Blowes v. Cybergenetics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Devin R. Blowes
Defendant: Cybergenetics Corp., John Doe 1 and Jane Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2018cv01245
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: 1. The Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #7 ) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. a. Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2018 Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. #4 ), all discovery should be completed by February 15, 2019. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 11/07/18. (cmar, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/7/2018. Appearances of counsel. Discovery plan approved. Discovery not extended at this time. Order to issue. (cmar, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Devin R. Blowes. (Baldwin, William)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Cybergenetics Corp..(Ward, Justin)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Barbara Scheib. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/22/2018. (aott)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Consent Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Barbara Scheib and Certification of Local Counsel Justin W. Ward Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6323582. by Cybergenetics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statement, #2 Proposed Order)(Ward, Justin)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 2/15/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Cybergenetics Corp..(Ward, Justin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cybergenetics Corp.. (dest, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Stafford County, case number CL18001723-00 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6294231.), filed by Cybergenetics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dest, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blowes v. Cybergenetics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin R. Blowes
Represented By: William Ray Baldwin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cybergenetics Corp.
Represented By: Margaret Frances Hardy
Represented By: Justin Wright Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?