DELL-TECH, INC. v. AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Dell-Tech, Inc.
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company and Blanchard's Contracting LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01474
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service of Summons upon Defendants by Dell-Tech, Inc. (Nichols, Jackson)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Pro hac vice of Shawn Farrell. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 1/3/2019. (lcre, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shawn Farrell and Certification of Local Counsel Jackson S. Nichols Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6427232. by Dell-Tech, Inc.. (Nichols, Jackson)
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dell-Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B)(Nichols, Jackson)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #19 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 12, 2018, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's November 30, 2018 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court(see order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/11/2018. (lgue, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Spruill Nichols on behalf of Dell-Tech, Inc. (Nichols, Jackson)
December 7, 2018 Filing 19 Joint Discovery Plan Discovery Plan by Dell-Tech, Inc..(Nichols, Jackson)
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward John Longosz, II on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Company (Longosz, Edward)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis.Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do not file dispositive motions).Discovery due by 3/22/2019.Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do file dispositive motions).Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/30/18. (Attachments: #1 Mag. Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:18-cv-08254. Original file and docket sheet received.
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER ORDER granting #7 Motion to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Alexandria Division ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/30/2018. (km) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
November 7, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2018. (ce3) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/7/2018 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for the Plaintiff is directed to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/30/2018. (kas, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/30/2018. (ce3) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 3:00 P.M. in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 8/30/2018 at 10:30 A.M. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/28/2018. (jlb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 8/7/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 8/28/2018 at 3:00 P.M. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 8/7/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 11 Plaintiff, Dell-Tech, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Aegis Security Insurance Company by DELL-TECH, INC..(ERLANGER, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Alexandria Division (DUNHAM, EDGAR) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DELL-TECH, INC. re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Alexandria Division (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(ERLANGER, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELL-TECH, INC.. (ERLANGER, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Alexandria Division . Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Alexandria Division by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kenneth Witcher, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DUNHAM, EDGAR) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Aegis Security Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DUNHAM, EDGAR) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 5 AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE CO ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against DELL-TECH, INC. by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(DUNHAM, EDGAR) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/31/2018. (mmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Aegis Security Insurance Co... (DUNHAM, EDGAR) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DELL-TECH, INC.. AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018. (ERLANGER, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
April 24, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
April 24, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jjc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8686780), filed by DELL-TECH, INC..(ERLANGER, MATTHEW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/30/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELL-TECH, INC. v. AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dell-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew L. Erlanger
Represented By: Jackson Spruill Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Edgar Alden Dunham, IV
Represented By: Edward John Longosz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanchard's Contracting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?