Estep Forsyth, et al. v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company

Plaintiff: MARILYN M ESTEP FORSYTH, ANDREW FORSYTH and Marilyn M. Estep Forsyth
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00037
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #5 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for February 6, 2019, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's January 11, 2019 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/31/2019. (lgue, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company.(de Witt, Alexander)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(de Witt, Alexander)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 5/10/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (de Witt, Alexander)
January 10, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #1 Notice of Removal. The filing user has been notified to re-file the Financial Disclosure Statement using the specific event found under Other Documents. (pmil, )
January 9, 2019 Remark - ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT (pmil, )
January 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (pmil, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6439219.), filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Responsive Pleadings), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(de Witt, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estep Forsyth, et al. v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILYN M ESTEP FORSYTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW FORSYTH
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn M. Estep Forsyth
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Represented By: Alexander Spotswood de Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?