Doe v. George Mason University et al

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: George Mason University, Board Of Visitors Of George Mason University, Brent Ericson, Juliet Blank-Godlove, The Rectors and Visitors of George Mason University and Angel Cabrera
Case Number: 1:2015cv00209
Filed: February 18, 2015
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Fairfax
Referring Judge: Michael S. Nachmanoff
Presiding Judge: T. S. Ellis
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2016 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/21/2016. (dest, )
April 14, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/14/2016. (dest, )
February 25, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/25/2016. (Order to follow) (dest, )
September 16, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/16/15. (gwalk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. George Mason University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Justin Emerson Dillon
Represented By: Allison Marie Lansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Mason University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board Of Visitors Of George Mason University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Ericson
Represented By: David Garnett Drummey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliet Blank-Godlove
Represented By: David Garnett Drummey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rectors and Visitors of George Mason University
Represented By: David Garnett Drummey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Cabrera
Represented By: David Garnett Drummey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?