BRAVO! Facility Services, Inc. v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BRAVO! Facility Services, Inc.
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc., Blacstone Consulting, Inc., Troy A. Blades, Osmond Adams and Marie I. Vought
Case Number: 1:2017cv00419
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Fairfax
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER- For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered this same day, It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to remand (Doc. 4) is GRANTED and this matter is REMANDED to the Fairfax County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/30/2017. (dest, ) (Certified copy mailed to Fairfax County Circuit Court)
May 30, 2017 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/30/2017. (dest, )
May 5, 2017 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2017 re: Motion #4 to Remand. Peter C. Cohen present on behalf of plaintiff. Edward A. Gonsalves and Courtney R. Abbott present on behalf of defendants. Matter briefed, argued, and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Tonia Harris)(mpha)
May 1, 2017 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BRAVO! Facility Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Cohen, Peter)
April 25, 2017 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Osmond Adams, Troy A. Blades, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Edward)
April 25, 2017 Notice of Correction re #17 Opposition. The filing user has been notified to file the Memorandum in Support separately. (dest, )
April 24, 2017 Filing 17 Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Osmond Adams, Troy A. Blades, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Gonsalves, Edward)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER- it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Adam Augustine Carter and R. Scott Oswald of the Employment Law Group, P.C. is substituted for O'Kelly E. McWilliams III, Courtney R. Abbott, and Patrick K. Burns of Gordon & Rees LLP as counsel of record for Marie I. Vought and Blackstone Consulting, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 4/21/2017. (dest, )
April 21, 2017 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Blacstone Consulting, Inc., Marie I. Vought. (Carter, Adam)
April 21, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Blacstone Consulting, Inc., Marie I. Vought. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Notice)(Carter, Adam)
April 13, 2017 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Blacstone Consulting, Inc.. (Carter, Adam)
April 13, 2017 Notice of Correction re #12 Answer to Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file the Supplement Financial Disclosure separately (dest, )
April 13, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
April 12, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Blacstone Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Financial Disclosure)(Carter, Adam)
April 12, 2017 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Marie I. Vought.(Carter, Adam)
April 12, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE by Osmond Adams, Troy A. Blades, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gonsalves, Edward)
April 12, 2017 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Osmond Adams, Troy A. Blades, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Gonsalves, Edward)
April 12, 2017 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Osmond Adams, Troy A. Blades, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc..(Gonsalves, Edward)
April 12, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Williams on behalf of BRAVO! Facility Services, Inc. (Williams, Courtney)
April 12, 2017 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 5, 2017 re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cohen, Peter)
April 12, 2017 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BRAVO! Facility Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cohen, Peter)
April 12, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by BRAVO! Facility Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Peter)
April 6, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Augustine Carter on behalf of Marie I. Vought (dest, )
April 6, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Augustine Carter on behalf of Blacstone Consulting, Inc. (dest, )
April 6, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfax County Circuit Court, case number 2017 02850 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5463529.), filed by Blacstone Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Summons, #2 Supplement Joinder, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dest, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRAVO! Facility Services, Inc. v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Anthony Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blacstone Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Burns
Represented By: Adam Augustine Carter
Represented By: O'Kelly Edward McWilliams, III
Represented By: Courtney Renee Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy A. Blades
Represented By: Edward Anthony Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osmond Adams
Represented By: Edward Anthony Gonsalves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie I. Vought
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Burns
Represented By: Adam Augustine Carter
Represented By: O'Kelly Edward McWilliams, III
Represented By: Courtney Renee Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAVO! Facility Services, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Charles Cohen
Represented By: Courtney Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?