VISTA MACHINING COMPANY et al v. MATTIS et al
Plaintiff: Vista Machining Company and Richard Ross Hyde
Defendant: James M. Coyne, Defense Logistics Agency, Darrell K. Williams, James N. Mattis, United States of America and Melinda L. Perritano
Case Number: 1:2018cv01440
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. ORDERED that, on or before February 1, 2019, Defendants shall file an answer to Plaintiffs' complaint and the administrative record of proceedings before DLA. ORDERED that, all other dates in the Court's January 7, 2019 Scheduling Order remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 1/23/19. (klau, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Unopposed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule by Vista Machining Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talati, Gunjan)
January 7, 2019 Alexandria Set/Reset Hearings: Summary Judgment Hearing set for 5/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (klau, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion Briefing Schedule. ORDERED that, on or before January 25, 2019, Defendants shall file an answer to Plaintiffs' complaint and the administrative record of proceedings before DLA. ORDERED that, on or before February 22, 2019, Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment and supporting memorandum of law ----- ORDERED that the parties shall notice their respective motions for hearing on May 24, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 1/7/19. (klau, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule re #20 Order, by James M. Coyne, Defense Logistics Agency, James N. Mattis, Melinda L. Perritano, United States of America, Darrell K. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Han, Andrew)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED ORDER that the Court's scheduling order entered on November 27, 2018 ( Dkt. No. 18) be, and the same hereby is, VACATED. ORDERED that, on or before February 1, 2019, Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment and supporting memorandum of law --- ORDERED that the parties shall notice their respective motions for hearing on April 26, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (see order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/7/18. (klau, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Han on behalf of James M. Coyne, Defense Logistics Agency, James N. Mattis, Melinda L. Perritano, United States of America, Darrell K. Williams (Han, Andrew)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Discovery due by 3/22/2019.Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (in the event parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (in the event parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, ) Modified on 12/7/2018 VACATED per order dated 12/7/18 (klau, ).
November 27, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-01819. Original file and docket sheet received.
November 26, 2018 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Virginia, pursuant to Court Order entered 11/15/18. Sent to Court Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 11/26/2018. (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants' #12 Motion to Transfer Case. The case shall be transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/15/2018. (lccrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Kahn, Matthew) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Proposed Order by RICHARD ROSS HYDE, VISTA MACHINING COMPANY re #13 Memorandum in Opposition (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by RICHARD ROSS HYDE, VISTA MACHINING COMPANY. (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Matthew). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 10/15/2018 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES N. MATTIS served on 9/5/2018 (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/13/2018. (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/12/2018. (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MELINDA L. PERRITANO served on 8/14/2018 (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES M. COYNE served on 8/14/2018 (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DARRELL K. WILLIAMS served on 8/14/2018 (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY served on 8/14/2018 (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to JAMES M. COYNE, DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, RICHARD ROSS HYDE, JAMES N. MATTIS, MELINDA L. PERRITANO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DARRELL K. WILLIAMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Jett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Talati, Gunjan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Vista Machining Company (Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5618904) filed by Vista Machining Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Debarment Memo, #3 Exhibit 2a NPD re Hyde, #4 Exhibit 2b NPD re Vista, #5 Exhibit 2c NPD Memo, #6 Exhibit 3a Debarment re Vista, #7 Exhibit 3b Debarment re Hyde, #8 Exhibit 4 Vista 1 Complaint, #9 Exhibit 5 Remand Order, #10 Exhibit PMIO, #11 Summons Defense Logistic Agency, #12 Summons Mattis, #13 Summons Williams, #14 Summons Coyne, #15 Summons Perritano, #16 Summons Sessions, #17 Summons Liu)(Talati, Gunjan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VISTA MACHINING COMPANY et al v. MATTIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Coyne
Represented By: Andrew Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Logistics Agency
Represented By: Andrew Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell K. Williams
Represented By: Andrew Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James N. Mattis
Represented By: Andrew Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Evan Kahn
Represented By: Andrew Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda L. Perritano
Represented By: Andrew Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Machining Company
Represented By: Gunjan Rashmikant Talati
Represented By: John P. Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ross Hyde
Represented By: Gunjan Rashmikant Talati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?