Sopkin vs. Mendelson, et al

Plaintiff: General Partner Barbara Sopkin
Defendant: Jill C. Mendelson, Richard S. Mendelson Trust and Land Clark Carroll Blair, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00058
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emery Draim on behalf of Land Clark Carroll Blair, P.C., Jill C. Mendelson, Richard S. Mendelson Trust (Draim, Robert)
March 15, 2019 Notice of Correction re #4 Notice of Appearance. The filing user has been notified that document [document number] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (clar, )
March 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice) (dzir)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Hearing Date set for 04/26/2019 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Draim, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Land Clark Carroll Blair, P.C., Jill C. Mendelson, Richard S. Mendelson Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Memorandum, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Memorandum, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Memorandum, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Memorandum, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Memorandum, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Memorandum, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Memorandum, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Memorandum, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Memorandum, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Memorandum, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Memorandum, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Memorandum, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Memorandum, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17 to Memorandum, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to Memorandum, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19 to Memorandum, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20 to Memorandum, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21 to Memorandum, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22 to Memorandum, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23 to Memorandum, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24 to Memorandum, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25 to Memorandum, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26 to Memorandum, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27 to Memorandum, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28 to Memorandum, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29 to Memorandum, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 30 to Memorandum, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 31 to Memorandum, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 32 to Memorandum, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 33 to Memorandum, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 34 to Memorandum, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 35 to Memorandum, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 36 to Memorandum, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 37 to Memorandum, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 38 to Memorandum, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 39 to Memorandum, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 40 to Memorandum, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 41 to Memorandum, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 42 to Memorandum, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 43 to Memorandum, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 44 to Memorandum, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 45 to Memorandum)(Draim, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Land Clark Carroll Blair, P.C., Jill C. Mendelson, Richard S. Mendelson Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Draim, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Land Clark Carroll Blair, P.C.. (Draim, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Richard S. Mendelson Trust. (Draim, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emery Draim on behalf of Land Clark Carroll Blair, P.C., Jill C. Mendelson, Richard S. Mendelson Trust (Draim, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Land Clark Carroll Blair, P.C. waiver sent on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Richard S. Mendelson Trust waiver sent on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (aott)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jill C. Mendelson waiver sent on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (aott) Modified on 2/15/2019 (aott, ).
January 15, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6445462.), filed by Barbara Sopkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sopkin as General Partner 2014)(Lopatto, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jlan, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sopkin vs. Mendelson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill C. Mendelson
Represented By: Robert Emery Draim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Mendelson Trust
Represented By: Robert Emery Draim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Clark Carroll Blair, P.C.
Represented By: Robert Emery Draim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Partner Barbara Sopkin
Represented By: John S. Lopatto, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?