FiberLight, LLC v. Branch Civil, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: FiberLight, LLC
Defendant: Branch Civil, Inc. and Branch Highways, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01314
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
0 Judge: Ivan D Davis
1 Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 So Ordered re #9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Branch Highways, Inc., Branch Civil, Inc. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 12/7/2018. (lcre, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Branch Highways, Inc. by parties by Branch Civil, Inc., Branch Highways, Inc.. (Hardt, Kenneth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Branch Highways, Inc., Branch Civil, Inc.. (Hardt, Kenneth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Branch Civil, Inc., Branch Highways, Inc..(Hardt, Kenneth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Branch Civil, Inc. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018; Branch Highways, Inc. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (lcre, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Branch Civil, Inc., Branch Highways, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Branch Highways, Inc. by FiberLight, LLC. (Gastner, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Branch Civil, Inc. by FiberLight, LLC. (Gastner, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by FiberLight, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gastner, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/23/2018) (lcre, ).
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Branch Civil, Inc., Branch Highways, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6326205.), filed by FiberLight, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FiberLight, LLC v. Branch Civil, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Civil, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Francis Hardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Highways, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Francis Hardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FiberLight, LLC
Represented By: Robert James Gastner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?