Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority v. 47,611 Square Feet of Land, More or Less, Situate in the City of Alexandria, Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Defendant: Old Town Greens Condominium Unit Owners Association, 47,611 Square Feet of Land, More or Less, Situate in the City of Alexandria, Virginia and Old Town Greens Townhome Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01542
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 Deposit to Registry in the amount of $ 139,478.00 posted by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority pursuant to ECF #12 Stipulated Final Judgment, by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (dest, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT- ORDERS, ADJUDGES, AND DECREES as follows: JUDGMENT shall be, and is hereby, entered against WMAT A in the amount of $399,478.00. The deficiency between the agreed settlement amount ($399,478.00) and the previously deposited amount ($260,000.00) is $139,478.00. WMATA shall pay into the Registry of the Court, and the Clerk is hereby directed to accept, the deficiency amount of $139,478.00 within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Stipulated Final Judgment. WMATA and the Townhome HOA agree that they shall be bound by certainTerms and Conditions of Temporary Construction Easement, which are attached hereto as Exhibit A. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/2/2019. (see Order for further details)(dest, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment)(Hansen, Eugene)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Defendant Old Town Greens Condominium Unit Owners Association, Returned by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Hansen, Eugene)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Defendant Old Town Greens Townhome Owners Association, Inc., Returned by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Hansen, Eugene)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Norman Hansen on behalf of Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Hansen, Eugene)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Deposit Funds received from Plaintiff Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority in the amount of $260,000.00 re #6 ORDER. (dest, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent MOTION to Deposit Funds. The Clerk of the Court shall accept the deposit of two hundred and sixty thousand dollars and no cents ($260,000.00) tendered by WMATA, and shall deposit these funds into an interest-bearing account consistent with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67, Local Civil Rule 67, and this Court's Standing Order re: Deposit and Investment of Registry Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/18/2018. (dest, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Deposit Funds by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Deposit of Funds, #2 Appendix Service Certificate)(Sponseller, Richard)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla Jordan Diaz on behalf of Old Town Greens Condominium Unit Owners Association, Old Town Greens Townhome Owners Association, Inc. (Diaz, Marla)
December 14, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority ("WMATA") re #2 Declaration,, #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Appendix "A" Authority for the Taking, #2 Appendix "B" Public Purpose, #3 Appendix "C" Description of the Property, #4 Appendix "D" Plan, #5 Appendix "E" Estate to be Acquired, #6 Appendix "F" Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Appendix "G" Interested Parties)(Sponseller, Richard)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration re #1 Complaint,, by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority ("WMATA"). (Attachments: #1 Appendix "A" Authority for the Taking, #2 Appendix "B" Public Purpose, #3 Appendix "C" Description of the Property, #4 Appendix "D" Plan, #5 Appendix "E" Estate to be Acquired, #6 Appendix "F" Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Appendix "G" Interested Parties)(Sponseller, Richard)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority ("WMATA"). (Attachments: #1 Appendix "A" Authority for the Taking, #2 Appendix "B" Public Purpose, #3 Appendix "C" Description of the Property, #4 Appendix "D" Plan, #5 Appendix "E" Estate to Be Acquired, #6 Appendix "F" Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Appendix "G" Interested Parties, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sponseller, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority v. 47,611 Square Feet of Land, More or Less, Situate in the City of Alexandria, Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Town Greens Condominium Unit Owners Association
Represented By: Marla Jordan Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 47,611 Square Feet of Land, More or Less, Situate in the City of Alexandria, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Town Greens Townhome Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Marla Jordan Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Represented By: Richard W. Sponseller
Represented By: Eugene Norman Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?