# 8 Exhibit 11# 9 Exhibit 12)(Franco, Craig) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ). Modified on 1/9/2008 to reflect Exhibits to Amicus Brief (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 173 AMICUS Brief in Support plaintiffs 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Franco, Craig) Modified text on 12/31/2007 (klau, ). Modified on 1/9/2008 to reflect Amicus Brief (klau, ).
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 149 Financial Disclosure Statement, 151 Financial Disclosure Statement, 150 Financial Disclosure Statement, 152 Financial Disclosure Statement, 148 Financial Disclosure Statement, The text has been modified to reflect the correct party/filer of the document. The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading(klau, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 147 Memorandum in Support, The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading. (klau, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 146 Notice of Appearance, The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading. (klau, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment by Ron D. Katznelson. (klau, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION for Leave to File Brief by Intellectual Property Owners Association. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Supporting Motion for Leave to File# 2 Proposed Order # 3 IPO Amicus Brief# 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Taylor, Blair)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair Elizabeth Taylor on behalf of Intellectual Property Owners Association Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Taylor, Blair)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Memorandum of Law in Support of 92 Amended/Modified MOTION of for Leave to File a Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgement filed by Intellectual Property Institute of William Mitchell College of Law. (Gorenstein, Charles) Modified on 12/31/2007 to reflect the link to the correct motion(klau, ).
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER 145 Motion for Leave to File A Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment by the Valspar Corporation, General Mills, Inc., Donaldson Company, Inc., Ecolab Inc., and anchor Wall Systems, Inc. ("Minnesota Amici") is hereby GRANTED. The brief of the Minnesota Amici shall shall be due on December 27, 2007, along with the other amicus curlae briefs, pursuant to the Court's order of December 18, 2007. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 12/26/07. (klau, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 145 MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment. The text has been modified to reflect the correct party/filer of the document. (klau, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 145 MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment. The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading. (klau, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 144 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. The filing user has been notified to file the document separately for each motion relief.(klau, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 136 First MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS ANTICIPATED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 138 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement. 139 First MOTION for Leave to File , 140 Memorandum in Support re 139 First MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS ANTICIPATED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The signature block on the documents does not match the filing users login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to refile all documents. (klau, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 122 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. The filing user has been notified to file memorandum in support as a seperate pleading and link to the motion for future filing. (klau, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 117 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Summary Judgment Motions The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading.(klau, )
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC. (Franco, Craig)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Norseman Group, LLC. (Franco, Craig)
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against the "GlaxoSmithKline" Plaintiffs, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2008 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re 116 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Page Limit. ORDERED that paragraph 1 of the Amended Order dated December 5, 2007 is hereby modified so as to permit Plaintiff GSK to file an initial summary judgment brief not to exceed forty-five (45) pages. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 12/21/07. (klau, )
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/31/2007 to inclued all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Memorandum in Support re 162 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/31/2007 reflect the correct motion and include all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/31/2007 to include all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/31/2007 to include all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Memorandum in Support re 159 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/31/2007 to link to the correct motion and include all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified text on 12/31/2007 and include all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Washington Legal Foundation. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Henry, Kevin)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Memorandum in Support of 156 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support by Washington Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Henry, Kevin) Modified on 12/31/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of GSK's Anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment by Washington Legal Foundation. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Henry, Kevin) Modified on 12/31/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bioadvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/27/2007 to reflect all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Memorandum in Support re 153 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Bioadvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse . Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/27/2007 to reflect all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by BioAdvance, Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gill, Robert) Modified on 12/27/2007 to reflect all relevant parties (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ecolab Inc. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Toof, Jackson) Modified on 12/27/2007 to reflect the correct party (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Donaldson Company Inc. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Toof, Jackson) Modified on 12/27/2007 to refect the correct party (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by General Mills, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Toof, Jackson) Modified on 12/27/2007 to reflect the correct party (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) . by Anchor Wall Systems, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Toof, Jackson) Modified on 12/27/2007 to reflect the correct party (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Valspar Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Toof, Jackson)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Memorandum in Support re 145 MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Valspar Corporation. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Toof, Jackson) Modified on 12/27/2007 to reflect the link to motion #145 (klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Carrington Bass, III on behalf of AmberWave Systems Corporation, Fallbrook Technologies Inc., InterDigital Communications LLC, Nano-Terra Inc., Tessera, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Bass, Kenneth)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment by Valspar Corporation. General Mills, Inc., Donaldson Company, Inc., Ecolab Inc., and Anchor Wall Sustems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Toof, Jackson) Modified on 12/26/2007 to include all relevant parties(klau, ).
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC. (Franco, Craig)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 112 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief and for Extension of Time The filing user has been notified to file the document separately for each motion relief. (klau, )
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Correction to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Triantafyllos Tafas re 141 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Affidavit Tafas Declaration# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E-1# 8 Exhibit E-2# 9 Exhibit F-1# 10 Exhibit F-2# 11 Exhibit G-1# 12 Exhibit G-2# 13 Exhibit G-3# 14 Exhibit G-4# 15 Exhibit G-5# 16 Exhibit G-6# 17 Exhibit G-7# 18 Exhibit G-8# 19 Exhibit H# 20 Exhibit I# 21 Exhibit J# 22 Exhibit K# 23 Exhibit L-1# 24 Exhibit L-2# 25 Exhibit L-3# 26 Exhibit M-1# 27 Exhibit M-2# 28 Exhibit M-3# 29 Exhibit M-4# 30 Errata N# 31 Affidavit Fenili Declaration# 32 Exhibit A# 33 Exhibit B-D# 34 Affidavit Rueda Declaration# 35 Exhibit 1# 36 Exhibit 2# 37 Exhibit 3# 38 Exhibit 4-a# 39 Exhibit 4-b# 40 Exhibit 5# 41 Exhibit 6# 42 Exhibit 7# 43 Exhibit 7-a# 44 Exhibit 8# 45 Exhibit 9# 46 Exhibit 10# 47 Exhibit 11# 48 Exhibit 12# 49 Exhibit 13# 50 Exhibit 13-a# 51 Exhibit 14# 52 Exhibit 14-a# 53 Exhibit 15# 54 Exhibit 16# 55 Exhibit 17# 56 Exhibit 18-a# 57 Exhibit 18-b# 58 Exhibit 18-c# 59 Exhibit 19# 60 Exhibit 20# 61 Exhibit 21# 62 Exhibit 22# 63 Exhibit 23-a# 64 Exhibit 23-b# 65 Exhibit 23-c# 66 Exhibit 23-d# 67 Exhibit 24# 68 Exhibit 25-a# 69 Exhibit 25-b# 70 Exhibit 26# 71 Exhibit 27# 72 Exhibit 28# 73 Exhibit 29-a# 74 Exhibit 28-b# 75 Exhibit 30# 76 Exhibit 31-a# 77 Exhibit 31-b# 78 Exhibit 32# 79 Exhibit 33-a# 80 Exhibit 33-b# 81 Exhibit 34# 82 Exhibit 35-a# 83 Exhibit 35-b# 84 Exhibit 35-c# 85 Exhibit 35-d# 86 Exhibit 35-e# 87 Exhibit 35-f# 88 Exhibit 35-g# 89 Exhibit 36# 90 Exhibit 37# 91 Exhibit 38# 92 Exhibit 39-a# 93 Exhibit 39-b# 94 Exhibit 39-c# 95 Exhibit 40-a# 96 Exhibit 40-b# 97 Exhibit 40-c# 98 Exhibit 41# 99 Exhibit 42# 100 Exhibit 43)(Baden-Mayer, Joanna) Modified on 12/26/2007 to reflect the title of docked entry (klau, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION of Amici Curiae for Leave to File Brief in Support of the Defendants' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment by Intellectual Property and Administrative Law Professors. (Attachments: # 1 Propsed Brief)(klau, )
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Memorandum in Support re 179 MOTION for Leave to File filed by AmberWave Systems Corporation, Fallbrook Technologies Inc., InterDigital Communications LLC, Nano-Terra Inc., Tessera, Inc.. (klau, )
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION of Amicus Curiae for Leave to File a Brief on the Issue of the Impact of the Proposed USPTO Rules on AMICI'Business Model by AmberWave Systems Corporation, Fallbrook Technologies Inc., InterDigital Communications LLC, Nano-Terra Inc., Tessera, Inc.. (klau, )
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Memorandum in Support re 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-1# 2 Exhibit 1-2# 3 Exhibit 1-3# 4 Exhibit 1-4# 5 Exhibit 1-5# 6 Exhibit 1-6# 7 Exhibit 1-7# 8 Exhibit 1-8# 9 Exhibit 2# 10 Exhibit 3# 11 Exhibit 4# 12 Exhibit 5# 13 Exhibit 6# 14 Exhibit 7# 15 Exhibit 8# 16 Exhibit 9# 17 Exhibit 10# 18 Exhibit 11# 19 Exhibit 12# 20 Exhibit 13# 21 Exhibit 14# 22 Exhibit 15# 23 Exhibit 16# 24 Exhibit 17# 25 Exhibit 18# 26 Exhibit 19# 27 Exhibit 20# 28 Exhibit 21# 29 Exhibit 22# 30 Exhibit 23# 31 Exhibit 24-1# 32 Exhibit 24-2# 33 Exhibit 24-3# 34 Exhibit 24-4# 35 Exhibit 25# 36 Exhibit 26-1# 37 Exhibit 26-2)(Reilly, Craig)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Brief in Support to 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Part 1# 2 Affidavit Part 2# 3 Affidavit Part 3)(Baden-Mayer, Joanna)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 AMICUS Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' 133 {135] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS ANTICIPATED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT# 2 Exhibit B to BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS ANTICIPATED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Molino, Timothy) Modified on 1/9/2008 to reflect Amicus Brief (klau, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 First MOTION for Leave to File by Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Molino, Timothy)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle. (Molino, Timothy)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Notice of Hearing Date re 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Baden-Mayer, Joanna)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 First MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PLAINTIFFS ANTICIPATED MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Fdration Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Molino, Timothy)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baden-Mayer, Joanna)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Notice of Hearing Date set for February 8, 2008 re 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reilly, Craig)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Mullins, Maurice)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Memorandum in Support re 130 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Mullins, Maurice)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Allowing Filng of Amicus Brief# 2 Brief of Amicus Curiae Micron Technology, Inc.)(Mullins, Maurice) Modified on 12/26/2007 re notifed counsel to notice for Friday Docket (klau, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Substitute Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Summary Judgment Motions by CFPH, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Link, Jonathan) Modified on 12/26/2007 to notify counsel to notice(klau, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Notice of Hearing Date set for 02/08/08 re 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against the "GlaxoSmithKline" Plaintiffs, 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas (Wetzler, Lauren)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Memorandum in Support re 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against the "GlaxoSmithKline" Plaintiffs, 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 4)# 3 Exhibit 2 (part 2 of 4)# 4 Exhibit 2 (part 3 of 4)# 5 Exhibit 2 (part 4 of 4)# 6 Exhibit 3# 7 Exhibit 4a# 8 Exhibit 4b# 9 Exhibit 4c# 10 Exhibit 4d# 11 Exhibit 4e)(Wetzler, Lauren)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against the "GlaxoSmithKline" Plaintiffs by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wetzler, Lauren)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wetzler, Lauren)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CropLife America. (Maginnis, John)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by CropLife America. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief# 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief)(Maginnis, John)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Maginnis, III on behalf of CropLife America (Maginnis, John)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CFPH, LLC. (Link, Jonathan)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of filing Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions by CFPH, LLC re 117 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Summary Judgment Motions of Brief of Amicus Curiae CFPH, LLC in Support of Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Dean Alderucci# 2 Exhibit Attachment A to Declaration of Dean Alderucci)(Link, Jonathan) Modified on 12/26/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Memorandum in Support re 117 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Summary Judgment Motions filed by CFPH, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Link, Jonathan) Modified on 12/26/2007 to correct the link to the correct motion (klau, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Summary Judgment Motions by CFPH, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Link, Jonathan)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Page Limit by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) Modified text on 12/26/2007 (klau, ).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Public Patent Foundation, Computer and Communications Industry Association, AARP, Consumer Federation of America, Essential Action, Foundation for Taxpayer and Consumer Rights, Initiative for Medicines, Access and Knowledge, Knowledge Ecology International, Prescription Access Litigation, Public Knowledge, Research on Innovation, Software Freedom Law Center. (Schruers, Matthew)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Memorandum in Support re 113 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants' Anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Public Patent Foundation, Computer and Communications Industry Association, AARP, Consumer Federation of America, Essential Action, Foundation for Taxpayer and Consumer Rights, Initiative for Medicines, Access and Knowledge, Knowledge Ecology International, Prescription Access Litigation, Public Knowledge, Research on Innovation, Software Freedom Law Center. (Schruers, Matthew)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants' Anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment by Public Patent Foundation, Computer and Communications Industry Association, AARP, Consumer Federation of America, Essential Action, Foundation for Taxpayer and Consumer Rights, Initiative for Medicines, Access and Knowledge, Knowledge Ecology International, Prescription Access Litigation, Public Knowledge, Research on Innovation, Software Freedom Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Brief of Amici Curiae)(Schruers, Matthew)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re 108 Unopposed Motion for Amendment of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Request for Expedited Consideration, ORDERED that: 1) paragraph 1 of the Amended Order dated December 5, 2007 is hereby modified so as to permit Plaintiff Triantafyllos Tafas to file an initial summary judgment brief not to exceed fifty (50) pages. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 12/19/07. (klau, )
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief and for Extension of Time by Polestar Capital Associates, LLC, Norseman Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Franco, Craig)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Human Genome Sciences, Inc.. (Scully, Robert)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment by Human Genome Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Amicus Brief)(Scully, Robert)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER the Motions of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufactures of America, Biotechnology Industry Organization, 86 Monsanto Company, 92 Intellectual Property Institute of William Mitchell College of Law, and 96 Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc for Leave to File Briefs as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. 103 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief on the Issue of Retroactivity of the New Rules by American Intellectual Property Law Association is GRANTED, any brief of amicus curiae shall be filed byDecember 27, 2007, and shall not exceed twenty (20) pages in length. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 12/18/07. (klau, )
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 UNOPPOSED MOTION and Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Amendment of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Request for Expedited Consideration by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baden-Mayer, Joanna) Modified on 12/19/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Cacheris : Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2007 re 98 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Jones' Opinion and Order Denying Tafas' Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas' Notices of Depositions filed by Triantafyllos Tafas:Appearance of counsel for Pltf and Deft. Motion argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery) (kbro)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Response to 98 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Jones' Opinion and Order Denying Tafas' Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas' Notices of Depositions filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Reilly, Craig)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 104 Memorandum in Support, 103 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief on the Issue of Retroactivity of the New Rules. The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading. (klau, )
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Opposition to Plaintiff Tafas' 98 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Jones' Opinion and Order Denying Tafas' Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas' Notices of Depositions filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2 (part 1)# 3 Exhibit 2 (part 2)# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4)(Wetzler, Lauren) Modified text on 12/13/2007 (klau, ).
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Memorandum in Support re 103 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief on the Issue of Retroactivity of the New Rules filed by American Intellectual Property Law Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(O'Brien, Thomas) Modified on 12/12/2007 to link to Motion (klau, ).
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief on the Issue of Retroactivity of the New Rules by American Intellectual Property Law Association. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(O'Brien, Thomas)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ANSWER to Verified Amended Complaint of SmithKline Beecham Plaintiffs by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office.(Wetzler, Lauren) Modified text on 12/11/2007 (klau, ).
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 98 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Jones' Opinion and Order Denying Tafas' Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas' Notices of Depositions Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2007 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Notice of Hearing Date set for December 14, 2007 re 98 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Jones' Opinion and Order Denying Tafas' Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas' Notices of Depositions (Baden-Mayer, Joanna)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Memorandum in Support re 98 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Jones' Opinion and Order Denying Tafas' Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas' Notices of Depositions filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Exhibit # 20 Exhibit # 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit # 23 Exhibit # 24 Exhibit # 25 Exhibit # 26 Exhibit # 27 Exhibit # 28 Exhibit # 29 Exhibit # 30 Exhibit # 31 Exhibit # 32 Exhibit # 33 Exhibit # 34 Exhibit)(Baden-Mayer, Joanna)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION Objections to Magistrate Jones' Opinion and Order Denying Tafas' Motion to Compel and Quashing Tafas' Notices of Depositions by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baden-Mayer, Joanna)
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Memorandum in Support re 96 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions For Summary Judgment filed by Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Pivnick, Scott)
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions For Summary Judgment by Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pivnick, Scott)
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 This amended order correct a typographical error in the order entered on 11/29/2007. ORDERED that the parties and amici curiae proceed on the following schedule: 1. Plaintiffs and defendants shall file cross-motions for summary judgment on or before 12/20/07. Briefs shall not exceed 40 pages in length. 2. Any and all amici curiae who wish to file briefs in support of the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment shall file their briefs no later than 12/20/07. Each brief of amicus curiae shall not exceed 20 pages in length. 3. Plaintiffs and defendants shall file briefs in opposition to the opposing parties' cross-motions for summary judgment, and in the response to the briefs of amici curiae, on or before 1/22/08. Briefs shall not exceed 40 pages in length. 4. Plaintiffs and defendants shall file any rebuttal briefs by 2/1/08. Briefs shall not exceed 25 pages in length. The parties shall notice a hearing for 2/8/08 at 10am. If, as of 1/31/07, lead GSK counsel still expects to be in trial on 2/8/08, the parties shall confer with Judge Cacheris's chambers and re-notice a hearing for the first Friday following 2/15 that Judge Cacheris is available and GSK counsel is not in trial, or shall agree to have the matter taken on the papers. 6. No other summary judgment briefs by the parties or amici curiae shall be filed without leave of court. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 12/5/2007. (rban, )
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/27/07 before Magistrate Judge T. Rawles Jones, Jr.. Court Reporter: Norman B. Linnell. (tset, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2007 (tset, ).
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER that the parties and amici curiae proceed on the following schedule: 1. Plaintiffs and defendants shall file cross-motions for summary judgment on or before Thursday, December 20, 2007. 2. Any and all amici curiae who wish to file briefs in support of the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment shall file their briefs no later than Thursday, December 20, 2007 ---- 5. The Parties shall notice a hearing for Friday, February 8, 2007, at 10:00 a.m. ----- 6. No other summary judgment briefs by the parties or amici curiae shall be filed without leave of court (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 11/29/07. (klau, )
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Amended/Modified MOTION of for Leave to File a Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgement by Intellectual Property Institute of William Mitchell College of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gorenstein, Charles) Modified text on 11/30/2007 (klau, ).
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 60 Motion for issuance of briefing schedule; denying 70 Motion for privilege log ; denying 75 Motion to Compel; denying 80 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 11/28/07. (ctat, )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 89 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgement, The text has been modified to reflect the correct party/filer of the document. The filing user has been reminded that pursuant to Order 10/30/07, pleadings are only to be docketed in case 1:07cv846 and to answer "NO" when the system asks to "Spread Text" when docketing a pleading. (klau, )
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2007 re 75 MOTION to Compel to Complete Administrative Record filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited, 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order filed by The United States Patent and Trademark Office, Jon Dudas, 70 MOTION To Order a Privilege Log filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited, 80 MOTION to Compel filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. Appearance of counsel. Motions argued. Pltfs are not entitled to discovery. Pltfs' motions (nos. 70, 75 & 80) are denied. Deft's motion (no. 60) is granted. Order and memorandum opinion to follow. (Tape #FTR.) (ctat, )
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION of Amicus Curaiae Intellectual Property Institute of William Mitchell College of Law for Leave to File a Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgement by Intellectual Property Institute of William Mitchell College of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Gorenstein, Charles) Modified text on 11/28/2007 (klau, ). (called counsel to notice)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Monsanto Company. (Miller, Randall)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Memorandum in Support re 86 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Monsanto Company for Leave to File a Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions For Summary Judgment filed by Monsanto Company. (Miller, Randall) Modified text on 11/28/2007 (klau, ).
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION of Amicus Curiae Monsanto Company for Leave to File a Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions For Summary Judgment by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Randall) Modified text on 11/28/2007 (klau, ). (called counsel to notice) Modified on 12/3/2007 to reflect that this is a consent motion per counsel (klau, ).
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Objection to Plaintiff Tafas Submitting Transcripts of Audio-Visual Clips filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wetzler, Lauren)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Opposition to Plaintiff Dr. Tafas's 80 MOTION to Compel filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Wetzler, Lauren) Modified on 11/28/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry(klau, ).
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Omnibus Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 75 MOTION to Compel to Complete Administrative Record filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1, Pt. 1 (Index of Admin Record)# 3 Exhibit 1, Pt. 2# 4 Exhibit 2 (Transcript Excerpt))(Wetzler, Lauren) Modified on 11/28/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 74 Response, The filing user selected the wrong event. Response was selected, and Memorandum in Opposition should have been selected. The docket has been corrected. (klau, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 80 MOTION to Compel. The filing user has been notified that the attachment (proposed order,) was erroneously combined with the main document. (clar, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 70 MOTION To Order a Privilege Log, 75 MOTION to Compel to Complete Administrative Record, 80 MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/16/07 before Judge T. Rawles Jones, Jr.. Court Reporter: Norman B. Linnell. (klau, )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/27/2007 re 80 MOTION to Compel (Wilson, Joseph)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Compel by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Wilson, Joseph)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Notices For Depositions of Senior U.S. PTO Officials re 66 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Tafas' Supplemental Brief In Support of Notices for Depositions of Senior U.S. PTO Officials# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Tafas' Supplemental Brief In Support of Notices for Depositions of Senior U.S. PTO Officials# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Tafas' Supplemental Brief In Support of Notices for Depositions of Senior U.S. PTO Officials# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Tafas' Supplemental Brief In Support of Notices for Depositions of Senior U.S. PTO Officials)(Wilson, Joseph) Modified on 11/23/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Supplemental Memorandum Concerning Presumption of Regularity in APA Proceedings and Availability of Discovery on Constitutional Claims re 66 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Wilson, Joseph) Modified on 11/23/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Brief in Support to 75 MOTION to Compel to Complete Administrative Record filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D Part 1 of 2# 5 Exhibit D Part 2 of 2# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N)(Reilly, Craig)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Notice of Hearing Date set for November 27, 2007 re 75 MOTION to Compel to Complete Administrative Record (Reilly, Craig)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Compel to Complete Administrative Record by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 70 MOTION To Order a Privilege Log on the Administrative Record filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Wetzler, Lauren) Modified on 11/21/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Supplemental Memorandum Addressing Need for Defendants to Furnish a Privilege Log Concerning Matter Withheld from the Administrative Record Based on Privilege re 66 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Wilson, Joseph) Modified on 11/21/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Memorandum in Support of its 70 MOTION for Entry of an Order Requiring Defendants to Submit a Privilege Log filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Reilly, Craig) Modified on 11/23/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Notice of Hearing Date set for November 27, 2007 re 70 MOTION To Order a Privilege Log (Reilly, Craig)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Entry of an Order Requiring Defendants to Submit a Privilege Log by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) Modified on 11/23/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE by Triantafyllos Tafas of Correction to Plaintiff Dr. Triantayllos Taffas' 66 Memorandum in Opposition to 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 27 to Tafas' Mem. In Opp. to Motion for Expedited Schedule# 2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 28 to Tafas' Mem. In Opp. to Motion for Expedited Schedule# 3 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 29 to Tafas' Mem. In Opp. to Motion for Expedited Schedule# 4 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 30 to Tafas' Mem. In Opp. to Motion for Expedited Schedule)(Wilson, Joseph) Modified on 11/19/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2007 re 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order filed by The United States Patent and Trademark Office, Jon Dudas. Appearances of Counsel for Pltf and Deft. Motion argued and taken under advisement and continued to 11/27/2007 at 10:00 am. Set Hearing as to 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order: Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr.(Tape #FTR.) (jlan)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of Service re 66 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,, by Joseph Dale Wilson, III on behalf of Triantafyllos Tafas (Wilson, Joseph)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Memorandum in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Tafas Opp.# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Tafas Opp.# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, pt. 1 of 3, to Tafas Opp.# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, pt. 3 of 3, to Tafas Opp.# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, pt. 3 of 3, to Tafas Opp.# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Tafas Opp.# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, pt. 1 of 5, to Tafas Opp.# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, pt. 2 of 5, to Tafas Opp.# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, pt. 3 of 5, to Tafas Opp.# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 5, pt. 4 of 5, to Tafas Opp.# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 5, pt. 5 of 5, to Tafas Opp.# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Tafas Opp.# 13 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Tafas Opp.# 14 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Tafas Opp.# 15 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Tafas Opp.# 16 Exhibit Exhibit 10, pt. 1 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 17 Exhibit Exhibit 10, pt. 2 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 18 Exhibit Exhibit 10, pt. 3 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 19 Exhibit Exhibit 10, pt. 4 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 20 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Tafas Opp.# 21 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Tafas Opp.# 22 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Tafas Opp.# 23 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Tafas Opp.# 24 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Tafas Opp.# 25 Exhibit Exhibit 16, pt. 1 of 3, to Tafas Opp.# 26 Exhibit Exhibit 16, pt. 2 of 3, to Tafas Opp.# 27 Exhibit Exhibit 16, pt. 3 of 3, to Tafas Opp.# 28 Exhibit Exhibit 17, pt. 1 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 29 Exhibit Exhibit 17, pt. 2 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 30 Exhibit Exhibit 17, pt. 3 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 31 Exhibit Exhibit 17, pt. 4 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 32 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to Tafas Opp.# 33 Exhibit Exhibit 19 to Tafas Opp.# 34 Exhibit Exhibit 20 to Tafas Opp.# 35 Exhibit Exhibit 21, pt. 1 of 2, to Tafas Opp.# 36 Exhibit Exhibit 21, pt. 2 of 2, to Tafas Opp.# 37 Exhibit Exhibit 22 to Tafas Opp.# 38 Exhibit Exhibit 23 to Tafas Opp.# 39 Exhibit Exhibit 24 to Tafas Opp.# 40 Exhibit Exhibit 25 to Tafas Opp.# 41 Exhibit Exhibit 26, pt. 1 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 42 Exhibit Exhibit 26, pt. 2 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 43 Exhibit Exhibit 26, pt. 3 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 44 Exhibit Exhibit 26, pt. 4 of 4, to Tafas Opp.# 45 Exhibit Exhibit 27 to Tafas Opp.# 46 Exhibit Exhibit 28 to Tafas Opp.# 47 Exhibit Exhibit 29 to Tafas Opp.# 48 Exhibit Exhibit 30 to Tafas Opp.# 49 Exhibit Exhibit 31 to Tafas Opp.# 50 Exhibit Exhibit 32 to Tafas Opp.)(Wilson, Joseph)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint of Triantafyllos Tafas by The United States Patent and Trademark Office.(Wetzler, Lauren)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 58 Objection to 55 Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss to Being Without Prejudice, Deft's notice of withdrawal of partial motion to dismiss (#55) Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 63 Memorandum in Opposition, Notified attorney Craig Reilly not to spread the docket entry to the member case 07cv1008, order dated 10/30/07 stating that "all future pleading be filed in the lead case 1:07cv846". (klau, )
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Response to 58 Objection filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Wetzler, Lauren)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Memorandum in Opposition re (60 in 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ) 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Reilly, Craig) Modified on 11/14/2007 to reflect the link to Pleading #60 (klau, ).
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order MOTIONS 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order REFERRED to Judge Jones. (clar, )
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/16/07 re 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order (Wetzler, Lauren)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Memorandum in Support re 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Wetzler, Lauren)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Issuance of Proposed Briefing Schedule in Lieu of a Standard Initial Scheduling Order by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wetzler, Lauren)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Elizabeth Baden-Mayer on behalf of Triantafyllos Tafas (Baden-Mayer, Joanna)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Objection to 55 Withdraw of Motion Objection to Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss to Being Without Prejudice filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Wilson, Joseph) Modified text on 11/14/2007 (clar, ).
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Withdraw of Motion by all defendants re 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Wetzler, Lauren) Modified on 11/6/2007 to reflect the link of Motion (klau, ).
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Bahr by Triantafyllos Tafas.(Wilson, Joseph)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John J. Love by Triantafyllos Tafas.(Wilson, Joseph)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jon W. Dudas by Triantafyllos Tafas.(Wilson, Joseph)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John J. Doll by Triantafyllos Tafas.(Wilson, Joseph)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting application for Vincent James Napoleon to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 100004479. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 11/2/07. (Attachments: # 1 Letter# 2 Receipt)(klau, )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting application for Jerry Robin Selinger to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 100004480. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 11/2/07. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt # 2 Letter)(klau, )
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER in accordance w/Memo Opinion Deft Motion to Strike Exhibit E of the Memo in Support of Pltf Motion for Prelim Inj is denied. 33 Motion for Leave to File; 36 Motion for Leave to File; and 39 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Briefs in Support of Pltf Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction are granted. Pltf Motion for Preliminary Injunction is granted. Defts are preliminarily enjoined from implementing the Final Rules titled "Changes to Practice for Continued Examination Failings, Patent Applications Containing Patentably Indistince Claims, and Examination of Claims in Patent Applications". Defts are prelimiarily enjoined from issuing new regulations restricting the number of continuing applications, the number of requests for continued examinaation and the number of claims that mey be filed w/the PTO. This Order shall expire upon the entryof a final judgment in this matter unless otherwise ordered by the Court.. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/31/07. (jsol, )
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION for reasons stated the Court will grant GSK Motion for Preliminary Injunction; deny the PTO Motion to Strike Exhibit E of the Memo in Support of GSK Motion; grant the Motion of Amicus Curiae ALPLA for Leave to File Brief in Support of GSK Motion; grant HEXAS, The Roskamp Institute and Tikva Joint Motion in Support of Motionfor Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of GSK Motion and grant the Motion of Amicus Curiae Elan Pharmaceutical Corp for Leave to File Brief in Support of GSK Motion. An Order will issue.. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/31/07. (jsol, )
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 39 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. The filing user has been notified that the memorandum in support should be filed separately and link to the appropriate motion on future filing. (klau, )
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDMENT TO JOINT STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE that the Court enter the following amendment to the Joint Stipulation and Consent Order by substituting in paragraph 1 and 2 below in lieu of the existing paragraphs, all other terms remaining the same: 1. Plaintiff will file his opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss dated October 4, 2007 on or before Friday, October 26, 2007. 2. Defendants will file their reply to any opposition by Plaintiff to Defendants' motion to dismiss on or before Wednesday, November 7, 2007 (see order for details). Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/30/07. (klau, )
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 39 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2007 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial). Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2007 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Jeffrey Pivnick on behalf of Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Pivnick, Scott)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER upon consideration of the order of October 17, 2007, and filing of documents in both cases, it is accordingly ORDERED that all future pleading be filed in the lead case 1:07cv846 and the docket shall reflect the consolidation of all parties and counsel. Member case 1:07cv1008 shall remain open until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/30/07. (klau, )
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of Service re 44 Response by Joseph Dale Wilson, III on behalf of Triantafyllos Tafas (Wilson, Joseph)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Reply To Defts' Mem. In Opp. To Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. #46 in 1:07cv1008] and in Further Support of Entry of Preliminary Injunction filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Wilson, Joseph)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Service re 31 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, by Joseph Dale Wilson, III on behalf of Triantafyllos Tafas (Wilson, Joseph)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/09/07 re 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) (Wetzler, Lauren) Modified text on 10/31/2007 (klau, ).
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Carr, Rebecca)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 31, 2007 re (52 in 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ, 39 in 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ) MOTION for Leave to File Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Carr, Rebecca)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of the "GSK" Plaintiffs' Motion for A temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave# 2 Exhibit Elan's Amicus Brief# 3 Exhibit Battle Declaration to Amicus Brief# 4 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Carr, Rebecca) Modified on 10/31/2007 to reflect the title of docket entry (klau, ).
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Biotechnology Industry Organization. (Miller, Randall)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Memorandum in Support re 36 MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization. (Miller, Randall)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment by Biotechnology Industry Organization. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Miller, Randall)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 32 Certificate of Service, The filing user has been notified to refile a Certificate of Service due to no caption and case number on the document. (klau, )
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 30 Declaration, The filing user has been notified to file the pleading in case # 1:07cv1008 Only. The case is consolidated but the parties are not consolidated per order 10/17/07. (klau, )
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Correction re 29 Notice of Appearance. The filing user has been notified to file this document to case # 1:07cv1008 only. (klau, )
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Dowd, James)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave To File an Amicus Curiae Brief# 2 Proposed Order)(Dowd, James)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Service re (42 in 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ, 31 in 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ) Memorandum in Opposition,,,, Certificate of Service for Mem. in Opp'n to Partial Motion to Dismiss by Joseph Dale Wilson, III on behalf of Triantafyllos Tafas Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Wilson, Joseph)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum in Opposition re (17 in 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ) 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Tafas Declaration (Exhibit 1 to Mem. In Opp'n to Part. Mot. To Dism.)# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Tafas Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, part 1 of 4, to Tafas Declaration# 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, part 2 of 4, to Tafas Declaration# 5 Exhibit Exhibit B, part 3 of 4, to Tafas Declaration# 6 Exhibit Exhibit B, part 4 of 4, to Tafas Declaration# 7 Exhibit Exhibit H, part 1 of 3, to Tafas Declaration# 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, part 2 of 3, to Tafas Declaration# 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, part 1 of 3, to Tafas Declaration# 10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Tafas Declaration # 11 Exhibit Exhibit C to Tafas Declaration# 12 Exhibit Exhibit D to Tafas Declaration# 13 Exhibit Exhibit E to Tafas Declaration# 14 Exhibit Exhibit F to Tafas Declaration# 15 Exhibit Exhibit G to Tafas Declaration)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Wilson, Joseph) Modified on 10/29/2007 to reflect the link to motion 17 (klau, ). Modified on 10/29/2007 to reflect 2 CD not available electronically received on 10/29/07 for Exhibit I , (klau, ).
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Declaration re (16 in 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ) Declaration of Harry Manbeck (Exhibits) by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Trainor, Daniel) Modified on 10/29/2007 this docket entry is for CASE NUMBER 1:07cv1008(klau, ).
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance(for case 1:07cv1008) by Daniel Sean Trainor on behalf of SmithKline Beecham Corporation, SmithKline Beecham PLC, Glaxo Group Limited Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-JCC-TRJ(Trainor, Daniel) Modified on 10/29/2007 to reflect the docket entry is for case 1:07cv1008 (klau,).
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE that Plaintiff will file his opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss dated October 4, 2007 on or before Thursday, October 25, 2007 ---- Defendants will notice Friday, November 9, 2007 as the date on which their motion to dismiss will be heard ---- Plaintiff will file any motion for summary judgment or or before Wednesday, November 7, 2007 --- The Parties will notice the hearing on any summary judgment filed by Plaintiff and any cross-motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants for Friday, December 21, 2007 ---- (see order for details). Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/22/07. (klau, )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting application for Steven Jerome Moore to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 100004133. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/18/07. (Attachments: # 1 Letter# 2 Receipt)(klau, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting application for James Edward Nealon to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid$ 50, receipt number 100004237. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/17/07. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(klau, )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that they be and are consolidated under 1:07cv846 and that 1:07cv1008 be reassigned to the undersigned judge as well as Magistrate Judge Jones. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/17/07. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-00846-JCC-TRJ, 1:07-cv-01008-CMH-TRJ(klau, )
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting application for Shaun Michael Gehan to appear Pro hac vice Filing fee paid $ 50, receipt number 100004167. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 10/16/07. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(klau, )
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office of Related Cases (Wetzler, Lauren)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial). Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2007 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD of U.S. Patent and Trademark (not available electronically) received in 3 boxes (Box 1 A00001-A03199; Box 2 A03200-A06784; Box 3 A06785-A09622) filed by Defendants. (klau, )
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of filing of Administrative Record by The United States Patent and Trademark Office (klau, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service re 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial), 18 Memorandum in Support, 19 Notice of Hearing Date by Lauren A. Wetzler on behalf of Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office (Wetzler, Lauren)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/02/2007 re 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) (Wetzler, Lauren)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1 (Tables)# 3 Exhibit 2 (Final Rules)# 4 Exhibit 3 (Proposed Rules)# 5 Exhibit 4 (Young Declaration))(Wetzler, Lauren)
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Wetzler, Lauren)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 THE PARTIES'JOINT STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule 1. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint dated September 7, 2007 on or before Thursday, October 4, 2007 ---- 10. The Parties will notice the hearing on any summary judgment filed by Plaintiff and any cross-motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants for Friday, December 21, 2007 ---- (see order for details). Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris. Signed by Judge James C. Cacheris on 9/21/07. (klau, )
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Withdraw of Motion by Triantafyllos Tafas re 6 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 8 Notice of Hearing Date, 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 4 Memorandum in Support Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction & Hearing on Same (Wilson, Joseph)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT (first) for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and For Review of Rulemaking against Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office, filed by Triantafyllos Tafas.(Wilson, Joseph)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jon Dudas (klau, )
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (klau, )
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney served on 8/27/2007, answer due 10/26/2007(klau, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2007 (klau, ).
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General (klau, )
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Wetzler on behalf of all defendants (Wetzler, Lauren)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2007 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (clar, )
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Hearing Date set for 09/21/2007 re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Triantafyllos Tafas (Wilson, Joseph)
August 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued and given to attorney for service by SPS as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (klau, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing on 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2007 at 10:00 AM before District Judge James C. Cacheris. (klau, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Triantafyllos Tafas in Support OF 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (klau, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(klau, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Triantafyllos Tafas. (klau, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued and given to attorney for service by SPS as to Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (klau, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jon Dudas, The United States Patent and Trademark Office ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 100003097.), filed by Triantafyllos Tafas. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Receipt # 3 Letter)(klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tafas v. Dudas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triantafyllos Tafas
Represented By: Joseph Dale Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Dudas
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Patent and Trademark Office
Represented By: Lauren A. Wetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Represented By: James Murphy Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Biotechnology Industry Organization
Represented By: Randall Karl Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Jeffrey Pivnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Represented By: Thomas J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Randall Karl Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: William Mithchell College of Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Intellectual Property Institute of William Mitchell College of Law
Represented By: Charles Gorenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Human Genome Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Emmett Scully, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Polestar Capital Associates, LLC
Represented By: Craig James Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Norseman Group, LLC
Represented By: Craig James Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Public Patent Foundation
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Computer and Communications Industry Association
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AARP
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Consumer Federation of America
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Essential Action
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Foundation for Taxpayer and Consumer Rights
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Initiative for Medicines, Access and Knowledge
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Knowledge Ecology International
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Prescription Access Litigation
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Public Knowledge
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Research on Innovation
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Software Freedom Law Center
Represented By: Matthew Christian Schruers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: CFPH, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Dyste Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: CropLife America
Represented By: John C. Maginnis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Federation Internationale Des Conseils En Proprit Industrielle
Represented By: Timothy A. Molino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AmberWave Systems Corporation
Represented By: Mark Fox Evens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Fallbrook Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Mark Fox Evens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: InterDigital Communications LLC
Represented By: Mark Fox Evens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Nano-Terra Inc.
Represented By: Mark Fox Evens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Tessera, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Fox Evens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: BioAdvance
Represented By: Robert C. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Washington Legal Foundation
Represented By: Kevin Michael Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Life Sciences Greenhouse of Central Pennsylvania
Represented By: Robert C. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Pittsburgh Life Sciences Greenhouse
Represented By: Robert C. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Intellectual Property Owners Association
Represented By: Blair Elizabeth Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Ron D. Katznelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Teles AG Informationstechnologien
Represented By: David Wayne Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Intellectual Property and Administrative Law and Public Health Professors
Represented By: Jennifer Sue Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Bar Association of the District of Columbia
Represented By: Robert Christian Bertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Robert Lelkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: SmithKline Beecham Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Sean Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: SmithKline Beecham PLC
Represented By: Daniel Sean Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Glaxo Group Limited
Represented By: Daniel Sean Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?