Clemons v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Richard Clemons
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00963
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Alexandria City
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2018 32 USCA Mandate re 26 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 4/3/2018, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (dvanm, )
April 3, 2018 31 USCA JUDGMENT as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Clemons. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (dvanm, )
April 3, 2018 30 UNPUBLISHED Opinion of USCA - AFFIRMED. (dvanm, )
January 18, 2018 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re 26 Notice of Appeal (lcre, )
January 18, 2018 29 Letter from the Fourth Circuit requesting the transmittal of the record. (lcre, )
January 18, 2018 28 USCA Case Number 18-1066 4th Circuit Case Manager R. Sewell for 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Clemons. (lcre, )
January 16, 2018 27 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 26 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (dvanm, )
January 10, 2018 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Richard Clemons. (dvanm, )
December 29, 2017 25 RULE 58 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 12/29/2017. (dvanm, )
December 29, 2017 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 22 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/29/2017. (see order for further details) (c/s as directed in Order) (dvanm, )
December 22, 2017 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2017 re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue with Roseboro,. filed by Google, Inc.Appearances of Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant.Motion argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Order to follow. (Court Reporter LaQuicia Thomas/Casamo & Assoc.)(jall)
December 20, 2017 22 MOTION to Amend the Original Claim for Relief with Proposed time for Submission 1-15-18 by Richard Clemons. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(dvanm, )
December 13, 2017 21 Featured Case ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' statements at the initial pretrial conference held before the undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judge o n Wednesday, December 13, 2017, it is hereby ORDERED that discovery in the above-captioned case be stayed until fourteen (14) days after the Court rules on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue (Dkt. 10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/13/17. (gwalk, )
December 13, 2017 20 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that 1. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in submissions presented, the Court makes the following rulings: a. The proposed Defendant's Discovery Plan (Doc. 18) is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the Court. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/13/17. (No Copy sent to Pro Se Pltf-No known Address)(tfitz, )
December 13, 2017 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/13/2017. Appearance of counsel for Pro se Pltf and counsel for the Deft. Deft's Discovery Plan approved. Order to issue. (Tape #FTR.)(tfitz, )
December 6, 2017 18 Discovery Plan by Google LLC.(Roche, John)
November 20, 2017 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion to Modify the Caption. Google Inc. shall now be known as Google LLC in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/20/2017. (dvanm, )
November 17, 2017 Set Deadlines as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
November 17, 2017 16 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 4/13/2018. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent, # 2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, )
November 16, 2017 15 Waiver of re 14 MOTION to Modify the Caption (Waiver of Hearing) by Google, Inc. (Roche, John)
November 16, 2017 14 MOTION to Modify the Caption by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John K. Roche, # 2 Proposed Order)(Roche, John)
November 16, 2017 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Google, Inc.. (Roche, John)
November 16, 2017 12 Notice of Hearing Date set for December 22, 2017 re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue with Roseboro,. (Roche, John)
November 16, 2017 11 Memorandum in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue with Roseboro,. filed by Google, Inc.. (Roche, John)
November 16, 2017 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue with Roseboro,. by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brittany Araujo, # 2 Proposed Order)(Roche, John)
November 7, 2017 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Clemons Google, Inc. served on 10/26/2017, answer due 11/16/2017. (dvanm, )
October 4, 2017 8 MOTION to Reissue Summons by Richard Clemons. (dvanm, )
October 3, 2017 7 MOTION to Reissue Summons by Richard Clemons. (dvanm, )
September 20, 2017 6 ALIAS Summons Issued, via USMS, as to Google, Inc. (dvanm, )
September 19, 2017 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Richard Clemons as to Google, Inc. (dvanm, )
August 29, 2017 4 Summons Issued, via USMS, as to Google, Inc. (dvanm, )
August 29, 2017 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 08/29/2017. (c/s to plaintiff at last known address listed within complaint) (dvanm, ) Modified to correct text on 8/29/2017 (dvanm, ).
August 28, 2017 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Clemons. (dvanm, )
August 28, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., filed by Richard Clemons.(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?