Brunner v. 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns

Plaintiff: Charles E. Brunner
Defendant: 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns
Case Number: 1:2018cv00909
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Loudoun
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (klau, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date September 28, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case (Hudgins, David)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Hudgins, David)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case by 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hudgins, David)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns by 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Hudgins, David)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint Responses due by 9/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/31/2018. (acha, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hudgins, David)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Declaration re #4 Order on Motion for Service by Publication by Charles E. Brunner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Publication, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certified Mail Receipts)(Bredimus, Frank)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 08/02/2018. (See order for further details). (acha, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Charles E. Brunner. (Bredimus, Frank)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Service by Publication by Charles E. Brunner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bredimus, Frank)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6189878.), filed by Charles E. Brunner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit $90,000 Cashier's Check, #2 Exhibit Bill of Sale, #3 Exhibit $242,500 Cashier's Check, #4 Exhibit Claim Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunner v. 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Brunner
Represented By: Frank B. Bredimus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 19 Parker Brothers Shotguns
Represented By: David D. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?