Ellison v. Lincoln Nation Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Amanda C Ellison
Defendant: The Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan - Long Term Disability Plan and Lincoln Nation Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01529
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Ivan D Davis
1 Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order 12 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 5/24/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, )
February 1, 2019 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln Nation Life Insurance Company.(Marshall, Alexander)
January 8, 2019 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Lincoln Nation Life Insurance Company. (Marshall, Alexander)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's #5 Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until February 1, 2019, to file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/2/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED, that motions #4 , #7 is GRANTED and that Defendant Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan-Long Term Disability Plan shall be dismissed without prejudice and that the Court will substitute Lincoln National Life Insurance Company as the named Defendant, and amend the caption of this action accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/2/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
December 28, 2018 7 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption by The Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan - Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Alexander)
December 27, 2018 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan - Long Term Disability Plan. (Marshall, Alexander)
December 27, 2018 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan - Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Alexander)
December 27, 2018 4 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant and to Amend Caption by The Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan - Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Alexander)
December 27, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Tevis Marshall on behalf of The Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan - Long Term Disability Plan (Marshall, Alexander)
December 10, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to The Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan - Long Term Disability Plan. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
December 7, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )
December 7, 2018 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6398168.), filed by Amanda C Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons to be issued)(Glass, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. Lincoln Nation Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda C Ellison
Represented By: Benjamin Weaver Glass, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Campagna Center Health and Welfare Benefit Plan - Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Alexander Tevis Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Nation Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander Tevis Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?