Dauphin v. Jennings et al
Plaintiff: Katherine R. Dauphin
Defendant: Louis A. Jennings and Beverly L. Henneger
Counter_claimant: Louis A. Jennings and Beverly L. Henneger
Counter_defendant: Katherine R. Dauphin
Case Number: 1:2015cv00149
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Fauquier County
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Presiding Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER- For the reasons cited by Judge Buchanan, and for good cause shown, the Court finds Troutman Sanders LLP's charging liens to be valid. The Court ORDERS that $76,409.51 be deducted from the individual proceeds payable to Beverl y Hennager and paid to Troutman Sanders LLP. The Court further ORDERS that $40,672.54 be deducted from the individual proceeds payable to Louis Jennings Jr. and paid to Troutman Sanders LLP. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 6/15/2018. (see Order for further details) (dest, )(copy mailed to defendants- pro se)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER- For the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum opinion, the Court ADOPTS the May 5 Report and Recommendation. Further, Interested Party Michael Jennings' Supplemental Motion for Attorney's Fees (Dkt. No. 312) is GRANTED IN P ART. The Court instructs Judge Sheridan to pay $67,696.50 to Harris, St. Laurent & Chaudhry LLP and $176,614.49 to Roeder & Cochran PLLC from the undistributed share of the assets of the Kay Jennings Family Limited Partnership. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 6/8/2017. (dest, )
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/7/2017. (awac, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER- For the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum opinion, the Court hereby ADOPTS the February 8 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Buchanan, 286 , and ADOPTS the February 15 Report and Recommendation, 296 . It is furth er ORDERED that Defendant Jennings' Motion to Compel Arbitration, 282 , is DENIED and Defendant Jennings' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply is GRANTED, 325 . Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 3/27/2017. (dest, ) Modified on 3/29/2017 (dest, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dauphin v. Jennings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine R. Dauphin
Represented By: Stephen Grey Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis A. Jennings
Represented By: David Gerard Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly L. Henneger
Represented By: David Gerard Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Louis A. Jennings
Represented By: David Gerard Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Beverly L. Henneger
Represented By: David Gerard Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Katherine R. Dauphin
Represented By: Stephen Grey Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?