Rodriguez v. Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pedro Rodriguez
Defendant: Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01501
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The Settlement Agreement, attached as Exhibit A to the Consent Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement, is hereby Filed Under Seal permanently. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 01/23/2019. (see Order for further details)(dvanm, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc. re #5 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), Proposed Order to File Under Seal (Johnson, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 01/16/2019. (dvanm, )
January 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re #11 Consent MOTION re #8 Consent MOTION for Settlement To Approve Settlement ORDER Incorrect Docket Event. (clar, )
January 11, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 Consent MOTION for Settlement To Approve Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Submission of Order in re #8 Consent MOTION for Settlement To Approve Settlement ORDER by Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc.. (Johnson, Matthew) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (clar, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date January 25, 2019 re #5 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s), #8 Consent MOTION for Settlement To Approve Settlement (Johnson, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 Consent MOTION for Settlement To Approve Settlement filed by Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc.. (Johnson, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Settlement To Approve Settlement by Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc.. (Johnson, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Per CMH chambers motions set for 1/11/19 have been withdrawn (clar, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc. re #6 Notice of Hearing Date, Notice to Withdraw Hearing (Johnson, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Notice of Correction re #5 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s). An incomplete, illegible, or incorrect document was filed. The filing user has been notified to file the documents correctly in the future. (clar, )
December 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION Public Notice of Consent Motion for Entry of Order Permitting Defendant to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal As Exhibit to the Consent Motion to Approve The Settlement Agreement . Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date January 11, 2019 re #4 Motion Public Notice of consent Motion for Entry of Order Permitting Defendant to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal (Johnson, Matthew) Modified docket e4ntry relationship on 12/26/2018 (clar, ).
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #4 MOTION Public Notice of Consent Motion for Entry of Order Permitting Defendant to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal As Exhibit to the Consent Motion to Approve The Settlement Agreement . (Johnson, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Public Notice of Consent Motion for Entry of Order Permitting Defendant to File Settlement Agreement Under Seal As Exhibit to the Consent Motion to Approve The Settlement Agreement by Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc.. (Johnson, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc. waiver sent on 12/5/2018, answer due 2/4/2019, (Johnson, Matthew) Modified on 12/27/2018 to correct docket event and set answer due date (dest, ).
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Defendant Peking Gourmet Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc..(Johnson, Matthew)
December 5, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6392828.), filed by Pedro Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peralta, Nady)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peking Gourmet Inn, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Hoyt Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Rodriguez
Represented By: Nady Leticia Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?