Humane Society of the United States et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Humane Society of the United States, Center for Biological Diversity, Born Free USA and Humane Society International
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and U.S. Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2018cv01301
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that on or before January 7, 2019, Defendants shall file a response to the complaint; it is further ORDERED that if Defendants' response is a dispositive motion, Plaintiffs' opposition brief is due on or before February 4, 2019, and Defendants' reply brief is due on or before February 18, 2019. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/03/2018. (dvanm, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice for Noah Simmons. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/15/2018. (dest, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice for Scott Flicker. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/15/2018. (dest, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice for Charles Patrizia. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/15/2018. (dest, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Noah Simmons and Certification of Local Counsel Neal Mollen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6363755. by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Flicker and Certification of Local Counsel Neal Mollen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6363738. by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Patrizia and Certification of Local Counsel Neal Mollen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6363722. by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Humane Society of the United States. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (dvanm, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Department of the Interior and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (dvanm, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, James Kurth, Acting Director, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, G. Zachary Terwilliger, U.S. Attorney for Eastern District of Virginia by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Daniel Jorjani, Principle Deputy Solicitor, U.S. Department of the Interior by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal)
October 22, 2018 Notice of Correction re #4 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that documents 2-4 are incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the documents. (dvanm, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 DOCUMENT REMOVED FILED IN ERROR Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Acting Director, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/22/2018) (dvanm, ). Modified on 10/22/2018 (dvanm, ).
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 DOCUMENT REMOVED FILED IN ERROR Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Acting Solicitor, U.S. Department of the Interior by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/22/2018) (dvanm, ). Modified on 10/22/2018 (dvanm, ).
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 DOCUMENT REMOVED FILED IN ERROR Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, US Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States. (Mollen, Neal) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/22/2018) (dvanm, ). Modified on 10/22/2018 (dvanm, ).
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6322593.), filed by Humane Society of the United States, Humane Society International, Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humane Society of the United States et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Neal David Mollen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Neal David Mollen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Born Free USA
Represented By: Neal David Mollen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humane Society International
Represented By: Neal David Mollen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?