Willis v. Moore
Plaintiff: Jessica Willis
Defendant: Mary Moore and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv01488
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 So Ordered re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Jessica Willis. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 01/03/2019. (dvanm, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jessica Willis (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
December 12, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 25, 2019 re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Levenson, Rebecca)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Levenson, Rebecca)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Levenson, Rebecca)
December 4, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Mary Moore of Substitution of the United States of America as the Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levenson, Rebecca)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal , filed by Mary Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levenson, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Moore
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Willis
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?