Shahid v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: Safama Shahid
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00894
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Fairfax
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Safama Shahid (Morrison, Thomas)
September 5, 2018 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 10/26/2018. (lcre, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Letter to Clerk. Affidavit of Service US Attorney General Served on 8/29/2018. US Attorney's Office (EDVA) served on 8/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Receipt, #3 Affidavit, #4 Receipt)(Morrison, Thomas) Modified on 9/5/2018 (lcre, ).
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Safama Shahid. (Morrison, Thomas)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Safama Shahid. (Morrison, Thomas)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6185386.), filed by Safama Shahid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lcre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shahid v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safama Shahid
Represented By: Thomas Bennett Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?