Sines v. Robbins

Plaintiff: Herman Junior Sines
Defendant: Samuel Conder Robbins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
0 Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
1 Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Deadline terminated - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff terminated - Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order entered. (cmar, )
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the record and the representations made by the parties in their discovery plan, it is ordered that: 1. The Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #4 ) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. a. Pursuant to the Court's Scheduling Order, discovery will be complete by Friday, June 14, 2019 (Dkt. No. 2). (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 02/04/19. (cmar, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 26 Disclosure by Herman Junior Sines. (Johnston, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Conference Report and Proposed Discovery Plan by Samuel Conder Robbins.(Watkins, William)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Hamilton Johnston on behalf of Herman Junior Sines (Johnston, John)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema.. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
January 10, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6440794.), filed by Samuel Conder Robbins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint with Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on DMV, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Answer, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watkins, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sines v. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Conder Robbins
Represented By: William Norman Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Junior Sines
Represented By: John Hamilton Johnston
Represented By: Michael N. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?