Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. Ader et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Defendant: F. Hanes Byerly, Neil Creighton, Harry F. Byrd, Jr., Joan H. Creighton, John Doe, Does 1-5,000, The Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust, Mary R. McDermott, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Clearview Correspondent Services, LLC., Norma B. Webb, Nancy Feigenbaum, Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund, Rondra Matthews, Thomas T. Byrd, Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten, City of Richmond RSRS, The Thomas T. Byrd Trust UA, Richard M. Ader, John J. McDermott, Clara B.. Woody, Keith Matthews, MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, T. Rowe Price, Folio Investments, Inc., Estate of Robert C. Gilkison, Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, Jeffrey Risley, Marilyn Rapkin, Dominion Resources, Inc., Timothy S. Pecaro, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Robert Evans, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, BNA Retirement Trust Equity Excluding FEF, Mary B. Schwab, Ellen Jackson, Hon. Harry F. Bryd Revocable Trust U/A DTD, Casey an Associates, LLP, Matthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Davenport & Co. LLC, Ellen Johnson Twaddell, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Lockwood Bros. Inc., James L. Lockwood, Schwab Trust a Charitable U/A DTD, The Trust FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D, Virginia Retirement System, on behalf of themselves and a class of similarly situated Natural persons juridicial and entities, BNA Employees Retirement Plan, Susan S. Pecaro, Hon. Harry F. Byrd, Allen C. Tanner, Jr., Clearview Correspondent Services, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, John Mason Sanford, Winchester Evening Star Inc., Robert J. White, A&P Associates, Virginia College Savings Plan, Joan L. Gilkison and Arthur Shawn Casey
Case Number: 1:2011cv00601
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Thomas Rawles Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2012 Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:11-cv-09571, filed 12/28/2011. (rban, )
December 20, 2011 Case transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York per MDL Order of 12/20/2011. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (stas)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order of the MDL Panel that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Southern District of New York are transferred to the Southern District of New York and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard A. Holwell for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in that district. Signed by John G. Heyburn, II, Chairman, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation 12/20/2011. (stas)
December 20, 2011 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. #174 MOTION for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint (clar, )
December 20, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #174 MOTION for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 177 Sealed Unredacted Document (Exhibit A ) re #174 MOTION for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint. (tfitz, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 176 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 13, 2012 re #174 MOTION for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint (Pierce, Anthony)
December 19, 2011 Filing 175 Memorandum in Support re #174 MOTION for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Pierce, Anthony)
December 19, 2011 Filing 174 MOTION for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Third Amended Complaint)(Pierce, Anthony)
December 16, 2011 Filing 179 WAIVER OF SERVICE as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust. (No answer due date set due to incomplete waiver filed). (Attachments: #1 Letter)(tfitz, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Elizabeth Miller on behalf of Mary B. Schwab, Schwab Trust a Charitable U/A DTD 05/23/1995 (Miller, Evan)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Modify the Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 12/12/11. copy mailed to pro se parties; yes (tfitz, )
December 8, 2011 Per CMH chambers motions set for 12/9/11 on papers (clar, )
December 7, 2011 Filing 171 REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 MOTION Modify this Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss filed by A&P Associates, Richard M. Ader, Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, F. Hanes Byerly, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Harry F. Byrd, Thomas T. Byrd, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, Joan H. Creighton, Neil Creighton, Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc., Hon. Harry F. Bryd Revocable Trust U/A DTD 1/25/82, James L. Lockwood, Lockwood Bros. Inc., MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Matthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Allen C. Tanner, Jr, Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund, The Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust, The Thomas T. Byrd Trust UA 01/25/82, The Trust FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99, Norma B. Webb, Robert J. White(As Trustee of FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99), Robert J. White, Winchester Evening Star Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Evan)
December 7, 2011 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Zingone on behalf of T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. (Zingone, Gerald)
December 5, 2011 Filing 169 Memorandum in Opposition re #151 MOTION Modify this Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO MODIFY THE COURT'S AUGUST 2, 2011 STAY ORDER filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pierce, Anthony)
December 2, 2011 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance, pro se, by Robert Evans (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
December 2, 2011 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance, pro se, by Nancy Feigenbaum. (rban, )
December 2, 2011 Filing 166 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Ellen Jackson, Marilyn Rapkin. (Daily, Shannon)
December 2, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by John Arthur Rosans on behalf of Ellen Jackson, Marilyn Rapkin (Rosans, John)
December 1, 2011 Filing 164 SUMMONS for SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Returned Executed as to Ellen Johnson Twaddell served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. (tfitz, ) Modified to edit text on 12/1/2011 (tfitz, ).
December 1, 2011 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Zingone on behalf of BNA Employees' Retirement Plan (Zingone, Gerald)
November 30, 2011 Filing 162 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John Mason Sanford served on 11/14/2011, answer due 12/5/2011. (tfitz, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 161 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to State Street Bank and Trust Company served on 11/10/2011, answer due 12/1/2011. (tfitz, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 160 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joan L. Gilkison served on 11/11/2011, answer due 12/2/2011. (tfitz, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 159 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Estate of Robert C. Gilkison served on 11/11/2011, answer due 12/2/2011. (tfitz, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 158 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mary B. Schwab served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. (tfitz, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 157 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Schwab Trust a Charitable U/A DTD 05/23/1995 served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. (tfitz, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 156 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy Feigenbaum served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. (tfitz, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 155 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Robert Evans served on 11/9/2011, answer due 11/30/2011. (tfitz, )
November 23, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #154 MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Modify the Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
November 23, 2011 Notice of Correction re #154 MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Modify the Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss. The filing user has been notified to file the document separately for each motion relief. (clar, )
November 22, 2011 Filing 154 MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Modify the Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss by John J. McDermott, John J. McDermott. (McDermott, John)
November 22, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #151 MOTION Modify this Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
November 21, 2011 Filing 153 Notice of Hearing Date re #151 MOTION Modify this Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss (Miller, Evan)
November 21, 2011 Filing 152 Memorandum in Support re #151 MOTION Modify this Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss filed by A&P Associates, Richard M. Ader, Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, F. Hanes Byerly, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Harry F. Byrd, Thomas T. Byrd, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, Joan H. Creighton, Neil Creighton, Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc., Hon. Harry F. Bryd Revocable Trust U/A DTD 1/25/82, James L. Lockwood, Lockwood Bros. Inc., MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Matthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Allen C. Tanner, Jr, Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund, The Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust, The Thomas T. Byrd Trust UA 01/25/82, Norma B. Webb, Robert J. White(As Trustee of FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99), Robert J. White, Winchester Evening Star Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Evan)
November 21, 2011 Filing 151 MOTION Modify this Court's August 2, 2011 Stay Order for the Limited Purpose of Filing, Briefing, and Argument of Motions to Dismiss by A&P Associates, Richard M. Ader, Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, F. Hanes Byerly, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Harry F. Byrd, Thomas T. Byrd, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, Joan H. Creighton, Neil Creighton, Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc., Hon. Harry F. Bryd Revocable Trust U/A DTD 1/25/82, James L. Lockwood, Lockwood Bros. Inc., MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Matthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Allen C. Tanner, Jr, Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund, The Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust, The Thomas T. Byrd Trust UA 01/25/82, Norma B. Webb, Robert J. White(As Trustee of FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99), Robert J. White, Winchester Evening Star Inc.. (Miller, Evan)
November 15, 2011 Filing 150 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephonic Means through Counsel and Noted Hardship of Transfer by Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten. (Rowan, Robert)
November 14, 2011 Filing 149 SUMMONS for SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Returned Executed as to John J. McDermott served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. (tfitz, )
November 14, 2011 Filing 148 SUMMONS for SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Returned Executed as to Mary R. McDermott served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011. (tfitz, )
November 7, 2011 Filing 147 Summons for SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re-issued and given to attorney for service by SPS as to State Street Bank and Trust Company. (tfitz, )
November 7, 2011 Filing 146 Summons for SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Returned Unexecuted as to State Street Bank and Trust Company. (tfitz, )
November 4, 2011 Filing 145 Summons Issued for SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT given to attorney for service by SPS as to Estate of Robert C. Gilkison, Robert Evans, Nancy Feigenbaum, Joan L. Gilkison, John J. McDermott, Mary R. McDermott, John Mason Sanford, Mary B. Schwab, Schwab Trust a Charitable U/A DTD 05/23/1995, State Street Bank and Trust Company, Ellen Johnson Twaddell. (tfitz, )
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to File the Second the Amended Complaint (the "Motion") is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT is the operative pleading as to all defendants in the above-captioned case and is deemed filed as of the date of the Motion. FURTHER, and upon consideration of the pleadings filed herein and the argument of counsel, it APPEARS to the Court that good cause and the countervailing and significant interest of the personal financial information at issue heavily outweighs the presumption in favor of the public interest in access to those communications, as provided in Virginia Dep't ofState Police v. Washington Post, 386 F.3d 567, 575 (4th Cir. 2004); and it further APPEARS that there is no practicable alternative means to protect these communications other than the sealing of Amended Exhibit A; and so it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to File the Amended Exhibit A Under Seal is GRANTED, and that the Court's Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Leave To File Exhibit ATothe Complaint Under Seal is hereby clarified ormodified to permit Plaintiffs to file information regarding payments made to defendants in connection with Tribune Company's 2007 leveraged buyout, orthat could establish a link between adefendant who produced information to the Official Committee ofUnsecured Creditors of Tribune Company and a defendant, including the Amended Exhibit A, under seal now and in future filings, and to serve individual defendants with redacted versions ofsuch filings that disclose information relating only to the specific defendants served. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/24/11. (tfitz, )
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 For the reasons stated from the bench, and in accord with specific rulings made at that time, it is ORDERED that: 1) Plaintiffs motion (no. #117 ) for additional time to serve defendants is GRANTED, and the time for service is extended through March 30, 2012. 2) This action is docketed for a status hearing on March 9, 2012, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 301. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 10/21/11. (cmar, )
October 21, 2011 Filing 141 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2011 re #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Appearances of counsel. Motion GRANTED. The period of time for service extended through and including 03/30/12. Status Conference set for 3/9/2012 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.) (cmar, )
October 21, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
October 20, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
October 20, 2011 Per CMH chambers motions set for 10/21/11 on papers (clar, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER for Pro hac vice of Deborah Jill Newman Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683024871. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/19/2011. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Letter)(rban, )
October 19, 2011 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Johnson Twaddell (pro se). (tfitz, )
October 15, 2011 Filing 138 NOTICE by City of Richmond RSRS, Virginia College Savings Plan, Virginia Retirement System, Clara B.. Woody of Change of Address (Baney, Nathan)
October 13, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
October 3, 2011 Filing 137 Reply to #126 Response to Motion,, filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pierce, Anthony)
September 29, 2011 Filing 136 Sealed Document (Exhibit A) re #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER. (tfitz, )
September 29, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
September 28, 2011 Filing 135 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 21, 2011 re #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER (Pierce, Anthony)
September 28, 2011 Filing 134 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER (Pierce, Anthony)
September 28, 2011 Filing 133 Memorandum in Support re #132 MOTION to Amend/Correct THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Pierce, Anthony)
September 28, 2011 Filing 132 MOTION to Amend/Correct THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Pierce, Anthony)
September 28, 2011 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER (clar, )
September 28, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
September 28, 2011 Notice of Correction re #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER. The filing user has been notified to file the document separately for each motion relief. (clar, )
September 27, 2011 Filing 144 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against A&P Associates, Richard M. Ader, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, F. Hanes Byerly, Harry F. Byrd, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, City of Richmond RSRS, Joan H. Creighton, Neil Creighton, Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc., Folio Investments, Inc., Ellen Jackson, James L. Lockwood, Lockwood Bros. Inc., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Marilyn Rapkin, Jeffrey Risley, Allen C. Tanner, Jr, Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund, Ellen Johnson Twaddell, Virginia College Savings Plan, Virginia Retirement System, Norma B. Webb, Robert J. White, Clara B.. Woody, Clearview Correspondent Services, LLC., John Doe, Estate of Robert C. Gilkison, Joan L. Gilkison, John Doe, Hon. Harry F. Bryd Revocable Trust U/A DTD 1/25/82, John Doe, Matthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Mary R. McDermott, John J. McDermott, Robert Evans, Nancy Feigenbaum, John Doe, The Trust FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, State Street Bank and Trust Company, John Mason Sanford, Mary B. Schwab, Schwab Trust a Charitable U/A DTD 05/23/1995, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., BNA Employees' Retirement Plan, Does 1-5,000, on behalf of themselves and a class of similarly situated Natural persons juridicial and entities, The Thomas T. Byrd Trust UA 01/25/82, The Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust, filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company.(tfitz, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2011: #4 Exhibit A (redacted), #5 Errata B, #6 Exhibit C) (tfitz, ). Modified to edit text on 12/1/2011 (tfitz, ).
September 27, 2011 Filing 131 Sealed Document (Exhibit A) re #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER. (tfitz, )
September 27, 2011 Filing 130 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 21, 2011 re #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER (Pierce, Anthony)
September 27, 2011 Filing 129 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER (Pierce, Anthony)
September 27, 2011 Filing 128 Memorandum in Support re #127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Pierce, Anthony)
September 27, 2011 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to File THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND AN ORDER CLARIFYING OR MODIFYING THE COURTS PRIOR SEALING ORDER by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Pierce, Anthony)
September 26, 2011 Filing 126 RESPONSE to Motion re #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT filed by Richard M. Ader, Harry F. Byrd, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Thomas T. Byrd, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc., Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Winchester Evening Star Inc.. (Miller, Evan)
September 23, 2011 Filing 125 SUMMONS for AMENDED COMPLAINT Returned Executed as to Ellen Johnson Twaddell served on 8/27/2011, answer due 9/19/2011. (tfitz, )
September 19, 2011 Filing 124 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by A&P Associates, Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Allen C. Tanner, Jr. (Ware, Michael)
September 15, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Hylton Hansen on behalf of Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Allen C. Tanner, Jr (Hansen, Robyn)
September 15, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Hylton Hansen on behalf of A&P Associates, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP (Hansen, Robyn)
September 15, 2011 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Hylton Hansen on behalf of MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews (Hansen, Robyn)
September 14, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
September 13, 2011 Filing 120 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 14, 2011 re #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (Pierce, Anthony)
September 13, 2011 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (clar, )
September 13, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (Attorney was notified that Judge Jones is not hearing motions on October 7, 2011 due to the EDVA Judges Conerence and to Please re-notice the motion that was set for 10/7/11 - Deadlines Terminated) (clar, )
September 13, 2011 Notice of Correction re #119 Notice of Hearing Date. Attorney was notified that Judge Jones is not hearing moitons on October 7, 2011 due to the EDVA Judges Conference and to Please re-notice the motion that was set for 10/7/11. (clar, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 119 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 7, 2011 re #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (Pierce, Anthony)
September 12, 2011 Filing 118 Memorandum in Support re #117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF ANTHONY T. PIERCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)(Pierce, Anthony)
September 12, 2011 Filing 117 MOTION for Extension OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pierce, Anthony)
September 9, 2011 Filing 116 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Harry F. Byrd, Jr as Trustee waiver sent on 8/30/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (tfitz, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 115 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Thomas T. Byrd waiver sent on 8/30/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (tfitz, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 114 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Hon. Harry F. Byrd waiver sent on 8/30/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (tfitz, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 113 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Harry F. Byrd, Jr waiver sent on 8/30/2011, answer due 10/31/2011. (tfitz, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 112 SUMMONS for Amended Complaint Returned Executed as to Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS served on 8/30/2011, answer due 9/20/2011. (tfitz, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 111 SUMMONS for Amended Complaint Returned Executed as to Susan S. Pecaro served on 8/30/2011, answer due 9/20/2011. (tfitz, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 110 SUMMONS for Amended Complaint Returned Executed as to Timothy S. Pecaro served on 8/30/2011, answer due 9/20/2011. (tfitz, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 109 SUMMONS for Amended Complaint Returned Executed as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust served on 8/29/2011, answer due 9/19/2011. (tfitz, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 108 SUMMONS for Amended Complaint Returned Executed as to Winchester Evening Star Inc. served on 8/29/2011, answer due 9/19/2011. (tfitz, )
September 1, 2011 Filing 107 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BNA Retirement Trust Equity Excluding FEF. (Castleton, Todd)
September 1, 2011 Filing 106 SUMMONS for AMENDED COMPLAINT Returned Executed as to Folio Investments, Inc. served on 8/25/2011, answer due 9/15/2011. (tfitz, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 105 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Harry F. Byrd, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Thomas T. Byrd, Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Winchester Evening Star Inc.. (Miller, Evan)
August 30, 2011 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Elizabeth Miller on behalf of Richard M. Ader, Harry F. Byrd, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Thomas T. Byrd, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc., Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Winchester Evening Star Inc. (Miller, Evan)
August 26, 2011 Filing 103 Summons Issued for AMENDED COMPLAINT and given to attorney for service by SPS as to Jeffrey Risley. (tfitz, )
August 26, 2011 Filing 102 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jeffrey Risley. (tfitz, )
August 24, 2011 Filing 101 Summons Issued for AMENDED COMPLAINT given to attorney for service by SPS as to Folio Investments, Inc., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Ellen Johnson Twaddell, Winchester Evening Star Inc. (tfitz, )
August 24, 2011 Filing 100 Alias Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ellen Johnson Twaddell. (tfitz, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 99 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pierce, Anthony)
August 17, 2011 Filing 98 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Pierce, Anthony)
August 9, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of F. Hanes Byerly (Reilly, Craig)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDERED that the Motion to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to theComplaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice is GRANTED and: 1. The time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint in this action or commence motions practice is stayed until further order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware in In re Tribune Co., No. 08-13141 (KJC) or further order of this Court {the "Stay"). In addition, any applicable deadlines under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 23 or 26 (or their local counterparts) will also be held in abeyance during the pendency of the Stay. (see Order for complete details) Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/2/11. (tfitz, )
August 1, 2011 Filing 93 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) Supplemented by Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pierce, Anthony)
July 29, 2011 Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Claude M. Hilton: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2011 re #79 Amended MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Appearance of counsel. Motion to Stay - Granted. (Court Reporter: Westfall) (tarm)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granted for Pro hac vice of Michael C. D'Agostino Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683023168. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/28/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(tfitz, )
July 28, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Eileen Daily on behalf of Ellen Jackson, Marilyn Rapkin (Daily, Shannon)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CONSENT ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file a response to Moving Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue within twenty-one (21) days after Judge Hilton files the order ruling on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion-to Stay (Docket # 19 ). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/27/11. (tfitz, )
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granted for Pro hac vice of Randall E. Hendricks Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683023056. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/27/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(tfitz, )
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting application of Steven Cousins to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022997. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/26/2011. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(stas)
July 25, 2011 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Edward Crawford on behalf of Joan H. Creighton, Neil Creighton (Crawford, Michael)
July 22, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ellis Lattimore on behalf of Norma B. Webb (Lattimore, Jennifer)
July 22, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #79 Amended MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
July 21, 2011 Filing 86 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Clara B.. Woody served on 7/1/2011, answer due 7/22/2011. (tfitz, )
July 21, 2011 Filing 83 MOTION to Withdraw #23 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE, UNTIL THE EARLIER OF OCTOBER 31, 2011, OR CONFIRMATION OF A PLAN OF REORGANIZATION BY THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DEL by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Pierce, Anthony)
July 21, 2011 Filing 81 Notice of Hearing Date set for 07/29/2011 re #79 Amended MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE (Pierce, Anthony)
July 21, 2011 Filing 80 Memorandum in Support re #79 Amended MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF DAVID M. ZENSKY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO STAY)(Pierce, Anthony)
July 21, 2011 Filing 79 Amended MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pierce, Anthony)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granted for Pro hac vice of Mitchell Hurley Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022966. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/20/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(tfitz, )
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granted for Pro hac vice of Susan Ehlers Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022934. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/20/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(tfitz, )
July 20, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by William Dean Ledoux, Jr on behalf of Norma B. Webb (Ledoux, William)
July 20, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Michael Palais on behalf of Norma B. Webb (Palais, Douglas)
July 19, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Eileen Daily on behalf of Ellen Jackson, Marilyn Rapkin (Daily, Shannon)
July 19, 2011 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Rowan on behalf of Joan H. Creighton, Neil Creighton (Rowan, Robert)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granted for Pro hac vice of Matthew Heston Farmer Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022855. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/18/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(tfitz, )
July 18, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Bitner Castleton on behalf of BNA Retirement Trust Equity Excluding FEF (Castleton, Todd)
July 18, 2011 Filing 73 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to A&P Associates served on 7/7/2011, answer due 7/28/2011. (tfitz, )
July 14, 2011 Notice of Correction re #66 First MOTION to Change Venue- attorney notified to file a Notice of Hearing. (tfitz, )
July 13, 2011 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust served on 7/11/2011, answer due 8/1/2011. (tfitz, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATED ORDER that the Defendants' time for filing responsive pleadings and/or motions in response to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including September 9, 2011 without prejudice to any further extensions the Court may authorize. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/12/11. (tfitz, )
July 12, 2011 Filing 69 Respondent's BRIEF by A&P Associates, Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Allen C. Tanner, Jr. (Verser, Joseph)
July 12, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Floyd William Kirby, Jr on behalf of Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund (Kirby, Floyd)
July 12, 2011 Filing 67 Brief in Support to #66 First MOTION to Change Venue filed by Casey an Associates, LLP, MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Allen C. Tanner, Jr. (Verser, Joseph)
July 12, 2011 Filing 66 First MOTION to Change Venue by A&P Associates, Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Allen C. Tanner, Jr. (Verser, Joseph)
July 12, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonah Eric McCarthy on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (McCarthy, Jonah)
July 12, 2011 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Franklin Verser on behalf of MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews (Verser, Joseph)
July 12, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Franklin Verser on behalf of Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Allen C. Tanner, Jr (Verser, Joseph)
July 12, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Franklin Verser on behalf of A&P Associates, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP (Verser, Joseph)
July 12, 2011 Filing 61 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Lockwood Bros. Inc.. (Sims, Hunter)
July 12, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter Wilmer Sims, Jr on behalf of James L. Lockwood, Lockwood Bros. Inc. (Sims, Hunter)
July 12, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bruce Ware on behalf of MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews (Ware, Michael)
July 12, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bruce Ware on behalf of Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Allen C. Tanner, Jr (Ware, Michael)
July 12, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bruce Ware on behalf of A&P Associates, Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP (Ware, Michael)
July 11, 2011 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Winchester Evening Star Inc.; Winchester Evening Star Inc. served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (stas)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED that no defendant is required to plead or move in response to the complaint until 21 days after Judge Hilton files the order ruling on plaintiff's motion to stay (no. #23 ). This order resolves the motions docketed as numbers 26,28,29,49,52, and 53. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 7/8/2011. (tche)
July 8, 2011 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of time to file responsive pleadings by Robert J. White(As Trustee of FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99), Robert J. White. (Robb, John)
July 8, 2011 Filing 54 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by City of Richmond RSRS, Virginia College Savings Plan, Virginia Retirement System, Clara B.. Woody. (Baney, Nathan)
July 8, 2011 Filing 53 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleadings by City of Richmond RSRS, Virginia College Savings Plan, Virginia Retirement System, Clara B.. Woody. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baney, Nathan)
July 8, 2011 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Clearview Correspondent Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matheson, Cameron)
July 8, 2011 Filing 51 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by T. Rowe Price. (Zingone, Gerald)
July 8, 2011 Filing 50 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ellen Jackson, Marilyn Rapkin. (Daily, Shannon)
July 8, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint,,,,,, #47 Summons Returned Executed by Ellen Jackson, Marilyn Rapkin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daily, Shannon)
July 7, 2011 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ellen Jackson served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed F. Hanes Byerly served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed Allen C. Tanner, Jr served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed Marilyn Rapkin served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed Keith Matthews served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed Rondra Matthews served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed James L. Lockwood served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lockwood Bros. Inc. served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joan H. Creighton served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed Neil Creighton served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed Casey an Associates, LLP served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed Arthur Shawn Casey served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 32 Alias Summons Issued and given for service by SPS as to Ellen Johnson Twaddell. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 31 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company as to Ellen Johnson Twaddell. (nhall)
July 7, 2011 Filing 30 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Richard M. Ader, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc.. (Sieg, Karen)
July 7, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Agreed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Order Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings or Motions in Response to Complaint) by Richard M. Ader, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sieg, Karen)
July 7, 2011 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by T. Rowe Price. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Zingone, Gerald)
July 6, 2011 Filing 27 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund. (Keating, Justin)
July 6, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keating, Justin)
July 5, 2011 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE, UNTIL THE EARLIER OF OCTOBER 31, 2011, OR CONFIRMATION OF A PLAN OF REORGANIZATION BY THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DEL. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Date set for July 29, 2011 re #23 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE, UNTIL THE EARLIER OF OCTOBER 31, 2011, OR CONFIRMATION OF A PLAN OF REORGANIZATION BY THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DEL (Pierce, Anthony)
July 1, 2011 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE, UNTIL THE EARLIER OF OCTOBER 31, 2011, OR CONFIRMATION OF A PLAN OF REORGANIZATION BY THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DEL AWARE, OR FURTHER ORDER OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE OR THIS COURT filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF DAVID M. ZENSKY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE, UNTIL THE EARLIER OF OCTOBER 31, 2011, OR CONFIRMATION OF A PLAN OF REORGANIZATION BY THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE, OR FURTHER ORDER OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE OR THIS COURT)(Pierce, Anthony)
July 1, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION OR COMMENCE MOTIONS PRACTICE, UNTIL THE EARLIER OF OCTOBER 31, 2011, OR CONFIRMATION OF A PLAN OF REORGANIZATION BY THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE, OR FURTHER ORDER OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE OR THIS COURT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pierce, Anthony)
June 28, 2011 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Norma B. Webb served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (tfitz, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Richard M. Ader served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Susan S. Pecaro served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Timothy S. Pecaro served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011. (tfitz, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to BNA Retirement Trust Equity Excluding FEF served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; City of Richmond RSRS served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Clearview Correspondent Services served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Davenport & Co. LLC served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Dominion Resources, Inc. served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Folio Investments, Inc. served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; T. Rowe Price served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Virginia College Savings Plan served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Virginia Retirement System served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Robert J. White(As Trustee of FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99) served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Robert J. White served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011. (tfitz, )
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Pro hac vice of Stephen M. Baldini; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022265. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 06/21/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(pmil)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Pro hac vice of Daniel H. Golden; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022261. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 06/21/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(pmil)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Pro hac vice of James P. Chou; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022262. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 06/21/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(pmil)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Pro hac vice of Jason L. Goldsmith; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022263. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 06/21/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(pmil)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Pro hac vice of Angeline Lam Koo; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022264. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 06/21/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(pmil)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Pro hac vice of David M. Zensky; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683022266. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 06/21/11. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(pmil)
June 14, 2011 Filing 13 Summons Issued and given to attorney for service by SPS as to Neil Creighton, Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten. (tfitz, )
June 10, 2011 Filing 12 Summons Issued and given to attorney for service by SPS as to Joan H. Creighton, James L. Lockwood, Lockwood Bros. Inc., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Norma B. Webb. (tfitz, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 9 Summons Issued and given to attorney for service by SPS as to Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Thomas T. Byrd, Allen C. Tanner, Jr, Robert J. White(As Trustee of FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99), Robert J. White. (tfitz, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Claude M. Hilton: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2011. Appearance of counsel for Pltfs. #3 Emergency MOTION for leave to file Exhibit A to the Complaint Under Seal filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas - Granted. (Court Reporter: Westfall) (tarm)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and that unredacted Exhibit A to the Complaint, attached to Plaintiffs' Motion in a sealed envelope, affixed with a copy of the document's cover page (with confidential information redacted) to the outside of the envelope, and conspicuously marked on the envelope with "SEALED DOCUMENT," shall be a scaled document; and it is further ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be placed in the file of the above- entitled action; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs arc to serve individual defendants with the Complaint and a redacted copy of Exhibit A that discloses only information relating to the specific defendant served; and it is ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of service of the Complaint, any defendant may file a Motion with this Court contesting the need for sealing of unredacted Exhibit A; and it is further ORDERED that any third party seeking access to the sealed document may do so only upon application to this Court setting forth their need to obtain access to the document and as a condition of access, shall agree to keep the contents of the document confidential and not to disclose the contents to any third party not entitled to access to the document. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/3/11. (tfitz, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #1 Complaint,,,,,, Exhibit B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pierce, Anthony)
June 2, 2011 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to A&P Associates, Richard M. Ader, BNA Retirement Trust Equity Excluding FEF, F. Hanes Byerly, Harry F. Byrd, Arthur S, Casery, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, City of Richmond RSRS, Clearview Correspondent Services, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc., Folio Investments, Inc., Ellen Jackson, MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Marilyn Rapkin, Jeffrey Risley, T. Rowe Price, Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund, Ellen Johnson Twaddell, Virginia College Savings Plan, Virginia Retirement System, Winchester Evening Star Inc., Clara B.. Woody. For service by process server. (rban, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 EX Parte Emergency MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2011 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (rban, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #3 EX Parte Emergency MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Complaint. (rban, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 EX Parte Emergency MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (rban, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 3 EX Parte Emergency MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(rban, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (rban, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A&P Associates, Richard M. Ader, Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian, BNA Retirement Trust Equity Excluding FEF, F. Hanes Byerly, Harry F. Byrd, Harry F. Byrd, Jr, Harry F. Byrd, Jr(As Trustee of Thomas T Byrd TR UA 01/25/82 Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust), Thomas T. Byrd, Arthur S, Casery, Arthur Shawn Casey, Casey an Associates, LLP, City of Richmond RSRS, Clearview Correspondent Services, Joan H. Creighton, Neil Creighton, Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten, Davenport & Co. LLC, Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust, Dominion Resources, Inc., Folio Investments, Inc., Ellen Jackson, James L. Lockwood, Lockwood Bros. Inc., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS, Keith Matthews, Rondra Matthews, Susan S. Pecaro, Timothy S. Pecaro, Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS, Marilyn Rapkin, Jeffrey Risley, T. Rowe Price, Allen C. Tanner, Jr, Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund, Ellen Johnson Twaddell, Virginia College Savings Plan, Virginia Retirement System, Norma B. Webb, Robert J. White(As Trustee of FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D 06/16/99), Robert J. White, Winchester Evening Star Inc., Clara B.. Woody ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 14683021952.), filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(rban, ) Sealed/Unredacted version of exhibit (A) filed UNDER SEAL w/ (per CMH Order of 6/3/11) Clerk's Office and placed in civil vault. Modified to edit text on 6/7/2011 (tfitz, ). Modified on 6/10/2011 to correct defts names (stas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. Ader et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hanes Byerly
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Creighton
Represented By: Michael Edward Crawford
Represented By: Robert A. Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry F. Byrd, Jr.
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan H. Creighton
Represented By: Michael Edward Crawford
Represented By: Robert A. Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5,000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Harry F. Byrd Jr Revocable Trust
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary R. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview Correspondent Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma B. Webb
Represented By: Douglas Michael Palais
Represented By: Jennifer Ellis Lattimore
Represented By: William Dean Ledoux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Joint Counsel No. 83 of Virginia Pension Fund
Represented By: Justin Patrick Keating
Represented By: Floyd William Kirby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rondra Matthews
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas T. Byrd
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creighton, Neal and Joan H. Creighton JT Ten
Represented By: Robert A. Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond RSRS
Represented By: Nathan Dee Baney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Thomas T. Byrd Trust UA
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Ader
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Sieg
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. McDermott
Represented By: John J. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clara B.. Woody
Represented By: Nathan Dee Baney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Matthews
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MatthewMatthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folio Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Robert C. Gilkison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen C. Tanner Jr., CGM IRA Custodian
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Shawn Casey SB Advisor
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Rapkin
Represented By: Shannon Eileen Daily
Represented By: John Arthur Rosans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Sieg
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Pecaro
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pecaro, Timothy S. and Susan S. Pecaro JTWROS
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNA Retirement Trust Equity Excluding FEF
Represented By: Todd Bitner Castleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary B. Schwab
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Jackson
Represented By: Shannon Eileen Daily
Represented By: John Arthur Rosans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Harry F. Bryd Revocable Trust U/A DTD
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey an Associates, LLP
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews, Rondra and Keith Matthews JTWROS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davenport & Co. LLC
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Sieg
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Johnson Twaddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Resources, Inc Defined Benefit Master Trust
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Sieg
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Bros. Inc.
Represented By: Hunter Wilmer Sims, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Lockwood
Represented By: Hunter Wilmer Sims, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwab Trust a Charitable U/A DTD
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trust FBO Robert Joseph White U/A/D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Retirement System
Represented By: Nathan Dee Baney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: on behalf of themselves and a class of similarly situated Natural persons juridicial and entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNA Employees Retirement Plan
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Pecaro
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Harry F. Byrd
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen C. Tanner, Jr.
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview Correspondent Services
Represented By: Cameron Scott Matheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mason Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester Evening Star Inc.
Represented By: Evan Miller Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. White
Represented By: John MacDonald Robb, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&P Associates
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia College Savings Plan
Represented By: Nathan Dee Baney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan L. Gilkison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Shawn Casey
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Represented By: Michael Bruce Ware
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Verser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Represented By: Anthony Tobias Pierce
Represented By: Jonah Eric McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Debenture Trust Company of New York
Represented By: Anthony Tobias Pierce
Represented By: Jonah Eric McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Anthony Tobias Pierce
Represented By: Jonah Eric McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?