Jones v. State Of Virginia
Plaintiff: W.-Jeremiah Jones
Defendant: State Of Virginia
Case Number: 1:2018cv01595
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and ORDERED that Jones's complaint {Dkt. No. #1 ] be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/22/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies mailed as directed in the order.
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. The filer user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument with Roseboro per LMB Order. (acha, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that Ebert file promptly a standalone motion to dismiss, notice a hearing date or waive oral argument on the motion, and provide plaintiff with a Roseboro notice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/14/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies mailed as directed in the order.
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Paul B. Ebert Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) by State Of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
February 5, 2019 Notice of Correction re #4 Defendant Paul B. Ebert Memorandum In Support of Motion to filed by State Of Virginia. The filer has been notified to file his Motion to Dismiss to support his memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss. The filer has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant Paul B. Ebert Memorandum In Support of Motion to filed by State Of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Addendum A, #2 Envelope)(acha, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to: State Of Virginia served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(acha, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Of Virginia. (lcre, )(copy of Summons mailed to Plaintiff Pro-Se)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Of Virginia ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683076322.), filed by W.-Jeremiah Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Receipt)(lcre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. State Of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.-Jeremiah Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?