Aziz et al v. Trump et al Featured Case
Defendant: Muslim Advocates
Respondent: Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Wayne Biondi and Eight Unnamed CBP Agents at Dulles Airport
Intervenor_plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Amicus: Anti-Defamation League, Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Southern Poverty Law Center, American Muslim Health Professionals, Council for Advancement of Muslim Professionals, National Arab American Medical Association, The Islamic Medical Association of North America, Muppies, Inc., Network of Arab American Professionals, Illinois, New York, Massachusetts, Pennsylvania, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Washington, District of Columbia and The Fred T. Korematsu Center, Civil Rights Organizations and National Bar Associations of Color
Movant: Victor Williams
Case Number: 1:2017cv00116
Filed: January 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Alexandria City
Presiding Judge: Leonie M. Brinkema
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE by Wayne Biondi, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Department of Homeland Security to the Court (Barghaan, Dennis)
February 4, 2017 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/3/2017, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2017.(thomson, anneliese)
February 3, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to Intervene in Support of President Donald J. Trump et al. by Raquel Okyay. (Told to Notice) (klau, )
February 3, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 45 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, )
February 3, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION to Intervene in Support of President Donald J. Trump et al. by Janice Wolk Grenadier. (klau, )
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/3/2017. (rban, )
February 3, 2017 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Service re 30 Declaration by Stuart Alan Raphael on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (Raphael, Stuart)
February 3, 2017 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Service re 32 Declaration by Stuart Alan Raphael on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (Raphael, Stuart)
February 3, 2017 Filing 39 Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by Commonwealth of Virginia.(rban, )
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, it is hereby ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order entered by this Court on January 28, 2017, be and is extended through Friday, February 10,2017; and it is further ORDERED that the defendants provide the Commonwealth of Virginia with a list of all persons who have been denied entry to or removed from the United States since the Executive Order entitled "Protecting the Nation from Foreign Terrorist Entry into the United States" was signed and who, as of 8:00 a.m. Eastern Standard Time, on Friday, January 27,2017, had a residence in the Commonwealth of Virginia and had lawful permanent resident status, an immigrant visa (or accompanying family or spousal visa), a valid student visa (or accompanyingfamily or spousal visa), or a valid work visa (or accompanying family or spousal visa) by the close of business on Thursday, February 9,2017. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/3/17. (yguy)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court and to be further explained in a forthcoming Memorandum Opinion, the Commonwealth of Virginia's Motion to Intervene [Dkt. 14], Osman Nasreldin and Sahar Kamal Ahmed Fadul's Motion to Intervene [Dkt. 26], and the Joint Motion to Hold Petitioners' Claims in Abeyance[Dkt.25] are GRANTED; the Commonwealth of Virginia's Motion for the Issuance of a Rule to Show Cause [Dkt. 18] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;and it is hereby ORDERED that the Commonwealth of Virginia's Proposed Complaint in Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief [Dkt. 22] be and is filed; and it is further ORDERED that Nasreldin and Fadul file a complaint on or before Tuesday, February 7, 2017. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/3/17. (yguy)
February 3, 2017 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2017. Appearances of counsel. Motions argued in open court. 18 MOTION for Order to Show Cause is DENIED. 14 MOTION to Intervene, 25 Joint MOTION to Hold Petitioners' Claims In Abeyance,and 26 MOTION to Intervene are GRANTED. Court orders temporary restraining order be left in place until next Friday, 2/10/17. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
February 3, 2017 Notice of Correction re 30 Declaration, 32 Declaration, The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. (klau, )
February 2, 2017 Filing 35 Memorandum in Opposition re 18 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Barghaan, Dennis)
February 2, 2017 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Intervene filed by John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Barghaan, Dennis)
February 2, 2017 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re 25 Joint MOTION Hold Petitioners' Claims In Abeyance filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Raphael, Stuart)
February 2, 2017 Filing 32 Declaration re 31 Brief in Support, 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction [Declaration of W. Taylor Reveley III] by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Raphael, Stuart)
February 2, 2017 Filing 31 Brief in Support to 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raphael, Stuart)
February 2, 2017 Set Deadlines as to 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
February 2, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 Joint MOTION Hold Petitioners' Claims In Abeyance , 18 MOTION for Order to Show Cause , 26 MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
February 2, 2017 Filing 30 Declaration re 18 MOTION for Order to Show Cause [Declaration of Edward J. Grass, Esq.] by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Raphael, Stuart)
February 2, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Stephen Cox on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (Cox, Trevor)
February 2, 2017 Filing 28 Notice of Hearing Date set for 2/3/2017 re 26 MOTION to Intervene , 27 Brief in Support (Heaphy, Timothy)
February 2, 2017 Filing 27 Brief in Support to 26 MOTION to Intervene filed by Sahar Kamal Ahmed Fadul, Osman Nasreldin. (Heaphy, Timothy)
February 2, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION to Intervene by Osman Nasreldin, Sahar Kamal Ahmed Fadul. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heaphy, Timothy)
February 1, 2017 Filing 25 Joint MOTION Hold Petitioners' Claims In Abeyance by Wayne Biondi, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Barghaan, Dennis)
February 1, 2017 Filing 24 Notice of Hearing Date set for 02/10/2017 re 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Raphael, Stuart)
February 1, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Raphael, Stuart)
February 1, 2017 Filing 22 Proposed - First Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Commonwealth of Virginia.(Raphael, Stuart) Modified on 2/3/2017 to edit the docket text (rban, ).
February 1, 2017 Filing 21 Notice of Hearing Date set for 02/03/2017 re 18 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Raphael, Stuart)
February 1, 2017 Filing 20 Declaration re 19 Brief in Support [Declaration of Congressman Donald S. Beyer, Jr.] by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Raphael, Stuart)
February 1, 2017 Filing 19 Brief in Support to 18 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Raphael, Stuart)
February 1, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raphael, Stuart)
February 1, 2017 Set Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
February 1, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr on behalf of Wayne Biondi, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Barghaan, Dennis)
January 31, 2017 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date re 15 Memorandum in Support, 14 MOTION to Intervene (Raphael, Stuart)
January 31, 2017 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re 14 MOTION to Intervene filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Raphael, Stuart)
January 31, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raphael, Stuart)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/31/17. (klau, )
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/31/17. (klau, )
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/31/17. (klau, )
January 31, 2017 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, )
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the parties appear before the undersigned on Friday, February 10, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. to determine whether a preliminary injunction or other relief should issue. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/31/17. (klau, )
January 31, 2017 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Pincus and Certification of Local Counsel Simon Y. Sandoval-Moshenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5355760. by Ammar Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Aqel Muhammad Aziz, Tareq Aqel Mohammed Aziz, John Does 1-60. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
January 30, 2017 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elaine Poon and Certification of Local Counsel Simon Y. Sandoval-Moshenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5354026. by Ammar Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Aqel Muhammad Aziz, Tareq Aqel Mohammed Aziz, John Does 1-60. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
January 30, 2017 Filing 7 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Class Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Wayne Biondi, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Eight Unnamed CBP Agents at Dulles Airport filed by Ammar Aqel Mohammed Aziz, John Does 1-60, Tareq Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Aqel Muhammad Aziz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon) Modified text on 1/31/2017 to add respondent party & correct docket event (klau, ).
January 30, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Ruth Wolozin on behalf of Ammar Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Aqel Muhammad Aziz, Tareq Aqel Mohammed Aziz, John Does 1-60 (Wolozin, Rebecca)
January 30, 2017 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul W. Hughes and Certification of Local Counsel Simon Y. Sandoval-Moshenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5353400. by Ammar Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Aqel Muhammad Aziz, Tareq Aqel Mohammed Aziz, John Does 1-60. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
January 30, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ammar Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Aqel Muhammad Aziz, Tareq Aqel Mohammed Aziz, John Does 1-60 re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Civil Cover Sheet (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
January 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for TRO. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, the Court orders that: a) respondents shall permit lawyers access to all legal permanent residents being detained at Dulles International Airport;b) respondents are forbidden from removing petitionerslawful permanent residents at Dulles International Airportfor a period of 7 days from the issuance of this Order. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/28/2017. (dvanm, )
January 28, 2017 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ammar Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Aqel Muhammad Aziz, Tareq Aqel Mohammed Aziz. (dvanm, )
January 28, 2017 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0422-5352839.), filed by Ammar Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Tareq Aqel Mohammed Aziz, Aqel Muhammad Aziz. (Attachments: # 1 Executive Order, # 2 Affidavit)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aziz et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald Trump
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP)
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Kelly
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wayne Biondi
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eight Unnamed CBP Agents at Dulles Airport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Trevor Stephen Cox
Represented By: Matthew Robert McGuire
Represented By: Stuart Alan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: Joshua David Rogaczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Americans United for Separation of Church and State
Represented By: Carmen Nicole Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Southern Poverty Law Center
Represented By: Carmen Nicole Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Muslim Health Professionals
Represented By: Michael Erich Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Council for Advancement of Muslim Professionals
Represented By: Michael Erich Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Arab American Medical Association
Represented By: Michael Erich Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: The Islamic Medical Association of North America
Represented By: Michael Erich Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Muppies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Erich Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Network of Arab American Professionals
Represented By: Michael Erich Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Illinois
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: New York
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Massachusetts
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Pennsylvania
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: California
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Connecticut
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Delaware
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Iowa
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Maine
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Maryland
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: New Mexico
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: North Carolina
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Oregon
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Rhode Island
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Vermont
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Washington
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: District of Columbia
Represented By: Michael Angelo Tilghman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: The Fred T. Korematsu Center, Civil Rights Organizations and National Bar Associations of Color
Represented By: James Edward Tysse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muslim Advocates
Represented By: Michael Erich Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Victor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?