Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00028
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 01/30/2019. (jlan)
January 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference Waiver of Oral Argument (Haire, Jessica)
January 20, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Haire, Jessica)
January 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order)(Haire, Jessica)
January 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Haire, Jessica)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO121 Report Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Haire, Jessica) (c/s to copyright office)(jlan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6436671.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haire, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Vasconcellos Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?