Beckford v. Esper

Plaintiff: Shawlawn Beckford
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Case Number: 1:2018cv01294
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
0 Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
1 Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2018 re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mark T. Esper. Counsel present for plaintiff and defendant. Motion argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
November 21, 2018 Filing 29 Reply to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mark T. Esper. (Loftus, Meghan)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER- It is ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled for Friday, November 30, 2018 is CONTINUED to Monday, December 3, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing reset for 12/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/19/2018. (lcre, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shawlawn Beckford. (Kaplan, Matthew)
November 2, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Hearing Date re #25 Memorandum in Support, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Loftus, Meghan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mark T. Esper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Loftus, Meghan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mark T. Esper. (Loftus, Meghan)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice of Katherine Cohen Cooper. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/25/2018. (lcre, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice of Dennis Andrew Corkery. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/25/2018. (lcre, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Cohen Cooper and Certification of Local Counsel Matthew B. Kaplan Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6332909. by Shawlawn Beckford. (Kaplan, Matthew)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennis Corkery and Certification of Local Counsel Matthew B. Kaplan Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6332908. by Shawlawn Beckford. (Kaplan, Matthew)
October 22, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Eric Wilson on behalf of Mark T. Esper (Wilson, Joel)
October 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Bryce Kaplan on behalf of Shawlawn Beckford (Kaplan, Matthew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by Mark T. Esper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Loftus, Meghan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Elizabeth Loftus on behalf of Mark T. Esper (Loftus, Meghan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-00940. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2018 Case transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia, pursuant to Court Order entered 10/03/2018. Sent to Court by extraction. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 10/13/2018. (znbn) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 13 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/3/2018. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion to Transfer. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's 6 Motion to Transfer is GRANTED; 2) The case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/3/2018. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 SURREPLY to re 10 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by SHAWLAWN BECKFORD. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Leave to File Surreply is GRANTED and the Surreply deemed FILED. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/30/2018. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by SHAWLAWN BECKFORD (Attachments: # 1 Surreply Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Dennis A. Corkery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Corkery, Dennis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARK T. ESPER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 8/17/2018. (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file his reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before August 17, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/7/2018. (lcjeb3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by MARK T. ESPER (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SHAWLAWN BECKFORD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition to Dispositive Motion due by 8/3/2018. (tg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss shall be due on or before August 3, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/11/2018. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by SHAWLAWN BECKFORD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by MARK T. ESPER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2 to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/9/2018. (znbn) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before July 9, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/19/2018. (lcjeb2)[Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by MARK T. ESPER (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Allen Haugh on behalf of MARK T. ESPER (Haugh, Jeremy) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Corkery on behalf of SHAWLAWN BECKFORD (Corkery, Dennis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MARK T. ESPER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK T. ESPER with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5434929) filed by SHAWLAWN BECKFORD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Mark T. Esper, # 3 Summons to Jessie K. Liu, # 4 Summons to Jeff Sessions)(Cooper, Katherine) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckford v. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawlawn Beckford
Represented By: Katherine C. Cooper
Represented By: Dennis A. Corkery
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Represented By: Jeremy Allen Haugh
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Loftus
Represented By: Joel Eric Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?