Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Investigative Consultants Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Donald Berlin, Investigative Consultants Inc. and Investigative Consultants, Inc. of Washington, DC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01575
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of re #4 Summons Issued, Investigative Consultants, Inc. by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Pak, Jessica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of re #4 Summons Issued, Investigative Consultants, Inc. of Washington DC by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Pak, Jessica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of re #4 Summons Issued, by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Pak, Jessica)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for William Jacob Harrington. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 1/17/2019. (acha, )
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice for Lee Hedgecock Ogburn. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 1/17/2019. (acha, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lee Hedgecock Ogburn and Certification of Local Counsel Jessica E. Pak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6441059. by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Page)(Pak, Jessica)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jacob Harrington and Certification of Local Counsel Jessica E. Pak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6441020. by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Pak, Jessica)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donald Berlin, Investigative Consultants Inc., Investigative Consultants, Inc. of Washington, DC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
December 21, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Reede, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Reede, George)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6418987.), filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Complaint)(Reede, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Investigative Consultants Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigative Consultants Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigative Consultants, Inc. of Washington, DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: George Edwin Reede, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Etta Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?