Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01510
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/14/18. (klau, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference Waiver of Oral Argument (Haire, Jessica)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Haire, Jessica)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order)(Haire, Jessica)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Copy mailed to U.S. Copyright Office. (klau, )
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Haire, Jessica)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6393234.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haire, Jessica) Modified on 12/6/2018 to add defendant (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Vasconcellos Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?