v. Maryland Insurance Administration
Petitioner: Elizabeth H. Coomes and Elizabeth Haring Coomes
Respondent: Maryland Insurance Administration
Trustee: John P. Fitzgerald, III and Thomas P. Gorman
Interested Party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Case Number: 1:2018cv01511
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled for February 1, 2019 at noon is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 01/31/2019. (c/s as directed in Order)(dvanm, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition to #9 MOTION to Vacate #8 Order on Motion to Withdraw Maryland Insurance Administration's Opposition to Coomes's Motion to Vacate filed by Maryland Insurance Administration. (Gunn, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Vacate #8 Order on Motion to Withdraw. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2019 at 12:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that defendant's motion to postpone oral argument #11 is GRANTED and oral argument on petitioner's motion to vacate #9 is RESCHEDULED to 2/1/2019 at 12:00 p.m.; that defendant's alternative request to excuse local counsel and allow pro hac vice counsel to participate telephonically is DENIED. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 1/23/2019. (rban, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Maryland Insurance Administration's Motion to Postpone the Hearing on Ms. Coomes's Motion to Vacate and Alternative Request to Excuse Local Counsel and Allow Pro Hac Vice Counsel to Participate Telephonically by Maryland Insurance Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gunn, Elizabeth)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION to Vacate #8 Order on Motion to Withdraw : Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate #8 Order on Motion to Withdraw by Elizabeth H. Coomes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(clar, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #1 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 01/03/2019. (c/s as directed in Order) (dvanm, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service filed solely to correct error in original certificate re #6 Opposition, by Elizabeth Leigh Gunn on behalf of Maryland Insurance Administration (Gunn, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Opposition to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Opposition to Coomes's Motion to Withdraw Reference filed by Maryland Insurance Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Gunn, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/14/2018. (dvanm, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ioannis Aristotelis Laskaris and Certification of Local Counsel Elizabeth L. Gunn Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6405866. by Maryland Insurance Administration. (Gunn, Elizabeth)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from the court mailed to VA and PA addresses. (dvanm, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Restricted transcript received from USBC. (dvanm, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw together with USBC Transmittal, Docket Sheet and Designation of Record by Elizabeth H. Coomes. (Attachments: #1 Designation #1, #2 Designation #2, #3 Designation #3, #4 Designation #4, #5 Designation #5, #6 Designation #6, #7 Certified Docket Sheet)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Maryland Insurance Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elizabeth H. Coomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elizabeth Haring Coomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maryland Insurance Administration
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Gunn
Represented By: Ioannis Laskaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John P. Fitzgerald, III
Represented By: Joseph A. Guzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas P. Gorman
Represented By: Marcelo Ramiro Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?