Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01506
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
1 Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 13 Document filed in error and removed . (klau, ) (Main Document 13 replaced on 2/1/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 2/1/2019 (klau, ).
January 27, 2019 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Quash , or in the Alternative, Motion for a Protective Order filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gilliard, Gerald)
January 27, 2019 11 MOTION to Quash , or in the Alternative, Motion for a Protective Order by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Gilliard, Gerald)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/24/19. (klau, )
January 22, 2019 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leonard John French, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Gerald Leroy Gilliard Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6456558. by John Doe. (Gilliard, Gerald)
January 22, 2019 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Leroy Gilliard on behalf of John Doe (Gilliard, Gerald)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/13/18. (klau, )
December 12, 2018 6 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference Waiver of Oral Argument (Haire, Jessica)
December 12, 2018 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Haire, Jessica)
December 12, 2018 4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order)(Haire, Jessica)
December 6, 2018 3 Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Copy mailed to U.S. Copyright Office.(klau, )
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (aott)
December 5, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Haire, Jessica)
December 5, 2018 1 Complaint against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6393084.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haire, Jessica) Modified on 12/6/2018 to add defendant (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Gerald Leroy Gilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Vasconcellos Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?