Fedewa v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Ritika Fedewa
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01520
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ritika Fedewa. (Smith, Juliane)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Waiving Oral Argument (Pocock, Donald)
January 17, 2019 Notice of Correction re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(klau, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 5), and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 4) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by April 26, 2019. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, January 2, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by January 16, 2019. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/2/19. (tfitz, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Ritika Fedewa.(Smith, Juliane)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Discovery due by 4/26/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III(if parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if parties do file dispositive motions).Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/17/18. (Attachments: #1 Mag. Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - QWR 1, #2 Exhibit B - QWR 2, #3 Exhibit C - Response Letter from Chase (without voluminous enclosures))(Pocock, Donald)
December 7, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6396965.), filed by Chase, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Pocock, Donald) Modified on 12/7/2018 (No Answer Filed) (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedewa v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritika Fedewa
Represented By: Juliane Ylenia Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?