Morgan-Asiedu v. Walmart Store #2038, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Charlotte Morgan-Asiedu
Defendant: Walmart Store #2038, Inc., Walmart Sterling Supercenter, Walmart Stores East Inc., John Doe (#4 Employee), John Doe (#2 Employee), John Doe (#3 Employee), Allen Johnson, John Doe (#6 Cust Svc Clerk), Harry Smith, Walmart Stores Inc. and John Doe (#1 Manager)
Case Number: 1:2018cv01430
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Joint Discovery Plan, and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case, the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/04/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Discovery Plan by Walmart Sterling Supercenter, Walmart Store #2038, Inc., Walmart Stores East Inc., Walmart Stores Inc..(Kaseorg, Karissa)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 5/10/2019.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(awac, )
November 20, 2018 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal, The filing user has been notified to file the financial disclosure statement separately for future filing. (klau, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6370460.), filed by Walmart Store #2038, Inc., Walmart Sterling Supercenter, Walmart Stores East Inc. & Walmart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(Kaseorg, Karissa) Modified on 11/20/2018 (Answer Filed) (klau, ). Modified text on 11/20/2018 to add party filer(klau, ).
November 19, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan-Asiedu v. Walmart Store #2038, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Store #2038, Inc.
Represented By: Karissa Thomas Kaseorg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Sterling Supercenter
Represented By: Karissa Thomas Kaseorg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East Inc.
Represented By: Karissa Thomas Kaseorg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (#4 Employee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (#2 Employee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (#3 Employee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (#6 Cust Svc Clerk)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Karissa Thomas Kaseorg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (#1 Manager)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Morgan-Asiedu
Represented By: Buta Biberaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?