Netscape Communications Corp., v. Valueclick, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Netscape Communications Corp., |
Defendant: |
Valueclick, Inc., Mediaplex, Inc., Fastclick, Inc., Commission Junction, Inc., Mezimedia, Inc. and Web Clients, L.L.C. |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00225 |
Filed: |
February 27, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia |
Office: |
Patent Office |
County: |
Loudoun |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas Rawles Jones |
Presiding Judge: |
T. S. Ellis |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
35:271 Patent Infringement |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 14, 2010 |
Filing
383
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 213 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Netscape Communications Corp. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/14/2010. (tche)
|
April 2, 2010 |
Filing
327
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 312 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/2/2010. (tche)
|
January 29, 2010 |
Filing
294
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 293 . Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 1/29/2010. (nmcc)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
271
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 135 MOTION for Claim Construction. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/22/2009. (rban, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Netscape Communications Corp., v. Valueclick, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Netscape Communications Corp., |
Represented By: |
Robert Leo Burns, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Valueclick, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Mediaplex, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Fastclick, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Commission Junction, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Mezimedia, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Web Clients, L.L.C. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?