Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460 v. AdvanFort Company
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460
Defendant: AdvanFort Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01421
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460 by AdvanFort Company. (Chick, William)
January 11, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #16 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #10 Financial Disclosure Statement, #15 Notice of Hearing Date, #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #12 Memorandum in Support, (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE P. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (Per TSE chambers) (clar, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AdvanFort Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Ahmed Farajallah, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Supplemental Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Supplemental Declaration)(Chick, William)
January 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #10 Financial Disclosure Statement, #15 Notice of Hearing Date, #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #12 Memorandum in Support, (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE P. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (klau, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Abel, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Hearing Date ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE set for January 25, 2019 re #16 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #10 Financial Disclosure Statement, #15 Notice of Hearing Date, #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #12 Memorandum in Support, (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE P (Abel, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #10 Financial Disclosure Statement, #15 Notice of Hearing Date, #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #12 Memorandum in Support, (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE P filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Abel, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #10 Financial Disclosure Statement, #15 Notice of Hearing Date, #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #12 Memorandum in Support, (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLEADINGS BY NON-PARTY ADVANFORT CO., INC. by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Abel, Christopher)
December 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #12 Memorandum in Support, (Chick, William)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460 by AdvanFort Company.(Chick, William)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/21/2018. (dvanm, )
December 20, 2018 Notice of Correction re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AdvanFort Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ahmed Farajallah, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Chick, William)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by AdvanFort Company. (Chick, William)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AdvanFort Company. (Chick, William)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Lloyd Elkind and Certification of Local Counsel William Michael Chick, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6414612. by AdvanFort Company. (Chick, William)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Abel, Christopher)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ADMIRALTY FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT) against AdvanFort Company, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Abel, Christopher)
December 4, 2018 Notice of Correction re #6 Financial Disclosure Statement. Filing user has been notified to sign and refile document, as soon as possible. (dvanm, )
December 4, 2018 Notice of Correction re #5 Amended Complaint. The filing user has been notified that the document is not signed and should be signed and refiled. (dvanm, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Abel, Christopher)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN ADMIRALTY FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT) against AdvanFort Company, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Abel, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Abel, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file the Financial Interest Disclosure Statement separately. (dest, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AdvanFort Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dest, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William Andrew McNinch Burke on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460 (Burke, William)
November 16, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dest, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint in Admiralty for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6368308.), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Financial Interest Disclosure, #4 Summons in a Civil Action)(Abel, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460 v. AdvanFort Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdvanFort Company
Represented By: William Michael Chick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B0823PP1308460
Represented By: William Andrew McNinch Burke
Represented By: Christopher Alan Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?