Gunvor SA v. Kayablian et al

Plaintiff: Gunvor SA
Defendant: Lawrence Kayablian, Arman Kayablian and Amira Group Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00934
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of Country
0 Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
1 Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #20 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 19, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. re #20 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Lomas, John)
September 17, 2018 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #20 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (lcre, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian re #20 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration / Notice of Issues of Foreign Law pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 44.1 (Lomas, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lawrence Kayablian, #2 Exhibit 1 to Kayablian Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Kayablian Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Kayablian Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Kayablian Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Kayablian Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Kayablian Declaration)(Lomas, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian. (Lomas, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian. (Lomas, John)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting re #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian, and Amira Group Company, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 14, 2018. Amira Group Company, LLC answer due 9/14/2018; Arman Kayablian answer due 9/14/2018; Lawrence Kayablian answer due 9/14/2018.Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/20/2018. (lcre, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice of Daniel Gilbert Morris. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/20/2018. (lcre, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice of William Thomas O'Brien. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/20/2018. (lcre, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel G. Morris and Certification of Local Counsel John W. Lomas, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6233820. by Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian. (Lomas, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William T. O'Brien and Certification of Local Counsel John W. Lomas, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6233776. by Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian. (Lomas, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lomas, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Amira Group Company, LLC. (Lomas, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John William Lomas, Jr on behalf of Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian (Lomas, John)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gunvor SA Arman Kayablian served on 8/3/2018, answer due 8/24/2018 (lcre, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gunvor SA Amira Group Company, LLC served on 8/3/2018, answer due 8/24/2018 (lcre, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gunvor SA Lawrence Kayablian served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018 (lcre, )
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice of Lauren Brooke Wilgus. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/2/2018. (lcre, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice of William Robert Bennett, III. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/1/2018. (lcre, )
July 31, 2018 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Brooke Wilgus and Certification of Local Counsel Kierstan L. Carlson by Gunvor SA. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6206036.. (Carlson, Kierstan)
July 30, 2018 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Robert Bennett, III and Certification of Local Counsel Kierstan L. Carlson, #3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Brooke Wilgus and Certification of Local Counsel Kierstan L. Carlson by Gunvor SA. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6202903.. (Carlson, Kierstan)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kierstan Lee Carlson on behalf of Gunvor SA (jlan)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Robert Bennett, III and Certification of Local Counsel Kierstan L. Carlson by Gunvor SA. (jlan)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Brooke Wilgus and Certification of Local Counsel Kierstan L. Carlson by Gunvor SA. (jlan)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Gunvor SA. (jlan)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amira Group Company, LLC, Arman Kayablian, Lawrence Kayablian (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6201541) filed by Gunvor SA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunvor SA v. Kayablian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Kayablian
Represented By: John William Lomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arman Kayablian
Represented By: John William Lomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amira Group Company, LLC
Represented By: John William Lomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunvor SA
Represented By: Kierstan Lee Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?